Metronome LLC v. Floyd's of Leadville
Plaintiff: Metronome LLC
Defendant: Floyd's of Leadville, Valued Inc. formerly known as Floyds of Leadville Inc. doing business as Floyd's of Leadville and Floyds of Leadville Inc.
Case Number: 1:2025cv00624
Filed: February 26, 2025
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1338 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2025 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Valued Inc., filed by Metronome LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 23, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER: Because the Court struck Plaintiff's first attempt to amend its complaint, see [Doc. #13 , 14 ], Plaintiff is directed to file a clean copy of its Amended Complaint, [Doc. 15-1], to the extent it still wishes to amend. The deadline for Defendants to respond to the amended complaint will be set by the date of the filing of the clean copy. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/23/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc8, )
April 17, 2025 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiff Metronome LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Red-lined First Amended Complaint)(Rabicoff, Isaac)
April 15, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's #13 Amended Complaint is STRICKEN for failure to comply with D.C.COLO.LCivR 15.1. Local Rule 15.1(a) requires a party amending its pleading to "file a separate notice of filing the amended pleading and... attach as an exhibit a copy of the amended pleading which strikes through... the text to be deleted and underlines... the text to be added." This requirement applies even when a party amends its pleading as a matter of course pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 15(a)(1). See id. On or before April 22, 2025, if Plaintiff wishes to amend as a matter of course, it shall file an amended pleading and a separate notice of amendment and redlined copy in compliance with Local Rule 15.1(a). By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/15/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc8, )
April 10, 2025 Filing 13 STRICKEN - AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR PATENT INFRINGEMENT against Valued Inc. f/k/a Floyds of Leadville Inc. d/b/a Floyd's of Leadville, filed by Metronome LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Rabicoff, Isaac) Modified on 4/23/2025 pursuant to 16 Minute Order (norlin, ).
March 24, 2025 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Metronome LLC. Floyd's of Leadville waiver sent on 3/21/2024, answer due 5/20/2024. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
February 27, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 2/27/2025. The above-captioned case has been referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter pursuant to the Order Referring Case, entered by Judge Nina Y. Wang on February 26, 2025 (ECF No. 10 ). Plaintiff shall promptly serve Defendant. A Scheduling/Planning Conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.16(b) shall be held on: May 22, 2025 at 11:30 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado 80294. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. Five minutes prior to the start of the hearing, the parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (571) 353-2301, Access Code 841686937#. If this date is not convenient for any counsel/pro se party, he/she should confer with opposing counsel/pro se party and file a motion to reschedule the conference to a more convenient date. Absent exceptional circumstances, no request for rescheduling any appearance in this court will be entertained unless a motion is filed no less than FIVE (5) business days in advance of the date of appearance. PLEASE READ ATTACHED ORDER. (norlin, )
February 26, 2025 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE: This case is referred to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, and (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the request of the Parties by motion, this Court may direct the Parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Alternatively, the Magistrate Judge, at his discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. Counsel for the Parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Practice Standards, as well as the Practice Standards of the assigned Magistrate Judge. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 2/26/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc7, )
February 26, 2025 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (echa, )
February 26, 2025 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (echa, )
February 26, 2025 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Nina Y. Wang and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (echa, )
February 26, 2025 Filing 6 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (echa, )
February 26, 2025 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Floyd's of Leadville by Plaintiff Metronome LLC. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
February 26, 2025 Filing 4 NOTICE of Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark by Plaintiff Metronome LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
February 26, 2025 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
February 26, 2025 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Isaac P. Rabicoff by Isaac Philip Rabicoff on behalf of Metronome LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
February 26, 2025 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Floyd's of Leadville (Filing fee $ 405,Receipt Number ACODC-10177875)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Metronome LLC(pty:pla), filed by Metronome LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Patent 9,095,563, #2 Exhibit 2 - Chart for Patent 9,095,563, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Metronome LLC v. Floyd's of Leadville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metronome LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyd's of Leadville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valued Inc. formerly known as Floyds of Leadville Inc. doing business as Floyd's of Leadville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Floyds of Leadville Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?