Chaimov v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Hilary Chaimov
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03454
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 4, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2025 Filing 24 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Kust, Katherine)
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2022 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. Counsel shall also review and familiarize themselves with the Practice Standards of the Magistrate Judge assigned in the referral role in this case. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/3/2025. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Magistrate Judge Neureiter, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 2/3/2025. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
January 29, 2025 Filing 21 CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to #20 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge all parties do not consent. Case randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. All future pleadings should be designated as 24-cv-03454-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
January 29, 2025 Filing 20 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Kust, Katherine)
January 28, 2025 Filing 19 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Briana Fernald on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Briana Fernald added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Fernald, Briana)
January 16, 2025 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kust, Katherine)
December 26, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant USAA Casualty Insurance Company (Kust, Katherine)
December 20, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint by USAA Casualty Insurance Company.(Kust, Katherine)
December 18, 2024 Filing 18 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES. re: #13 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Joshua Maximon. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (ccuen, )
December 18, 2024 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Kust, Katherine)
December 18, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joshua Maximon on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Joshua Maximon added to party Hilary Chaimov(pty:pla) (Maximon, Joshua)
December 17, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Barrett Thomas Weisz on behalf of Hilary ChaimovAttorney Barrett Thomas Weisz added to party Hilary Chaimov(pty:pla) (Weisz, Barrett)
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM On or before January 30, 2025, the parties shall complete and file the Consent/Non-Consent Form (see Dkt. #9 ), indicating either unanimous consent of the parties or that consent has been declined. Please note that this date may be earlier than the default deadlines contemplated by D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4). A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: February 13, 2025 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937#. If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. Entered by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 12/13/2024. (norlin, )[order mailed to Plaintiff's state court counsel as directed]
December 13, 2024 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jessica Rae Schultz on behalf of USAA Casualty Insurance CompanyAttorney Jessica Rae Schultz added to party USAA Casualty Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Schultz, Jessica)
December 13, 2024 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against USAA Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Hilary Chaimov.(efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time for USAA Casualty Insurance Company's Response to Plaintiff's Complaint. By David H Goldberg, District Court Judge, Denver County on 12/3/2024. (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Complaint, and Coversheet upon USAA Casualty Insurance Company on 11/15/2024, filed by Plaintiff Hilary Chaimov (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against USAA Casualty Insurance Company, filed by Hilary Chaimov.(efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA Casualty Insurance Company from District Court Denver County Colorado, Case Number 2024CV33473. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10036482), filed by USAA Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - Delay Reduction Order, #5 Exhibit E - Pre-Trial Order, #6 Exhibit F - Entry of Appearance, #7 Exhibit G - Affidavit of Service, #8 Exhibit H - MEOT, #9 Exhibit I - Order Granting MEOT, #10 Exhibit J - Amended Complaint, #11 Exhibit K - Voter Registration Records, #12 Exhibit L - Colorado Sec of State Summary for USAA CIC)(Kust, Katherine)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chaimov v. USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Chaimov
Represented By: Joshua Maximon
Represented By: Barrett Thomas Weisz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Katherine K. Kust
Represented By: Jessica Rae Schultz
Represented By: Briana Fernald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?