The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation
Debtor: The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation
Us Trustee: U. S. Trustee
Not Classified By Court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Case Number: 2:2021bk20687
Filed: July 15, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: James J Tancredi
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 234 Order Authorizing the Debtor to Retain and Employ Brown Jacobson PC as Special Counsel Effective as of the Petition Date. (RE: #141). (Watson, Lisa)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 233 Order Approving Application to Employ Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors (RE: #151). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 10, 2021 Filing 232 Request for Transcript Sent Fiore Reporting and Transcription (RE: #219 Request for Transcript filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing held on September 9, 2021. (DeNicola, Donna)
September 10, 2021 Filing 231 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #112 Application to Employ Robinson & Cole LLP filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 9/14/2021 at 04:00 PM. Certificate of Service due by 9/13/2021. (DeNicola, Donna)
September 10, 2021 Filing 230 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 9/23/2021 at 04:00 PM. Certificate of Service due by 9/16/2021. (DeNicola, Donna)
September 10, 2021 Filing 219 Request for Transcript (RE:)#132 Notice of Hearing, #142 Notice of Hearing, #145 Notice of Hearing, #155 Notice of Hearing, #179 Notice of Hearing Hearing held on 09/09/21 Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor Transcription Service Requested: Fiore Reporting and Transcription (Birney, Patrick)
September 9, 2021 Filing 235 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/9/2021 2:07:05 PM ]. File Size [ 87565 KB ]. Run Time [ 04:03:14 ]. (courtspeak).
September 9, 2021 Filing 229 Hearing Held. Order granting to enter, subject to submission of a revised Proposed Order due on or before September 14, 2021 by 5:00 pm (RE: #177 Motion for Protective Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 228 Hearing Held. Order Approving to enter (RE: #151 Application to Employ Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. filed by Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 227 Hearing Held. Order approving to enter (RE: #141 Application to Employ Brown Jacobson PC filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 226 Hearing held. Order approving to enter, subject to the submission of a revised Proposed Order due on or before September 14, 2021 at 5:00 PM (RE: #138 Application to Employ B. Riley Advisory Services as Financial Advisor filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 225 Hearing Held and Continued pursuant to statements made on the record (RE: #112 Application to Employ Robinson & Cole LLP filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 9/14/2021 at 04:00 PM. (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 224 Hearing Held. Order approving to enter; subject to the submission of a revised Proposed Order on or before September 14, 2021 at 5:00 PM (RE: #111 Application to Employ Ice Miller LLP filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 223 Hearing Held. Order granting to enter, subject to submission of a revised Proposed Order due on or before September 14, 2021 by 5:00 pm (RE: #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 222 Hearing Held. Order Granting to enter, subject to the Court reviewing the language of the Final Order (RE: #18 Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto; (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (III) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 221 Hearing Held. Order granting to enter, subject to submission of a revised Proposed Order due on or before September 14, 2021 by 5:00 pm (RE: #15 Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures; (II) Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement; and (III) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 220 Hearing Held. Order granting to enter, subject to the Court reviewing the form of the Order (RE: #14 Motion for Order for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtor's Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 218 Hearing Held and Continued pursuant to statements made on the record. Second Interim Order to enter, subject to the Court's review (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 9/23/2021 at 04:00 PM. (DeNicola, Donna)
September 9, 2021 Filing 217 Notice of Filing of Amended Proposed Final Order on Debtor's Utility Motion Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #209 Notice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Amended Proposed Final Utility Provider Adequate Assurance Order #2 Exhibit B - Redline) (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 216 Notice of Agenda for Video Hearing Scheduled for September 9, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 215 Motion for Order Notice of Contested Matter re The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation's Motion for Entry of an Order (I) to Redact Certain Information Filed in Support of the Debtor's Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention of Robinson & Cole LLP as Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021 and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. Contested Matter Response(s) due by 9/22/2021. (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 214 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Amended Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 213 Supplemental Document Second Supplemental Declaration of Wayne P. Weitz in Support of Application of the Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of B. Riley Advisory Services as Financial Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #138 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 212 Supplemental Document Second Supplemental Declaration of Louis T. DeLucia in Support of Debtor's Application or Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention of Ice Miller LLP as Counsel for the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021, and Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #111 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 211 Supplemental Document Supplemental Declaration of Patrick M. Birney in Support of Debtor's Application for Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention of Robinson & Cole LLP as Counsel for the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021 and Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #112 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 210 Reply to (related document(s): #111 Application to Employ Debtors Application for Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention of Ice Miller LLP as Counsel for the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021 and Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #112 Application to Employ Debtor's Application for an Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention of Robinson & Cole LLP as Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021 Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and Granting Related Relief138 Application to Employ Application of the Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of B. Riley Advisory Services as as Financial Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #141 Application to Employ Application of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Brown Jacobson PC as as Special Corporate Counsel Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Nor filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation)DEBTOR'S OMNIBUS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF APPLICATIONS FOR ORDERS AUTHORIZING AND APPROVING THE EMPLOYMENT AND RETENTION OF (I) ICE MILLER LLP AND ROBINSON & COLE LLP AS CO-COUNSEL TO THE DEBTOR; (II) B. RILEY ADVISORY SERVICES AS FINANCIAL ADVISOR TO THE DEBTOR; AND (III) BROWN JACOBSON PC AS SPECIAL COUNSEL TO THE DEBTOR NUNC PRO TUNC TO JULY 15, 2021, PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. SECTION 327, AND GRANTING RELATED RELIEF Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #111 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #112 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #138 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #141 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 209 Notice of Filing Proposed Orders on First and Second Day Motions Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #18 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #59 Order on Motion for Order, #61 Order on Motion to Pay, #74 Order, #180 Order). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 #2 Exhibit 2 #3 Exhibit 3 #4 Exhibit 4 #5 Exhibit 5) (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 208 Supplemental Document Declaration of Wayne P. Weitz in Support of First and Second Day Motions and in Reply to United States Trustee's Objections Thereto Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #207 Reply filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 207 Reply to (related document(s): #12 Affidavit filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #13 Motion to Pay Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorize Debtor to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Comp filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtor's Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #15 Motion for Order Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures; (II) Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement; and (III) Grant filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #18 Motion for Order Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto; (II) Renew, Amend, filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibi filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation)DEBTOR'S BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF FIRST AND SECOND DAY MOTIONS AND IN REPLY TO UNITED STATES TRUSTEE'S OBJECTIONS THERETO Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #12 Affidavit filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #18 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
September 8, 2021 Filing 206 Affidavit of Service re: Interim Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, Peoples United Bank, National Association Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #154 Order on Motion for Order). (Garabato, Sid)
September 7, 2021 Filing 205 Affidavit of Service re: Interim Order Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto and (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (III) Granting Related Relief; and Notice of Entry of Interim Order Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto and (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #180 Order, #201 Notice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
September 7, 2021 Filing 204 Affidavit of Service re: Amended Declaration of Wayne P. Weitz in Support of Application of the Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of B. Riley Advisory Services as Financial Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date; Order Authorizing and Approving the Application of the Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employmentof [sic] B. Riley Advisory Services as Financial Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date; and Supplemental Declaration of Michael E. Driscoll in Support of Application of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing it to Retain and Employ Brown Jacobson PC as Special Counsel Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #188 Supplemental Document filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #190 Supplemental Document filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #191 Supplemental Document filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
September 7, 2021 Filing 203 Affidavit of Service re: Affidavits of Verification of Publication for the Notice of Commencement in the National Catholic Register and in the National Catholic Reporter Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #54 Meeting of Creditors). (Garabato, Sid)
September 7, 2021 Filing 202 Objection Filed by Honor S. Heath on behalf of The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Creditor, (RE: #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Heath, Honor)
September 3, 2021 Filing 201 Notice of Entry of Interim Order Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered Into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto and (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #18 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #149 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing, #180 Order). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Birney, Patrick)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 Order Granting Consented to Motion for Extension of Time to September 7, 2021 at 12:00 PM, to File Any Objections of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to the Hearing Motions (RE:#193). (DeNicola, Donna)
