Flores v. Mission Center Partners LLC
Plaintiff: Carlos Flores
Defendant: Mission Center Partners LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv01220
Filed: May 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12131 American with Disabilities Act (ADA- Accommodations)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Serving Plaintiff's Initial Disclosures by Plaintiff Carlos Flores (Schapiro, Douglas)
May 28, 2024 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mission Center Partners LLC. Mission Center Partners LLC waiver sent on 5/3/2024, answer due 7/2/2024. (Sweetbaum, Alan)
May 28, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alan David Sweetbaum on behalf of Mission Center Partners LLCAttorney Alan David Sweetbaum added to party Mission Center Partners LLC(pty:dft) (Sweetbaum, Alan)
May 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Deadline for Filing Election Concerning Consent/Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction Form and Setting Scheduling Conference by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 5/3/2024. Consent Form due by 7/2/2024. Joint Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/9/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 7/16/2024 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, )
May 3, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
May 2, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
May 2, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mission Center Partners LLC (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9668069)Attorney Douglas S. Schapiro added to party Carlos Flores(pty:pla), filed by Carlos Flores. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt, #2 Exhibit Selfie, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Schapiro, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores v. Mission Center Partners LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Flores
Represented By: Douglas S. Schapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mission Center Partners LLC
Represented By: Alan David Sweetbaum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?