Jung v. Goldman et al
Plaintiff: Jonathan Michael Jung
Defendant: Antony Blinken and Michael Goldman
Case Number: 1:2024cv02500
Filed: September 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Susan Prose
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 0706 - Judicial Review of Agency Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2024 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
October 21, 2024 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Prose. Judge Robert E. Blackburn no longer assigned to the case. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-2500-SBP. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
October 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER This case has been assigned to theAP docket in error. This case does not fall within the scope of cases subject tomanagement as an AP case under D.C.COLO. LAPR 1.1(c) governing caseschallenging an action or final decision of an administrative agency. THEREFORE, IT IS ORDERED The clerk shall assign this case to judicial officers under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 10/21/2024. (norlin, )
September 23, 2024 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed upon defendant(s) Antony Blinken served on 9/16/2024, answer due 11/15/2024; Michael Goldman served on 9/16/2024, answer due 11/15/2024. (Goldstein, Joshua)
September 11, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agryan)
September 11, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
September 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF AND PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDAMUS against Antony Blinken, Michael Goldman (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9866091)Attorney Joshua L. Goldstein added to party Jonathan Michael Jung(pty:pla), filed by Jonathan Michael Jung. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Goldstein, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jung v. Goldman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antony Blinken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Goldman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan Michael Jung
Represented By: Joshua L. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?