Calvert (PS) v. Allosource
Plaintiff: Chad Calvert
Defendant: Allosource
Case Number: 1:2024cv03165
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Richard T Gurley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 (e)(2)-(o)(t) - Job Discrimination (Other)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 7, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 01/06/2025. ORDERED that Plaintiff shall file, within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint, on the court-approved form, that complies with this order. If Plaintiff fails to file an amended Employment Discrimination Complaint that complies with this order within the time allowed, some or all of this action may be dismissed. (pklin, )
November 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 11/18/2024. (jrobe, )
November 15, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER LEAVE TO PROCEED UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 11/15/2024.(jrobe, )
November 14, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
November 14, 2024 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) by Plaintiff Chad Calvert. (echa, )
November 14, 2024 Filing 1 EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION COMPLAINT against Allosource, filed by Chad Calvert. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit) (echa, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calvert (PS) v. Allosource
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chad Calvert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allosource
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?