Schur v. Town of Basalt, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Jacob Schur
Defendant: Aaron Munch, Town of Basalt, Colorado, Valeria Morales and Nino Santiago
Case Number: 1:2024cv03265
Filed: November 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Cyrus Y Chung
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2025 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Jacob Schur All parties do not consent.. (Shiffler, Zachary)
January 17, 2025 Filing 13 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jacob Schur. (Shiffler, Zachary)
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to communications with parties, it is hereby ORDERED that Mr. Timothy Walsh, co-counsel for Defendant, may appear telephonically at the 1/27/2025 Scheduling Conference by dialing 571-353-2301 and then entering 198033559#. Any party appearing by telephone shall mute their telephone until the conference begins and at any time that they are not speaking. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 1/14/2025. Text Only Entry (cyclc2)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Chung at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-3265-NYW-CYC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Chung in Courtroom C-205 in the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse, 1961 Stout St, Denver, CO 80294. If previously directed to contact Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty or his Chambers, Parties shall instead contact Chung Chambers at the following telephone number or email address: 303-335-2761 and Chung_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (Text only entry) (sadhi, )
January 3, 2025 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Walsh on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Timothy Walsh added to party Town of Basalt, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Walsh added to party Aaron Munch(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Walsh added to party Valeria Morales(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy Walsh added to party Nino Santiago(pty:dft) (Walsh, Timothy)
January 3, 2025 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Nicholas Christaan Poppe on behalf of Town of Basalt, Colorado, Aaron Munch, Valeria Morales, Nino SantiagoAttorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Town of Basalt, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Aaron Munch(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Valeria Morales(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Christaan Poppe added to party Nino Santiago(pty:dft) (Poppe, Nicholas)
December 19, 2024 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Jacob Schur. Valeria Morales waiver sent on 12/9/2024, answer due 2/7/2025; Aaron Munch waiver sent on 12/9/2024, answer due 2/7/2025; Nino Santiago waiver sent on 12/9/2024, answer due 2/7/2025; Town of Basalt, Colorado waiver sent on 12/9/2024, answer due 2/7/2025. (Attachments: #1 Munch waiver, #2 Morales waiver, #3 Santiago waiver)(Shiffler, Zachary)
December 9, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (ccuen, )
November 27, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Valeria Morales re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Jacob Schur. (Shiffler, Zachary)
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER: On November 25, 2024, District Judge Nina Y. Wang referred the above-captioned case to Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. ECF 4 . Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/17/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 1/27/2025 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. It is ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify all Parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 11/26/2024. (dgumb, )
November 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the Parties by motion, this Court may direct the Parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 11/25/2024. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
November 25, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sadhi, ) Modified on 11/25/2024 data entry error (sadhi, ).
November 25, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (sadhi, )
November 25, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Valeria Morales, Aaron Munch, Nino Santiago, Town of Basalt, Colorado (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10002169)Attorney Zachary Lyon Shiffler added to party Jacob Schur(pty:pla), filed by Jacob Schur. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Town of Basalt, #3 Summons Munch, #4 Summons Morales, #5 Summons Santiago)(Shiffler, Zachary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schur v. Town of Basalt, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob Schur
Represented By: Zachary Lyon Shiffler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron Munch
Represented By: Timothy Walsh
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Basalt, Colorado
Represented By: Timothy Walsh
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valeria Morales
Represented By: Timothy Walsh
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nino Santiago
Represented By: Timothy Walsh
Represented By: Nicholas Christaan Poppe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?