Pomarico v. Dillon Companies, LLC
Plaintiff: William Pomarico
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers, Kroger Central and Dillon Companies, LLC and John Doe, whose true name is inkown doing business as King Soopers also known as Kroger Central/King Soopers
Case Number: 1:2023cv02982
Filed: November 10, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2024 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Dillon Companies, LLC. (Pratt, Katherine)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/03/2024. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
December 28, 2023 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer. All future pleadings should be designated as 23-cv-02982-PAB. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 22, 2023 Filing 17 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff William Pomarico All parties do not consent. (Reinhardt, Michael) Modified on 12/26/2023 to correct docket text to match document filed (norlin, ).
December 21, 2023 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff William Pomarico. (Reinhardt, Michael)
November 30, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Defendant Dillon Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Pratt, Katherine)
November 20, 2023 Filing 14 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael D. Reinhardt on behalf of William Pomarico (Reinhardt, Michael)
November 17, 2023 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #12 Amended Complaint filed by attorney Michael D. Reinhardt Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix a complete address block with up-to-date contact information to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
November 16, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Dillon Companies, LLC Attorney Michael D. Reinhardt added to party William Pomarico(pty:pla), filed by William Pomarico.(Reinhardt, Michael)
November 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM. IT IS ORDERED that on or before January 16, 2024, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #10), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: January 30, 2024 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom C-203, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers U.S. Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall mail a copy of this Order to Plaintiff's counsel: Albert W. Northrup Bendinelli Law Firm, P.C. 9035 Wadsworth Pkwy., Sutie 4000 Westminster, CO 80021 By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 11/13/2023. (norlin, )
November 10, 2023 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. Modified on 11/17/2023 to fix date(efoga, ).
November 10, 2023 Filing 9 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. Modified on 11/17/2023 to fix date(efoga, ).
November 10, 2023 Filing 8 STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING defendant's unopposed motion for extension of time to respond to complaint to and including November 22, 2023. By Gary Michael Kramer, District Court Judge, Douglas County on 10/31/2023. Modified on 11/17/2023 to fix date(efoga, ).
November 10, 2023 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint, Summonses, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Dillon Companies LLC on 10/12/2023. Modified on 11/17/2023 to fix date (efoga, ).
November 10, 2023 Filing 6 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Dillon Companies, LLC, filed by William Pomarico. Modified on 11/17/2023 to fix date (efoga, ).
November 10, 2023 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) Modified on 11/17/2023 to fix date(efoga, ).
November 10, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chelsie Lauren Smith on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King SoopersAttorney Chelsie Lauren Smith added to party Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers(pty:dft) (Smith, Chelsie)
November 10, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Katherine M.L. Pratt on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers (Pratt, Katherine)
November 10, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Pratt, Katherine)
November 10, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers from Douglas District, Case Number 23CV30615. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9389603), filed by Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A - Complaint, #4 Exhibit B - Summons, #5 Exhibit C - Affidavit of Service, #6 Exhibit D - Unopposed Mtn for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint, #7 Exhibit E - Order Granting Defendant's Mtn for Extension of Time, #8 Exhibit F - District Court Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Exhibit G - Colorado Voter Registration, #10 Exhibit H - Cert of Good Standing & Periodic Report- Dillon Companies, LLC, #11 Exhibit I - Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement, #12 Exhibit J - Cert of Good Standing & Periodic Report - The Kroger Co., #13 Exhibit K - State Court Docket Sheet, #14 Exhibit L - Delay Reduction Order)(Pratt, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pomarico v. Dillon Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC d/b/a King Soopers
Represented By: Chelsie Lauren Smith
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Central
Represented By: Chelsie Lauren Smith
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC and John Doe, whose true name is inkown doing business as King Soopers also known as Kroger Central/King Soopers
Represented By: Chelsie Lauren Smith
Represented By: Katherine M.L. Pratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Pomarico
Represented By: Michael D. Reinhardt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?