Long v. Blue Shield of California
Plaintiff: Jacob C. Long
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Case Number: 1:2024cv03352
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Cyrus Y Chung
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 28, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 28, 2025 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Blue Shield of California. Blue Shield of California answer due 2/19/2025. (Boehm, Kelsey)
January 28, 2025 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelsey Christine Boehm on behalf of Blue Shield of CaliforniaAttorney Kelsey Christine Boehm added to party Blue Shield of California(pty:dft) (Boehm, Kelsey)
January 20, 2025 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #13 Amended Complaint,,, by Plaintiff Jacob C. Long (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Unchanged Complaint for Amended Complaint Filing)(Long, Jacob)
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court on the amended complaint filed by the plaintiff on January 15, 2025. ECF No. #13 . Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff must file the notice and attachment required by D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1(a) on or before January 30, 2025. Failure to do so will result in the Amended Complaint, ECF No. #13 , being STRICKEN from the record. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 1/16/2025. (dgumb, )
January 15, 2025 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Shield of California, filed by Jacob C. Long. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Policy, #2 Exhibit Website Claim Form, #3 Exhibit "Claims you've submitted" List, #4 Exhibit Superbills submitted 12-11-22, #5 Exhibit Superbills submitted 3-16-23, #6 Exhibit Superbills submitted 8-23-23, #7 Exhibit EOB for 235686997100 with original voided check, #8 Exhibit Recut EOBs with New Check Numbers, #9 Exhibit EOB for 235687662800 with original voided check, #10 Exhibit Superbills submitted 10-24-23, #11 Exhibit EOB for 236482877300 with original voided check, #12 Exhibit Superbills submitted 2-2-24, #13 Exhibit EOB for 240911208800, #14 Exhibit EOB for 240910540500, #15 Exhibit Existing Processed Lone Wolf Psychotherapy Claims)(Long, Jacob)
January 6, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Chung at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-03352-CYC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Chung in Courtroom C-205 in the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse, 1961 Stout St, Denver, CO 80294. If previously directed to contact Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty or his Chambers, Parties shall instead contact Chung Chambers at the following telephone number or email address: 303-335-2761 and Chung_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (Text only entry) (schap, )
January 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: Magistrate Consent Form due 2/11/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/10/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 1/3/2025. (dgumb, )
December 19, 2024 Filing 10 Letter from Clerk of Court re: Service of Process of #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Rule 4 Service Letter, #2 Summons Issued) (dgumb, )
December 18, 2024 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (amona, )
December 18, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DRAWING CASE, by Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley on 12/18/2024. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-3352-MEH. (amona, ) Modified on 12/19/2024 to correct date (angar, ).
December 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO SE E-FILING PRIVILEGES: Plaintiff, Jacob C. Long, sought and received e-filing privileges on 12/16/2024. All further service will be effectuated electronically via CM/ECF to the email address of record. (Text Only Entry) (lrobe)
December 13, 2024 Filing 6 CASE REASSIGNED. This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Richard T. Gurley. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-3352-RTG. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
December 5, 2024 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
December 5, 2024 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all further proceedings. All future pleading shall be designated 24-cv-03352-KAS. Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). No summons issued. (efoga, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Blue Shield of California Filing Fee: $405.00Receipt Number:112624, filed by Jacob C. Long. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Waivers of Service)(efoga, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Long v. Blue Shield of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Shield of California
Represented By: Kelsey Christine Boehm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacob C. Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?