Wilson v. City of Aurora
Plaintiff: Vanessa Wilson
Defendant: City of Aurora
Case Number: 1:2024cv00731
Filed: March 15, 2024
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1981 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Mary B. Gray by Mary Barham Gray on behalf of City of AuroraAttorney Mary Barham Gray added to party City of Aurora(pty:dft) (Gray, Mary)
May 7, 2024 Filing 12 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Vanessa Wilson. (Greisen, Paula)
April 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at their discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Standing Order and Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/18/2024. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
April 17, 2024 Filing 10 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to U.S. District Judge S. Kato Crews. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-00731-SKC. (Text Only Entry) (schap, )
April 16, 2024 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Vanessa Wilson All parties do not consent.. (Greisen, Paula)
April 3, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by City of Aurora. City of Aurora waiver sent on 3/27/2024, answer due 5/28/2024. (Ortiz, Holly)
April 3, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly Eileen Ortiz on behalf of City of AuroraAttorney Holly Eileen Ortiz added to party City of Aurora(pty:dft) (Ortiz, Holly)
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott Charles Medlock on behalf of Vanessa WilsonAttorney Scott Charles Medlock added to party Vanessa Wilson(pty:pla) (Medlock, Scott)
March 27, 2024 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT (First Amended) and Jury Demand against City of Aurora, filed by Vanessa Wilson.(Greisen, Paula)
March 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 3/20/2024. Consent Form due by 5/1/2024. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 5/8/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2024 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, )
March 15, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. No Summons Issued. (tgall, )
March 15, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (tgall, )
March 15, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against City of Aurora (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9590961)Attorney Paula D. Greisen added to party Vanessa Wilson(pty:pla), filed by Vanessa Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Greisen, Paula)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. City of Aurora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vanessa Wilson
Represented By: Paula D. Greisen
Represented By: Scott Charles Medlock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Aurora
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Represented By: Mary Barham Gray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?