Platonic Systems Limited, LLC v. Jakobsson et al
Plaintiff: Platonic Systems Limited, LLC
Defendant: Erik Robert Jakobsson, Garizon, Damon Zwarich and Robert Jakobsson
Case Number: 1:2024cv02569
Filed: September 18, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Timothy P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James V. Pearson on behalf of Platonic Systems Limited, LLCAttorney James V. Pearson added to party Platonic Systems Limited, LLC(pty:pla) (Pearson, James)
October 16, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Stephen James Carbonneau on behalf of Platonic Systems Limited, LLCAttorney Stephen James Carbonneau added to party Platonic Systems Limited, LLC(pty:pla) (Carbonneau, Stephen)
October 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge O'Hara at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-02569-TPO). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge O'Hara in Courtroom C-402. His chambers are located in Room C-452 of the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse. His telephone number is 303-335-2740. (Text only entry) (efoga, )
October 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 Plaintiff's Motion to Stay for good cause shown. Accordingly, the Court stays the case until service is accomplished on the international Defendants. Any Party who wishes to lift the stay may move the Court for such relief. Further, the Court vacates the Scheduling Conference set for November 18, 2024, and all related deadlines.Finally, Plaintiff is ordered to file a status report every sixty (60) days updating the Court on the status of service, and when it is appropriate for this case to proceed. Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 10/11/24. Text Only Entry (mehlc8)
October 11, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION to Stay Proceeding to Accomplish International Service, Vacate September 19, 2024 Minute Order Deadlines, and Vacate November 18, 2024 Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Platonic Systems Limited, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document)(Myers, Kirsten)
September 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: The above captioned case has been directly assigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1. Magistrate Consent Form due 11/12/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 11/8/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2024 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9/19/2024. (dgumb, )
September 19, 2024 Filing 4 ADVISORY NOTICE TO ATTORNEY(S) AND COURT: Attorney Stephen J. Carbonneau attempted to enter his appearance on behalf of Plaintiff in this case by affixing his "s/" signature to ECF No. 1. Counsel was administratively removed from the attorney roll for failing to pay a past biennial fee. Under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), counsel's purported appearance cannot be recognized. Counsel must file a Notice of Entry of Appearance upon obtaining reinstatement to the Court's bar should he wish to participate further in any proceedings in this case. (Text Only Entry) (adubo) Modified on 9/19/2024 to edit text(dgumb, ).
September 19, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agryan)
September 18, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
September 18, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Garizon, Erik Robert Jakobsson, Damon Zwarich (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-9879381)Attorney Kirsten Z. Myers added to party Platonic Systems Limited LLC(pty:pla), filed by Platonic Systems Limited LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Consulting Agreement, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Invoices, #3 Summons Garizon, #4 Summons Jakobsson, #5 Summons Zwarich)(Myers, Kirsten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Platonic Systems Limited, LLC v. Jakobsson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erik Robert Jakobsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damon Zwarich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Jakobsson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Platonic Systems Limited, LLC
Represented By: Kirsten Z. Myers
Represented By: Stephen James Carbonneau
Represented By: James V. Pearson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?