Grandview at Erie Townhomes v. Acuity
Petitioner: Grandview at Erie Townhomes
Respondent: Acuity
Case Number: 1:2024cv03357
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2025 Filing 10 REPLY in Support of Petition to Appoint Umpire for Property Insurance Appraisal by Petitioner Grandview at Erie Townhomes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Golden Forensics Estimate, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Philadelphia Ins. v. Discover Petition, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Travelers Ins. Petition, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Enclaves Umpire Status Report, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Appraiser Email Exchange, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G - David Kenyon CV, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H - Jason Pickett CV, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I - Statement of Jason Pickett, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J - Robert Fulcomer CV)(Stalcup, Matthew)
January 16, 2025 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by Acuity. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A [Steel Petition], #2 Exhibit B [Sturdevant Motion to Appoint Umpire], #3 Exhibit C [Sturdevant Minute Order], #4 Exhibit D [Sturdevant Notice of Recusal of Pickett], #5 Exhibit E [Sturdevant Renewed Motion After Pickett Recusal], #6 Exhibit F [Boehm CV], #7 Exhibit G [Mekelburg CV], #8 Exhibit H [Whipple CV], #9 Exhibit I [Lovato CV], #10 Exhibit J [Crowder CV], #11 Exhibit K [Order Appointing J. Crowder])(Gill, Ryan)
January 6, 2025 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Respondent Acuity. Acuity answer due 1/16/2025. (Gill, Ryan)
December 27, 2024 Filing 7 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Respondent Acuity. Acuity answer due 1/6/2025. (Gill, Ryan)
December 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM The above-captioned case has been directly assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c) - Direct Assignment to Magistrate Judges. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Petitioner shall promptly serve Respondent. On or before February 26, 2025, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #5 ), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: March 12, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937#. If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/6/2024. (norlin, )
December 5, 2024 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
December 5, 2024 Filing 4 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleading shall be designated 24-cv-03357-NRN Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (agryan)
December 3, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (agryan)
December 3, 2024 Filing 1 PETITION to Appoint Umpire for Property Insurance Appraisal (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10014826)Attorney Matthew E. Stalcup added to party Grandview at Erie Townhomes(pty:pet), filed by Grandview at Erie Townhomes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - Order Appointing D. Kenyon as Appraisal Umpire, #3 Exhibit 3 - D. Kenyon CV, #4 Exhibit 4 - Order Appointing J. Pickett as Umpire, #5 Exhibit 5 - Order Appointing J. Pickett as Umpire, #6 Exhibit 6 - J. Pickett CV, #7 Exhibit 7 - R. Fulcomer CV, #8 Civil Cover Sheet, #9 Summons)(Stalcup, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandview at Erie Townhomes v. Acuity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Grandview at Erie Townhomes
Represented By: Matthew E. Stalcup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acuity
Represented By: Ryan C. Gill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?