Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.221.59
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.221.59
Case Number: 1:2024cv00161
Filed: January 19, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 2, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Before a Rule 26(f) Conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2/2/2024.(jtorr, )
January 31, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM regarding #8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Before a Rule 26(f) Conference filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/31/2024. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
January 31, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Before a Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Williamson, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Patrick Paige, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Susan B. Stalzer, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Fernandez, Jessica)
January 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b).The Court will unilaterally set the trial on a Court Term Week within 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and the parties shall be available for trial accordingly. The Court's Term Weeks can be found under the "Judicial Officers" tab for Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on the District Courts homepage (https://www.cod.uscourts.gov). Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello on 1/22/2024. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
January 19, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, )
January 19, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Senior Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
January 19, 2024 Filing 4 Report re Copyright: Report on the filing of an action emailed separately to the Director of the Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (efoga, )
January 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Fernandez, Jessica)
January 19, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Fernandez, Jessica)
January 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT - Action for Damages For Property Rights Infringement against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.221.59 (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9494493)Attorney Jessica W. Fernandez added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)(Fernandez, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.221.59
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jessica W. Fernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 24.8.221.59
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?