Spoo v. IBP Asset, LLC
Plaintiff: Laurence Spoo
Defendant: IBP Asset, LLC doing business as Cutting Edge Glass
Case Number: 1:2024cv03460
Filed: December 13, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Cyrus Y Chung
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity - Employment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 29 SCHEDULING ORDER approved and entered with modifications and edits by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 2/3/2025. (babia)
February 3, 2025 Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 2/3/2025. Discovery due by 7/31/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 8/15/2025. The Scheduling Order is APPROVED and ENTERED with the modifications and edits by the Court, as stated on the record. FTR: B. Abiakam. (babia)
January 27, 2025 Filing 27 NOTICE re #8 Magistrate Judge NOTICE of Non-Consent to Magistrate Jurisdiction by Defendant IBP Asset, LLC (Baisden, W.)
January 27, 2025 Filing 26 Proposed Scheduling Order / (Revised) Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant IBP Asset, LLC. (Baisden, W.)
January 16, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to email correspondence with the parties, it is hereby ORDERED that all counsel may appear telephonically at the 2/3/2025 Scheduling Conference by dialing 571-353-2301 and then entering 198033559#. Any party appearing by telephone shall mute their telephone until the conference begins and at any time they are not speaking. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 1/16/2025. Text Only Entry (cyclc1)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #22 Plaintiff[']s Motion for Telephonice [sic] Appearance. Plaintiff's counsel may appear at the February 3, 2025 Scheduling Conference by telephone. Plaintiff's counsel shall call into the Scheduling Conference at 571-353-2301, then enter 198033559#. Counsel shall mute his or her telephone until the Scheduling Conference begins. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 1/7/2025. Text Only Entry (cyclc1)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #22 MOTION for Leave to Appear filed by Laurence Spoo. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/7/2025. Text Only Entry (dddlc9, )
January 7, 2025 Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Plaintiff Laurence Spoo. (Green, Sara)
January 7, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REASSIGNING MAGISTRATE JUDGE. This action is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung upon his appointment. All future pleadings should reference Magistrate Judge Chung at the end of the civil action number (such as 24-cv-3460-DDD-CYC). Unless otherwise ordered, the dates and times for all previously scheduled matters will be maintained and will now be handled by Magistrate Judge Chung in Courtroom C-205 in the Byron G. Rogers Courthouse, 1961 Stout St, Denver, CO 80294. If previously directed to contact Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty or his Chambers, Parties shall instead contact Chung Chambers at the following telephone number or email address: 303-335-2761 and Chung_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (Text only entry)(sadhi, )
December 24, 2024 Filing 20 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #11 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Sara A. Green. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - counsel must submit a change of contact request through the Manage my Account tab at the PACER website at https://www.pacer.gov/, pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(c) and 3.5 of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (norlin, )
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying without prejudice #17 Plaintiff's Motion for Telephonic Appearance. In light of the retirement of Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty, this matter will be reassigned to a new magistrate judge on January 6, 2024, who will thereafter conduct the Scheduling Conference in this case. As the Court does not yet have assigned telephonic call-in information for the new magistrate judge, Plaintiff's request to appear telephonically at the February 3, 2025 is denied without prejudice. Pursuant to the Uniform Civil Practice Standards for this District's Magistrate Judges, Plaintiff should renew her request by calling Chambers or by emailing Chambers and copying all counsel of record after this matter is reassigned. See D.C.COLO.MJ II(3).Entered by Chief Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/20/2024. Text Only Entry(mehlc7)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #17 Motion for Leave to Appear filed by Laurence Spoo. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/20/2024. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
December 20, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear by Plaintiff Laurence Spoo. (Green, Sara)
December 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/27/2025. Scheduling Conference reset for 2/3/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/20/2024. (dgumb, )
December 20, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to Complaint by IBP Asset, LLC.(Baisden, W.)
December 17, 2024 Filing 14 Exhibits in Support by Plaintiff Laurence Spoo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Return of Service)(Green, Sara)
December 17, 2024 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lyndsay M. Flagg on behalf of IBP Asset, LLCAttorney Lyndsay M. Flagg added to party IBP Asset, LLC(pty:dft) (Flagg, Lyndsay)
December 17, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by W. Eric Baisden on behalf of IBP Asset, LLCAttorney W. Eric Baisden added to party IBP Asset, LLC(pty:dft) (Baisden, W.)
December 17, 2024 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sara A. Green on behalf of Laurence SpooAttorney Sara A. Green added to party Laurence Spoo(pty:pla) (Green, Sara)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Proposed Scheduling Order due 1/15/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 1/23/2025 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Entered by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 12/16/2024. (dgumb, )
December 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/13/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
December 13, 2024 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (echa, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 6 ADMINISTRATIVE NOTICE to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. Pursuant to Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a, each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry.) (echa, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 5 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (echa, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (echa, )
December 13, 2024 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Installed Building Products, Inc. for IBP Asset, LLC. (Baird, John)
December 13, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John Mark Baird on behalf of IBP Asset, LLC (Baird, John)
December 13, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by IBP Asset, LLC d/b/a Cutting Edge Glass from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2024CV33430. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10037862), filed by IBP Asset, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Denver County District Court Pleadings, #2 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Baird, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spoo v. IBP Asset, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IBP Asset, LLC doing business as Cutting Edge Glass
Represented By: John Mark Baird
Represented By: W. Eric Baisden
Represented By: Lyndsay M. Flagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Spoo
Represented By: Sara A. Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?