Basalt Real Estate, LLC v. Silverpeak Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Basalt Real Estate, LLC
Defendant: Chapman Ducote and Silverpeak Corp.
Case Number: 1:2024cv02498
Filed: September 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Timothy P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 10/25/2024. Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference currently set for November 12, 2024 is reset to January 9, 2025 at 2:00 p.m.in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. (jrobe, )
October 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 10/23/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
October 22, 2024 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated at 24-cv-02498-CNS. Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
October 22, 2024 Filing 16 REASSIGNING JUDGE pursuant to #15 Minute Order. This action is randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-02498-REB. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
October 22, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to the consent form filed by the Parties declining consent under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c) [ECF #13 ], the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, and D.C.COLO.LCivR 72.1(c). By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 10/22/2024. (jtorr, )
October 21, 2024 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Basalt Real Estate, LLC. (Citron, Kenneth)
October 17, 2024 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Basalt Real Estate, LLC All parties do not consent.. (Citron, Kenneth)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge O'Hara at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-02498-TPO). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge O'Hara in Courtroom C-402. His chambers are located in Room C-452 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2740. (Text only entry) (efoga, )
October 15, 2024 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #10 Answer to Complaint filed by attorney Stephen Erik Csajaghy. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, address signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (dgumb, )
October 14, 2024 Filing 10 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Chapman Ducote, Silverpeak Corp..(Csajaghy, Stephen)
September 27, 2024 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Csajaghy, Stephen)
September 25, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen Erik Csajaghy on behalf of Chapman Ducote, Silverpeak Corp.Attorney Stephen Erik Csajaghy added to party Chapman Ducote(pty:dft), Attorney Stephen Erik Csajaghy added to party Silverpeak Corp.(pty:dft) (Csajaghy, Stephen)
September 11, 2024 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Citron, Kenneth)
September 11, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued) (dgumb, )
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: The above captioned case has been directly assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. Magistrate Consent Form due 11/5/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/5/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 11/12/2024 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/11/2024. (dgumb, )
September 11, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Silverpeak Corp., Chapman Ducote re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Basalt Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Citron, Kenneth)
September 10, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. The summons submitted are not on the court approved form, and will not be issued. Please file completed summons for the District of Colorado for issuance using the event "Summons Request". (agryan)
September 10, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
September 10, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Chapman Ducote, Silverpeak Corp. (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9865666)Attorney Kenneth E. Citron added to party Basalt Real Estate, LLC(pty:pla), filed by Basalt Real Estate, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Citron, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Basalt Real Estate, LLC v. Silverpeak Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Basalt Real Estate, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth E. Citron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chapman Ducote
Represented By: Stephen Erik Csajaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silverpeak Corp.
Represented By: Stephen Erik Csajaghy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?