Foundry Loveland Metropolitan District v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Foundry Loveland Metropolitan District
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv03481
Filed: December 16, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Joint Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference. The Court RESETS the Scheduling Conference to 4/29/2025 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/22/2025. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 2/12/2025. Text Only Entry(stvlc6, )
February 12, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #11 Joint Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify #5 Order to Reschedule Scheduling Conference filed by Travelers Indemnity Company. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 2/12/2025. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
February 10, 2025 Filing 11 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify #5 Order, to Reschedule Scheduling Conference by Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla)
February 5, 2025 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (O'Brien Williams, Geri)
February 5, 2025 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla)
January 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING #7 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company must answer or otherwise respond to #1 Complaint on or before 2/28/2025. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 1/28/2025. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
January 22, 2025 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint,,, by Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company. (Scroggins-Uptigrove, Kayla)
January 10, 2025 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Foundry Loveland Metropolitan District. Travelers Indemnity Company served on 1/8/2025, answer due 1/29/2025. (O'Brien Williams, Geri)
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 12/17/2024. Proposed Scheduling Order due 2/12/2025. Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2025 11:30 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (sphil, )
December 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 12/17/2024. Text Only Entry. (rkeec)
December 17, 2024 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
December 16, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Indemnity Company (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10041645)Attorney Geri A. O'Brien Williams added to party Foundry Loveland Metropolitan District(pty:pla), filed by Foundry Loveland Metropolitan District. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Maintenance Agreement for Foundry Public Plaza, #2 Exhibit 2 - Travelers Insurance Policy, #3 Exhibit 3 - Complaint, #4 Exhibit 4 - Amended Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - 1st Tender and Denial (Jan. 2024 - Mar. 2024), #6 Exhibit 6 - 2nd Tender and Denial Response (April 2024 - June 2024), #7 Exhibit 7 - Order Regarding Trinity Hearing, #8 Summons on Defendant Travelers Indemnity Company, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(O'Brien Williams, Geri)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foundry Loveland Metropolitan District v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Kayla L. Scroggins-Uptigrove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Foundry Loveland Metropolitan District
Represented By: Geri A. O'Brien Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?