Betts v. Archuleta et al

Petitioner: Donald Lane Betts
Respondent: Lou Archuleta and Cynthia Coffman
Case Number: 2:2004cv02542
Filed: September 30, 2015
Court: Colorado District Court
Office: Denver Office
County: Fremont
Presiding Judge: Gordon P. Gallagher
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 4, 2016 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER dismissing this action, and denying leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 3/4/16. No certificate of appealability will issue. (dkals, )
December 11, 2015 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE SUPPLEMENT TO PRE-ANSWER RESPONSE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 12/11/15. (dkals, )
December 1, 2015 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTION by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/1/15. (dkals, ) Modified on 12/1/2015 to attach correct pdf (dkals, ).
November 17, 2015 10 Opinion or Order of the Court MINUTE ORDER denying 9 "Motion for Adjudication of the Merits on the CLAIM Presented" by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/17/15.(dkals, )
November 10, 2015 8 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO FILE PRE-ANSWER RESPONSE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 11/10/15. (dkals, )
October 14, 2015 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE PRE-ANSWER RESPONSE by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 10/14/15. (dkals, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Betts v. Archuleta et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Donald Lane Betts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Lou Archuleta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Cynthia Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?