Daniels (PS) et al v. USA et al
Plaintiff: Danny Dermill Daniels, Kariem Qaadir Muhammad, James Jamual Famin and Daniels Muhammad
Defendant: USA, City of Denver, The and City of Aurora, The
Case Number: 1:2024cv00197
Filed: January 22, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Susan Prose
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 18 March 2024. ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #5 ) is granted. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to the Denver County Jail Business Office, Attn: Inmate Accounts. FURTHER ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #7 ) is denied as moot. (Forms mailed as ordered.) (cmadr, )
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Kariem Qaadir Muhammad. (cmadr, )
March 5, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against City of Aurora, The, City of Denver, The, USA, filed by Daniels Muhammad, Danny Dermill Daniels, James Jamual Famin, Kariem Qaadir Muhammad.(cmadr, ) (Attachment(s): #1 Attachment) (cmadr, ). Modified to correct entry on 3/8/2024 (cmadr, ).
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Kariem Qaadir Muhammad. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cmadr, )
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFFS TO CURE DEFICIENCIES by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 24 January 2024. ORDERED that Plaintiffs cure the deficiencies designated within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers filed in response to this order must be labeled with the civil action number identified on this order. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall obtain and utilize the Court-approved Prisoner Complaint form and Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 form (with the assistance of their case manager or the facility's legal assistant), along with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. These are the only appropriate filings at this time. FURTHER ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed On Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. 24 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. #2 ) is denied without prejudice with leave to refile on the correct form.(cmadr, )
January 22, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
January 22, 2024 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 in a Habeas Corpus Action by Plaintiff Kariem Qaadir Muhammad. (efoga, )
January 22, 2024 Filing 1 PRISONER COMPLAINT against City of Aurora, The, City of Denver, The, USA, filed by Daniels Muhammad, Danny Dermill Daniels, James Jamual Famin, Kariem Qaadir Muhammad.(efoga, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniels (PS) et al v. USA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny Dermill Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kariem Qaadir Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Jamual Famin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniels Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Denver, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?