Birge v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Stephanie Birge
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03439
Filed: December 11, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Referring Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2025 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather)
January 9, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/5/2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 1/9/2025. (evaug)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 1/07/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
January 6, 2025 Filing 13 NOTICE Plaintiff's Disclosure of Citizenship by Plaintiff Stephanie Birge (Unger, Dylan)
December 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 12/19/2024. The Notice of Removal asserts that plaintiff is a Colorado citizen, citing the complaint. Docket No. #1 at 23. The complaint, however, states that plaintiff is a "resident" of Colorado. Docket No. #4 at 1. Residency is not the equivalent of citizenship. Whitelock v. Leatherman, 460 F.2d 507, 514 (10th Cir. 1972) ("allegations of mere 'residence' may not be equated with 'citizenship' for the purposes of establishing diversity"). Based on defendant's representation that the Court has diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, Docket No. #1 at 2-4, Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1(a)(2) requires that each party file a disclosure of its citizenship. Rule 7.1, as amended in December 2022, states that, "[i]n an action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party... must, unless the court orders otherwise, file a disclosure statement. The statement must name and identify the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party... when the action is filed in or removed to federal court." Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2)(A). "For purposes of federal diversity jurisdiction, an individual's state citizenship is equivalent to domicile." Smith v. Cummings, 445 F.3d 1254, 1259 (10th Cir. 2006). "To establish domicile in a particular state, a person must be physically present in the state and intend to remain there." Id. at 1260. On or before December 26, 2024, plaintiff Stephanie Birge shall file a disclosure statement in accordance with Rule 7.1 identifying her citizenship at the time of removal. (dgumb, )
December 17, 2024 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #9 Answer to Complaint filed by attorney Heather A. Salg. Attorney or pro se has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, address signature to all future documents.(Text Only Entry) (dgumb, )
December 17, 2024 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Salg, Heather)
December 16, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Salg, Heather)
December 16, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Stephanie Birge. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company served on 12/13/2024, answer due 1/3/2025. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Service to State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company)(Unger, Dylan)
December 12, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Dylan Cooper Unger on behalf of Stephanie BirgeAttorney Dylan Cooper Unger added to party Stephanie Birge(pty:pla) (Unger, Dylan)
December 11, 2024 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, )
December 11, 2024 Filing 5 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
December 11, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Stephanie Birge.(efoga, )
December 11, 2024 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
December 11, 2024 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
December 11, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from El Paso County, Case Number 2024cv32185. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10032794), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C - Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D - Secretary of State Summary, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E - Nursing License, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F - Register of Actions)(Salg, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birge v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather A. Salg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Birge
Represented By: Dylan Cooper Unger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?