Lemmons et al v. McClure-Love
Plaintiff: Crystal K Lemmons and Kevin G Lemmons
Defendant: Gay McClure-Love
Case Number: 1:2023cv02955
Filed: November 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity - Real Property
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2023 Filing 9 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #8 Answer to Complaint filed by Gay McClure-Love. Pro se e-filer has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. All future documents must also contain a complete address block with up-to-date contact information including mailing address and telephone number.(Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 24, 2023 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Declaratory, Injunctive, And Other Relief by Gay McClure-Love.(McClure-Love, Gay)
November 21, 2023 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (norlin, )
November 20, 2023 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Gay McClure Love re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Crystal K Lemmons, Kevin G Lemmons. (Edwards, Anthony)
November 20, 2023 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Estate of Thelma McClure c/o Gay McClure Love re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiffs Crystal K Lemmons, Kevin G Lemmons. (Edwards, Anthony)
November 8, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall promptly serve Defendants. On or before January 18, 2023, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #3), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: February 1, 2024 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-203, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/8/2023. (norlin, )
November 8, 2023 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (blaws)
November 8, 2023 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
November 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Estate of Thelma McClure, Gay McClure-Love (Filing fee $ 402,Receipt Number ACODC-9384922)Attorney Anthony D. Edwards added to party Crystal K Lemmons(pty:pla), Attorney Anthony D. Edwards added to party Kevin G Lemmons(pty:pla), filed by Crystal K Lemmons, Kevin G Lemmons. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Case Sheet)(Edwards, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemmons et al v. McClure-Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal K Lemmons
Represented By: Anthony D. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin G Lemmons
Represented By: Anthony D. Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gay McClure-Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?