Rojas-Martinez v. Noem et al
Plaintiff: Catalina Rojas-Martinez
Defendant: Kristi Noem, Kika Scott, David Douglas and Andrew Lambrecht
Case Number: 1:2025cv00499
Filed: February 15, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: APA Review/Appeal
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 3, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 3, 2025 Filing 5 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alicia Megan Alvero Koski on behalf of Kristi Noem, Kika Scott, David Douglas, Andrew LambrechtAttorney Alicia Megan Alvero Koski added to party Kristi Noem(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Megan Alvero Koski added to party Kika Scott(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Megan Alvero Koski added to party David Douglas(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Megan Alvero Koski added to party Andrew Lambrecht(pty:dft) (Alvero Koski, Alicia)
February 28, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PREPARATION OF JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 2/28/2025. (norlin, )
February 18, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (sadhi, )
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (sadhi, )
February 15, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against David Douglas, Andrew Lambrecht, Kristi Noem, Kika Scott (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10156765)Attorney Fred R. Hartman added to party Catalina Rojas-Martinez(pty:pla), filed by Catalina Rojas-Martinez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons for Kristi Noem, #3 Summons for Kika Scott, #4 Summons for David Douglas, #5 Summons for Andrew Lambrecht)(Hartman, Fred)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rojas-Martinez v. Noem et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catalina Rojas-Martinez
Represented By: Fred R. Hartman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristi Noem
Represented By: Alicia Megan Alvero Koski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kika Scott
Represented By: Alicia Megan Alvero Koski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Douglas
Represented By: Alicia Megan Alvero Koski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Lambrecht
Represented By: Alicia Megan Alvero Koski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?