Schoolcraft v. Dillon Companies, LLC
Plaintiff: David Schoolcraft
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC doing business as King Soopers, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2023cv03050
Filed: November 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1/9/24. (lgale, )
January 9, 2024 Filing 19 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1/9/2024. Discovery due by 7/11/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 8/9/2024. Jury Instructions, Trial Preparation and Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2025 9:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Five Day Jury Trial set for 4/28/2025 8:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Days Two through Five of Jury Trial set for 9:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. FTR: KAS Courtroom C204. (Attachments: #1 Discovery Procedures) (lgale, )
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2 January 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion #16 is GRANTED in part. Rather than appear by telephone, counsel for both sides may appear via video teleconference (VTC) at the Scheduling Conference utilizing the instructions contained herein. (cmadr, )
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PRE-SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2 January 2024. (cmadr, )
January 2, 2024 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Appear By Telephone at Scheduling Conference by Defendant Dillon Companies, LLC. (Larson, Ashley)
January 2, 2024 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Dillon Companies, LLC. (Larson, Ashley)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #13 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/21/2023. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
December 20, 2023 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Dillon Companies, LLC All parties consent.. (Larson, Ashley)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Shannon A. Hughes on behalf of Dillon Companies, LLCAttorney Shannon A. Hughes added to party Dillon Companies, LLC(pty:dft) (Hughes, Shannon)
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) shall be held on January 9, 2024, commencing at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-204, Second Floor, Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be considered unless a motion is made five (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. By Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 11/22/2023. (Attachments: #1 Instructions for Preparation of Scheduling Order, #2 Scheduling Order) (norlin, )
November 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#7] is December 26, 2023. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 11/22/2023. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
November 21, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Laura Michelle Browne on behalf of David SchoolcraftAttorney Laura Michelle Browne added to party David Schoolcraft(pty:pla) (Browne, Laura)
November 17, 2023 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Dillon Companies, LLC.(Larson, Ashley)
November 17, 2023 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Civil Cover Sheet upon Dillon Companies on 11/2/2023 (efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Dillon Companies, LLC, filed by David Schoolcraft.(efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
November 17, 2023 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. for Dillon Companies, LLC. (Larson, Ashley)
November 17, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dillon Companies, LLC from Weld County District Court, Case Number 2023CV030781. (Filing fee $ 402, Receipt Number ACODC-9401424), filed by Dillon Companies, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Larson, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schoolcraft v. Dillon Companies, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Schoolcraft
Represented By: Laura Michelle Browne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dillon Companies, LLC doing business as King Soopers, Inc.
Represented By: Ashley Ricketson Larson
Represented By: Shannon A. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?