Hartley et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Brandin L. Dahlman and Amanda Hartley
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03422
Filed: December 10, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Timothy P O'Hara
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 20, 2025 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #4 Complaint and Jury Demand by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company.(Sullivan, Michael)
January 14, 2025 Filing 12 STATEMENT by Plaintiffs Amanda Hartley, Brandin L. Dahlman. (McGinnis, Patrick)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 01/02/2025. The Parties shall complete and file the Magistrate Judge Consent Form [ECF #6 ] on or before March 24, 2025 (two weeks before the Scheduling Conference). The Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Scheduling Conference on April 7, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. It will be an in-person proceeding. No later than seven days before the Scheduling Conference, the Parties shall (1) file their Proposed Scheduling Order onto the case docket sheet and (2) submit the proposed Scheduling Order in Word format by joint email, copying all Parties, to Chambers at #o'hara_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. Each party (who has not already done so) shall make its Rule 7.1 disclosure by the above deadline for filing the Proposed Scheduling Order, and the Parties shall confirm the basis for the Court's federal subject matter jurisdiction in their Proposed Scheduling Order. (ggill, )
December 26, 2024 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Plaintiffs Amanda Hartley, Brandin L. Dahlman. (McGinnis, Patrick)
December 24, 2024 Filing 9 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #8 Notice of Entry of Appearance, filed by attorne Chad Troy Wilson. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance as Co-Lead Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs by Chad Troy Wilson on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Chad Troy Wilson added to party Amanda Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Chad Troy Wilson added to party Brandin L. Dahlman(pty:pla) (Wilson, Chad)
December 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance as Co-Lead Counsel of Record for Plaintiffs by Patrick Connell McGinnis on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Patrick Connell McGinnis added to party Amanda Hartley(pty:pla), Attorney Patrick Connell McGinnis added to party Brandin L. Dahlman(pty:pla) (McGinnis, Patrick)
December 10, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
December 10, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy P O'Hara. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
December 10, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company, filed by Amanda Hartley, Brandin L. Dahlman.(efoga, )
December 10, 2024 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
December 10, 2024 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
December 10, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company from Weld County District Court, Case Number 2024CV31013. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10027775), filed by Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit D - Colorado Secretary of State Summary, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartley et al v. Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandin L. Dahlman
Represented By: Patrick Connell McGinnis
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Hartley
Represented By: Patrick Connell McGinnis
Represented By: Chad Troy Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allstate Vehicle and Property Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael T. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?