Espinoza v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Aurelio Espinoza
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03341
Filed: December 2, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Regina M Rodriguez
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Joint Motion to Reset Scheduling Conference. The Court VACATES the Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2025 and associated deadlines and RESETS for 3/4/2025 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The Proposed Scheduling Order is now due 2/25/2025. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 1/14/2025. Text Only Entry(stvlc6, )
January 14, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #20 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 1/14/2025. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
January 13, 2025 Filing 20 Joint MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Stephenson, Evan)
December 26, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Stephenson, Evan)
December 18, 2024 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kylan J. King on behalf of Aurelio EspinozaAttorney Kylan J. King added to party Aurelio Espinoza(pty:pla) (King, Kylan)
December 16, 2024 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Order re Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal)(Stephenson, Evan)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Regina M. Rodriguez on 12/16/2024. Text Only Entry (rmrja)
December 13, 2024 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Judge Regina M. Rodriguez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak for all further proceedings. All Future pleading shall be designated as 24-cv-03411-RMR. Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 14 CASE REASSIGNED. All parties do not consent. Pursuant to #13 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-03341-REB. (Text Only Entry) (sphil, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Aurelio Espinoza All parties do not consent.. (Savoie, Lauren)
December 10, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Elizabeth Savoie on behalf of Aurelio EspinozaAttorney Lauren Elizabeth Savoie added to party Aurelio Espinoza(pty:pla) (Savoie, Lauren)
December 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING ELECTION CONCERNING CONSENT/NON-CONSENT TO MAGISTRATE JURISDICTION FORM AND SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/2/2024. Consent Form due by 1/22/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/29/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 2/5/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (schap, )
December 2, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Stephenson, Evan)
December 2, 2024 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
December 2, 2024 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
December 2, 2024 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. By Teri Lynn Vasquez, District Court Judge, Adams County on 11/20/2024. (efoga, )
December 2, 2024 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Aurelio Espinoza.(efoga, )
December 2, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, and Complaint and Jury Demand upon State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company on 11/5/2024, filed by Plaintiff Aurelio Espinoza (efoga, )
December 2, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND JURY DEMAND against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Aurelio Espinoza.(efoga, )
December 2, 2024 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
December 2, 2024 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
December 2, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Adams County District Court, Case Number 2024CV31635. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10011838), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 State Court - Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 State Court - Complaint, #4 State Court - Summons, #5 State Court - Affidavit of Service on State Farm, #6 State Court - Amended Complaint and Jury Demand, #7 State Court - Notice of Entry of Appearance of Evan Stephenson, #8 State Court - Order Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stephenson, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Evan Bennett Stephenson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aurelio Espinoza
Represented By: Lauren Elizabeth Savoie
Represented By: Kylan J. King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?