Louder v. SAFECO Insurance Company of America et al
Plaintiff: Brandon Louder
Defendant: SAFECO Insurance Company of America and American Economy Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03471
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathryn A Starnella
Referring Judge: Charlotte N Sweeney
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella on 23 January 2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 3/31/2024. Scheduling Conference set for 4/7/2025 10:30 AM in Courtroom C204 before Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (cmadr, )
January 17, 2025 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of J.R. Williams, for the Plaintiff by Sebastian Patricio Melo-Ortiz on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Melo-Ortiz, Sebastian)
December 17, 2024 Filing 15 Defendants' ANSWER to #9 Complaint by SAFECO Insurance Company of America, American Economy Insurance Company.(Spano, Brian)
December 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Additionally, the parties are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Uniform Civil Practice Standards of both judicial officers assigned to this case which can be found #here. By Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney on 12/16/24. Text Only Entry (jdyne)
December 16, 2024 Filing 13 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (sadhi, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendants SAFECO Insurance Company of America, American Economy Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Register of Actions)(Spano, Brian)
December 16, 2024 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint and Jury Demand, and Summons upon SAFECO Insurance Company on 11/27/2024, filed by Plaintiff Brandon Louder. (sadhi, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint, District Court Civil Case Cover Sheet for Initial Pleading of Complaint and Jury Demand, and Summons upon American Economy Insurance Company on 11/27/2024, filed by Plaintiff Brandon Louder. (sadhi, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 9 COMPLAINT against American Economy Insurance Company, SAFECO Insurance Company of America, filed by Brandon Louder.(sadhi, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly C. White on behalf of SAFECO Insurance Company of America, American Economy Insurance CompanyAttorney Holly C. White added to party SAFECO Insurance Company of America(pty:dft), Attorney Holly C. White added to party American Economy Insurance Company(pty:dft) (White, Holly)
December 16, 2024 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance for Plaintiff Brandon Louder by Sebastian Patricio Melo-Ortiz on behalf of Brandon LouderAttorney Sebastian Patricio Melo-Ortiz added to party Brandon Louder(pty:pla) (Melo-Ortiz, Sebastian)
December 16, 2024 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for American Economy Insurance Company. (Spano, Brian)
December 16, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group Inc. for SAFECO Insurance Company of America. (Spano, Brian)
December 16, 2024 Filing 4 ADMINISTRATIVE REMINDER to Filer. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1 and 28 U.S.C. Section 1446a when filing a Notice of Removal. (Text only entry.) (sadhi, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Charlotte N. Sweeney and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathryn A. Starnella. Text Only Entry. (sadhi, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawals of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (sadhi, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by American Economy Insurance Company, SAFECO Insurance Company of America from District Court, County of Denver, State of Colorado, Case Number 2024CV33443. (Filing fee $ 405, Receipt Number ACODC-10040304), filed by American Economy Insurance Company, SAFECO Insurance Company of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Exhibit B - Returns of Service, #4 Exhibit C - Summons, #5 Exhibit D - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Spano, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Louder v. SAFECO Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Louder
Represented By: Sebastian Patricio Melo-Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SAFECO Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Holly C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Economy Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian John Spano
Represented By: Holly C. White
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?