Villavicencio v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Plaintiff: Lilliam Villavicencio
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Case Number: 1:2025cv00530
Filed: February 18, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Maritza Dominguez Braswell
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 17, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 17, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER: The Court construes the parties' statements in the #14 Proposed Scheduling Order as a motion to stay, and grants the motion. Discovery is stayed pending mediation. The parties are directed to file a Joint Status Report ("JSR") on or before July 21, 2025. If the matter is resolved, the JSR should propose a deadline to file a stipulation of dismissal. If the matter is not resolved, the JSR should propose a new Proposed Scheduling Order deadline and advise the Court on what informal discovery was conducted in preparation of the mediation. Finally, the Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE the #14 Proposed Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 4/17/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
April 15, 2025 Filing 14 STRICKEN Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Nunez, Jennifer) Modified on 4/18/2025 Pleadings stricken pursuant to [#15] Minute Order. (sphil, ).
April 7, 2025 Filing 13 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Nunez, Jennifer)
April 1, 2025 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jennifer Rose Nunez on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLCAttorney Jennifer Rose Nunez added to party Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft) (Nunez, Jennifer)
March 19, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #10 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 3/19/2025. Text Only Entry (pabsec, )
March 17, 2025 Filing 10 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC All parties consent.. (Porcaro, Jill)
March 5, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER granting #7 Unopposed Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC to File Responsive Pleading. The deadline for Defendant to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to April 7, 2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 3/5/2025. Text Only Entry (mdblc5)
March 5, 2025 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Porcaro, Jill)
March 5, 2025 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Porcaro, Jill)
March 5, 2025 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Defendant's Counsel by Jill Ann Porcaro on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLCAttorney Jill Ann Porcaro added to party Lowe's Home Centers, LLC(pty:dft) (Porcaro, Jill)
February 26, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lilliam Villavicencio. All Defendants. (Whitney, Benjamin)
February 24, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. Consent Form due by 4/16/2025. Proposed Scheduling Order due 4/16/2025. By Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell on 2/24/2025. (evaug)
February 19, 2025 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (efoga, )
February 18, 2025 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Maritza Dominguez Braswell. Text Only Entry (efoga, )
February 18, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10160447)Attorney Benjamin C. Whitney added to party Lilliam Villavicencio(pty:pla), filed by Lilliam Villavicencio. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Complaint - Amended Charge of Discrimination, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Complaint - Determination and Notice of Rights, #3 Summons Summons on Lowes's Home Centers, LLC)(Whitney, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Villavicencio v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilliam Villavicencio
Represented By: Benjamin C. Whitney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers, LLC
Represented By: Jill Ann Porcaro
Represented By: Jennifer Rose Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?