Mickel et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Molly Mickel and Alex Mickel
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2024cv03359
Filed: December 3, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 13, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: The Stipulation To Dismissal With Prejudice #17 is approved; all claims are dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own attorney fees and costs; and this case is closed. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 1/13/2025. (rebsec)
January 13, 2025 Filing 17 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Case with Prejudice by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Quick, Jordan)
December 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Notice of Settlement (ECF No. #14 ), it is hereby ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for March 20, 2025 at 9:30 a.m., and all associated deadlines, are VACATED. PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED MINUTE ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/24/2024. (tlove, )
December 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER re: #14 Notice of Settlement filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. Dismissal Paper due by 1/22/2025. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/23/2024. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
December 23, 2024 Filing 14 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The (Quick, Jordan)
December 9, 2024 Filing 13 ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The.(Samberg, Amy)
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE The above-captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter pursuant to the Order Referring Case, entered by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on December 5, 2024 (Dkt. # 11 ). Counsel shall comply with the First and Final Notice to All Attorney(s) and Unrepresented Parties in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases (Dkt. # 2 ) A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: March 20, 2025 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937#. If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/5/2024. (norlin, ) [order mailed as directed to Plaintiff's state court counsel]
December 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter: IT IS ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a)and (b), this matter is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge:(1) To convene a scheduling conference under FED. R. CIV. P. 16(b), enter a SchedulingOrder that satisfies the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, and enter such orders asappropriate to enforce the Scheduling order and resolve discovery matters; provided, furtherthat the scheduling conference, the Magistrate Judge shall advise the parties of JudgeBlackburns practice standards found at www.cod.uscourts.gov.;(2) To hear and finally determine non-dispositive matters that have been referred,subject to the exceptions found in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); and(3) To hear and make recommendations on dispositive matters that have been referredas defined in 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A).Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLOLCivR 16.6. Onthe recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the partiesby motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, asettlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 12/5/2024. Text Only Entry (rebsec)
December 4, 2024 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Group Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Indemnity Company, Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corporation for Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The. (Quick, Jordan)
December 4, 2024 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy M. Samberg on behalf of Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, TheAttorney Amy M. Samberg added to party Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The(pty:dft) (Samberg, Amy)
December 4, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jordan M. Quick on behalf of Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The (Quick, Jordan)
December 3, 2024 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint, Summons, and Blank Answer Form upon Travelers Home and Marine Insurance, The on 11/6/2024, filed by Plaintiffs Alex Mickel, Molly Mickel (efoga, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The, filed by Alex Mickel, Molly Mickel.(efoga, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
December 3, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company from County Court, La Plata County Colorado, Case Number 2024C30450. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10015621), filed by The Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quick, Jordan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mickel et al v. Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Molly Mickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Mickel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Home and Marine Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Jordan M. Quick
Represented By: Amy M. Samberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?