CRG CONSTRUCTION, INC. v. BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Plaintiff: CRG CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Case Number: 2:2012cv00577
Filed: March 6, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
County: La Plata
Presiding Judge: Lewis T. Babcock
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1330
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER: Pursuant to the 58 Stipulated Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice, this matter shall be dismissed with prejudice, each party to pay their own fees and costs, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 1/22/2014. (eseam)
November 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 57 MINUTE ORDER granting 56 Defendant's Notice of Withdrawal of Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Withdrawing 51 Defendant's Second Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 11/6/2013. (eseam)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER: Case schedule modified, no further extensions will be granted. by Magistrate Judge Boyd N. Boland on 6/20/13. (bnbcd, )
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER approving 33 Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge. Granting 24 Plaintiff's Uncontested Motion to Amend Scheduling Order. The final pretrial conference set for 4/5/2013 at 9:00 AM and the trial set for 5/6/2013 are vacated. Discovery due by 6/14/2013. Dispositive Motions due by 6/14/2013, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 12/13/2012. (eseam)
September 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Minute ORDER granting 20 Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Answer and Counterclaim. The tendered First Amended Answer and Counterclaim 21 is accepted for filing, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 9/6/12.(lygsl, )
May 30, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference set for 7/11/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom C401 before Judge Lewis T. Babcock, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/30/12. (lswsl, )
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CRG CONSTRUCTION, INC. v. BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CRG CONSTRUCTION, INC.
Represented By: Kenneth Scott Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BP AMERICA PRODUCTION COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?