DeHerrera et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Devon DeHerrera and Mary Romero
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03458
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2025 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Salg, Heather)
January 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 17 January 2025. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Motion to Reschedule Scheduling/Planning Conference #17 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Conference set for February 13, 2025, at 11:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to March 4, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom C-204 of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse, 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than February 25, 2025, the parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order.(cmadr, )
January 15, 2025 Filing 18 MEMORANUDUM: re #17 MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. By Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/15/2025. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
January 15, 2025 Filing 17 MOTION to Reset Scheduling Conference by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Salg, Heather)
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the parties by motion, this Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at their discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Standing Order and Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge S. Kato Crews on 1/13/2025. Text Only Entry (skcja, )
January 13, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 13 January 2025. This case was assigned to a United States Magistrate Judge pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c). The signed Consent/Non-Consent Form #14 indicates that at least one party has declined to consent. Accordingly,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (Case randomly reassigned to Judge S. Kato Crews for all further proceedings. All future pleadings shall be designated: 24-cv-03458-SKC.) (cmadr, )
January 9, 2025 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Salg, Heather)
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 2 January 2025. Scheduling Conference set for 2/13/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, ) Modified to correct entry on 1/6/2025 (cmadr, ).
January 2, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#10] is January 30, 2025. by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 1/2/2025. Text Only Entry (kaslc2, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Antonio Jose Linares de la Fuente on behalf of Devon DeHerrera, Mary RomeroAttorney Antonio Jose Linares de la Fuente added to party Devon DeHerrera(pty:pla), Attorney Antonio Jose Linares de la Fuente added to party Mary Romero(pty:pla) (Linares de la Fuente, Antonio)
December 13, 2024 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (norlin, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE. Case returned to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for all further proceedings. All future pleading shall be designated 24-cv-03458-KAS . Judge Robert E. Blackburn is no longer assigned to case. (norlin, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Angelah Vasquez. By District Court Judge, Jefferson County on 12/9/2024. (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 5 DEFENDANT STATE FARM'S ANSWER AND JURY DEMAND to #4 Complaint by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Devon DeHerrera, Mary Romero.(efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 3 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (efoga, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Jefferson County, Case Number 2024CV31268. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10036996), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, #4 Exhibit Answer and Jury Demand, #5 Exhibit State Court Notice of Removal, #6 Exhibit Voter Registration, #7 Exhibit State Farm Secretary of State, #8 Exhibit Reg of Actions, Pleadings)(Salg, Heather)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeHerrera et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Heather A. Salg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Devon DeHerrera
Represented By: Antonio Jose Linares de la Fuente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Romero
Represented By: Antonio Jose Linares de la Fuente
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?