GoFire, Inc. v. Winchester Capital Partners, LLC
Plaintiff: GoFire, Inc.
Defendant: Winchester Capital Partners, LLC
Case Number: 1:2024cv02979
Filed: October 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2024 Filing 21 BRIEF in Opposition to #18 MOTION to Remand filed by Defendant Winchester Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Anquillare Declaration, #2 Exhibit Email from D. Richards to J. Sawtelle)(Richards, Daniel)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#3] is January 15, 2025. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 12/16/2024. Text Only Entry (kaslc4,)
December 6, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Winchester Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Richards, Daniel)
November 25, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand by Plaintiff GoFire, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - 11-13-2024 Email with Counsel)(Sawtelle, James)
November 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTINGSCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 20 November 2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/22/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 1/29/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
November 15, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Cormac M. Bloomfield on behalf of Winchester Capital Partners, LLCAttorney Cormac M. Bloomfield added to party Winchester Capital Partners, LLC(pty:dft) (Bloomfield, Cormac)
November 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 13 November 2024. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint #14 is GRANTED. Defendant's deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's operative complaint is extended to December 6, 2024.(cmadr, )
November 8, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Winchester Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Richards, Daniel)
November 6, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Emily Fontelle Keimig on behalf of GoFire, Inc.Attorney Emily Fontelle Keimig added to party GoFire, Inc.(pty:pla) (Keimig, Emily)
November 6, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by James Gordon Sawtelle on behalf of GoFire, Inc.Attorney James Gordon Sawtelle added to party GoFire, Inc.(pty:pla) (Sawtelle, James)
November 6, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tara A. Bailes on behalf of GoFire, Inc.Attorney Tara A. Bailes added to party GoFire, Inc.(pty:pla) (Bailes, Tara)
November 6, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica J. Arett on behalf of GoFire, Inc.Attorney Jessica J. Arett added to party GoFire, Inc.(pty:pla) (Arett, Jessica)
October 30, 2024 Filing 9 STIPULATION Extending Defendant's Deadline to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendant Winchester Capital Partners, LLC, Plaintiff GoFire, Inc.. (Richards, Daniel)
October 25, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE re 4 Administrative Notice re Notice of Removal, Civil Docket Sheet by Defendant Winchester Capital Partners, LLC (Attachments: #1 Complaint and Jury Demand, #2 Exhibit 1 to Complaint, #3 Summons, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Procedure Order, #6 Affidavit of Service)(Richards, Daniel)
October 24, 2024 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
October 24, 2024 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
October 24, 2024 Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
October 24, 2024 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. Pursuant to Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a, each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry.) (efoga, )
October 24, 2024 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
October 24, 2024 Filing 2 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Exhibit A-1 to Notice of Removal by Defendant Winchester Capital Partners, LLC.. (Richards, Daniel)
October 24, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Winchester Capital Partners, LLC from Jefferson County District Court, Case Number 2024CV31348. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-9950586), filed by Winchester Capital Partners, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Richards, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GoFire, Inc. v. Winchester Capital Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Winchester Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Cormac M. Bloomfield
Represented By: Daniel Alexander Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GoFire, Inc.
Represented By: Tara A. Bailes
Represented By: Jessica J. Arett
Represented By: James Gordon Sawtelle
Represented By: Emily Fontelle Keimig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?