Center for Biological Diversity v. Berger et al
Petitioner: Center for Biological Diversity
Respondent: Bureau of Land Management and Keith E. Berger
Case Number: 1:2024cv01608
Filed: June 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity. Keith E. Berger served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024; Bureau of Land Management served on 6/17/2024, answer due 7/8/2024. (Stellberg, Sarah)
June 11, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (blaws)
June 10, 2024 Filing 4 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (blaws)
June 10, 2024 Filing 3 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES re: #1 Petition, filed by attorneys Sarah K. Stellberg, Allison N. Henderson, and Andrew Hursh. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic /s/ signature followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. (Text Only Entry) (blaws)
June 10, 2024 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stellberg, Sarah)
June 10, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION for Review (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9724791)Attorney Sarah K. Stellberg added to party Center for Biological Diversity(pty:pet), filed by Center for Biological Diversity. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Keith Berger, #3 Summons BLM)(Stellberg, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Berger et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Andrew Hursh
Represented By: Allison N. Henderson
Represented By: Sarah K. Stellberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Keith E. Berger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?