Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 975 Lincoln St, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: 975 Lincoln St, LLC doing business as 100% de Agave, Jose Ruiz and Ricardo Ruiz
Case Number: 1:2023cv02505
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2023 Filing 14 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants 975 Lincoln St, LLC, Jose Ruiz, Ricardo Ruiz. (Furtado, David)
November 22, 2023 Filing 13 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendants 975 Lincoln St, LLC, Jose Ruiz, Ricardo Ruiz. (Furtado, David)
November 22, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David J. Furtado on behalf of All Defendants Attorney David J. Furtado added to party 975 Lincoln St, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Furtado added to party Jose Ruiz(pty:dft), Attorney David J. Furtado added to party Ricardo Ruiz(pty:dft) (Furtado, David)
November 21, 2023 Filing 11 First MOTION to Continue Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Janis, Ryan)
November 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: As a reminder, in addition to filing the proposed Scheduling Order today, the parties shall also jointly email a Word version of the proposed Scheduling Order to Judge Hegarty today (hegarty_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov). See ECF #6 . Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/20/23. Text Only Entry (mehlc5)
November 20, 2023 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. 975 Lincoln St, LLC served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023; Jose Ruiz served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023; Ricardo Ruiz served on 11/1/2023, answer due 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit)(Janis, Ryan)
October 25, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/27/2023 at 10:00 AM #6 is reset, TIME CHANGE ONLY, to 11/27/2023 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A501 on the fifth floor of the Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/25/23. Text Only Entry (mehlc5)
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (jtorr, )
September 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/27/2023. Magistrate Judge Consent Form due 11/20/2023. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/20/2023. Scheduling Conference set for 11/27/2023 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (jtorr, )
September 27, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Janis, Ryan)
September 26, 2023 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (tgall, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Patent, Trademark, or Copyright Action case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party commencing the action to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 3.1. Please file a properly completed Report form, which can be found on the courts website. (Text Only Entry). (tgall, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 975 Lincoln St, LLC, Jose Ruiz, Ricardo Ruiz (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9313486)Attorney Ryan Richard Janis added to party Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Janis, Ryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. 975 Lincoln St, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: Ryan Richard Janis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 975 Lincoln St, LLC doing business as 100% de Agave
Represented By: David J. Furtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Ruiz
Represented By: David J. Furtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricardo Ruiz
Represented By: David J. Furtado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?