Padilla v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Rocky Padilla
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2023cv02507
Filed: September 26, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Susan Prose
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301 Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 11/15/2023. In light of the #13 Notice of Settlement filed by Plaintiff Rocky Padilla, the scheduling conference set for 11/27/2023 is VACATED, to be reset if the settlement is not finalized. Dismissal Paper due by 12/15/2023. Text Only Entry (sbplc1)
November 15, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE of Settlement by Plaintiff Rocky Padilla (Duck, Kevin)
November 13, 2023 Filing 12 CASE REASSIGNED. Pursuant to #11 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge This case is reassigned Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02507-SBP. (Text Only Entry) By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/13/2023. (norlin, )
November 13, 2023 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant General Motors, LLC All parties consent.. (Snow, James)
October 24, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel Scott Wittenberg on behalf of General Motors, LLCAttorney Daniel Scott Wittenberg added to party General Motors, LLC(pty:dft) (Wittenberg, Daniel)
October 24, 2023 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Motors Company, Other Affiliate General Motors Holdings LLC for General Motors, LLC. (Snow, James)
October 24, 2023 Filing 8 General Motors LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by General Motors, LLC.(Snow, James)
October 24, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James D.G. Snow on behalf of General Motors, LLCAttorney James D.G. Snow added to party General Motors, LLC(pty:dft) (Snow, James)
October 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Consent Deadline and Scheduling Conference, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 10/16/2023. If the parties have not done so already, they shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form on or before November 13, 2023. The Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference shall be held telephonically on November 27, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom C-205, on the second floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. The parties shall attend by calling 571-353-2301, Guest meeting ID- 868150043. All attendees shall please mute their phone when not speaking and not use speaker phone. The parties shall file the proposed Scheduling Order with the Clerk's Office, and in accordance with District of Colorado Electronic Case Filing ("ECF") Procedures, no later than five business days prior to the scheduling conference. The parties shall also email the proposed Scheduling Order in Word format to Magistrate Judge Prose at #Prose_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (angar, )
October 4, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Rocky Padilla. General Motors, LLC served on 10/3/2023, answer due 10/24/2023. (Duck, Kevin)
September 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan B. Prose for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 09/26/2023. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
September 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9313511)Attorney Kevin R. Duck added to party Rocky Padilla(pty:pla), filed by Rocky Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Summons)(Duck, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rocky Padilla
Represented By: Kevin R. Duck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Daniel Scott Wittenberg
Represented By: James D.G. Snow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?