Mitchell v. Food Bank of the Rockies
Plaintiff: Cindy Mitchell
Defendant: Food Bank of the Rockies
Case Number: 1:2025cv00217
Filed: January 21, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Timothy P O'Hara
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 ag - Fed. Question - Employment Discrimination (Age)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 26, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2025 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cindy Mitchell. Food Bank of the Rockies waiver sent on 2/25/2025, answer due 4/28/2025. (Ray, Adam)
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER By Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara on 02/26/2025. Scheduling Conference on May 21, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom C-402, on the fourth floor of the Byron G. Rogers United States Courthouse located at 1929 Stout Street, Denver, Colorado. This will be an in-person proceeding. No later than seven days before the Scheduling Conference, the Parties shall (1) file their Proposed Scheduling Order onto the case docket sheet and (2) jointly email a Word copy of the proposed Scheduling Order, copying all Parties, to Chambers at #o'hara_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. (ggill, )
January 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. O'Hara for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the Parties by motion, this Court may direct the Parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 01/23/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc2, )
January 22, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (eluce, )
January 22, 2025 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge Timothy P. OHara. Text Only Entry. (eluce, )
January 21, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Food Bank of the Rockies (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10102541)Attorney Adam William Ray added to party Cindy Mitchell(pty:pla), filed by Cindy Mitchell. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ray, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mitchell v. Food Bank of the Rockies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cindy Mitchell
Represented By: Adam William Ray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Food Bank of the Rockies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?