Cole et al v. Somerset et al
Plaintiff: Kirby Cole and Michelle Cole
Defendant: Jason Casey, Somerset Meadows Filing 5 Homeowners Association, Inc. and Kathleen Aikin
Counter-Defendant: Kirby Cole and Michelle Cole
Counter-Claimant: Kathleen Aikin
Case Number: 1:2024cv02488
Filed: September 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 3601 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER/REPLY to #11 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Kirby Cole, Michelle Cole.(Hollington, William)
October 23, 2024 Filing 12 Defendant Jason Casey's ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint Attorney Joseph R. Kummer added to party Jason Casey(pty:dft) by Jason Casey.(Kummer, Joseph)
October 3, 2024 Filing 11 ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, Attorney Roger Garner Seat added to party Kathleen Aikin(pty:dft), ANSWER to #2 Amended Complaint, #1 Complaint, Attorney Roger Garner Seat added to party Kathleen Aikin(pty:dft), COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Kathleen Aikin.(Seat, Roger)
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 25 September 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/6/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 1/13/2025 09:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
September 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#6] is December 30, 2024. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 9/25/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
September 10, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (echa, )
September 10, 2024 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
September 10, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (echa, )
September 10, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Jason Casey by Defendants Kirby Cole, Michelle Cole. (Hollington, William)
September 10, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Kathleen Aikin by Defendants Kirby Cole, Michelle Cole. (Hollington, William)
September 10, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to SOMERSET MEADOWS FILING 5 HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. by Defendants Kirby Cole, Michelle Cole. (Hollington, William)
September 10, 2024 Filing 2 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kathleen Aikin, Jason Casey, Somerset Meadows Filing 5 Homeowners Association, Inc., filed by Michelle Cole, Kirby Cole.(Hollington, William)
September 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kathleen Aikin, Jason Casey, Somerset Meadows Filing 5 Homeowners Association, Inc. (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9864690)Attorney William Neal Hollington added to party Kirby Cole(pty:dft), Attorney William Neal Hollington added to party Michelle Cole(pty:dft), filed by Michelle Cole, Kirby Cole.(Hollington, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cole et al v. Somerset et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jason Casey
Represented By: Joseph R. Kummer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Somerset Meadows Filing 5 Homeowners Association, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen Aikin
Represented By: Roger Garner Seat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirby Cole
Represented By: William Neal Hollington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Cole
Represented By: William Neal Hollington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Kirby Cole
Represented By: William Neal Hollington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Michelle Cole
Represented By: William Neal Hollington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Kathleen Aikin
Represented By: Roger Garner Seat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?