September 2, 2021 Filing 199 U.S. Trustee's Statement of Qualified No Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #141 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Mackey, Steven)
September 2, 2021 Filing 198 U.S. Trustee's Statement Concerning the Retention Application for Ice Miller LLP Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #111 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Mackey, Steven)
September 2, 2021 Filing 197 U.S. Trustee's Statement of Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #138 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Mackey, Steven)
September 2, 2021 Filing 196 U.S. Trustee's Statement of Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #112 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Mackey, Steven)
September 2, 2021 Filing 195 Objection Filed by Holley L. Claiborn on behalf of U. S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #18 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Claiborn, Holley)
September 2, 2021 Filing 194 Affidavit of Service re: Monthly Operating Report; Supplemental Declaration of Louis T. Delucia in Support of Debtors Application for Order Authorizing and Approvingthe [sic] Employment and Retention of Ice Miller LLPas [sic] Counsel for the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021, and Granting Related Relief; and Joint Motion to Approve Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order Between the Debtor and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #174 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #175 Supplemental Document filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #177 Motion for Protective Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
September 2, 2021 Filing 193 Motion to Extend Time to File Any Objection of the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors to the Hearing Motions to September 7, 2021 at 12:00 p.m. (Consented To) Filed by Eric A. Henzy on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Henzy, Eric)
September 1, 2021 Filing 192 Affidavit of Service re: Application of the Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of B. Riley Advisory Services as Financial Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date; Notice of Hearing; Application of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Brown Jacobson PC as Special Corporate Counsel Effective as of the Petition Date; and Notice of Hearing Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #138 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #141 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #142 Notice of Hearing, #145 Notice of Hearing). (Garabato, Sid)
September 1, 2021 Filing 191 Supplemental Document Supplemental Declaration of Michael E. Driscoll in Support of Application of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing it to Retain and Employ Brown Jacobson PC as Special Counsel Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #141 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
September 1, 2021 Filing 190 Supplemental Document Proposed Order Authorizing and Approving the Application of the Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of B. Riley Advisory Services as Financial Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #138 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #188 Supplemental Document filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
September 1, 2021 Filing 189 Meeting of Creditors Continued due to debtor to provide additional information and allow parties to review amendments to schedules and SOFA filed today. Debtor Appeared. Attorney For Debtor Appeared. Testimony Taken. Filed by U.S. Trustee. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 9/20/2021 at02:00 PM. DUE TO COVID-19 THE MEETING OF CREDITORS WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. Continued For Testimony and Requested Documents. (Claiborn, Holley)
September 1, 2021 Filing 188 Supplemental Document Amended Declaration of Wayne P. Weitz in Support of Application of the Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of B. Riley Advisory Services as Financial Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #138 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
September 1, 2021 Filing 187 Certificate of Service Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Creditor Committee, (RE: #151 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, #155 Notice of Hearing). (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 1, 2021 Filing 186 Affidavit of Service re: Affidavits of Verification of Publication for the Notice of Commencement in the Day Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #54 Meeting of Creditors). (Garabato, Sid)
September 1, 2021 Filing 185 Affidavit of Service re: Second Interim Order Granting Motion of Debtor for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief; Notice of Hearing; and Notice of Entry of Second Interim Order on Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance Of Payment For Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #178 Order, #179 Notice of Hearing, #181 Notice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
September 1, 2021 Filing 184 Amended Statements - Amended Statement of Financial Affairs. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #137 Statement of Financial Affairs filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
September 1, 2021 Filing 183 Amended Schedules AB, D, EF, G, H,. Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals and Amended Schedule Fee Amount $32. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
September 1, 2021 Filing 182 Affidavit of Service re: Order Authorizing Debtor to Retain and Employ Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent as of the Petition Date Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #168 Order on Application to Employ). (Garabato, Sid)
September 1, 2021 Receipt of Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors(21-20687) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00) filing fee - $ 32.00. Receipt number 9913680. (U.S. Treasury)
August 31, 2021 Filing 181 Notice of Entry of Second Interim Order on Debtor's Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #178 Order). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C) (Birney, Patrick)
August 31, 2021 Filing 180 Interim Order Authorizing Debtor To (I) Continue Insurance Coverage And Insurance Programs Entered Into Prepetition And Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto And (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, Or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (III) Granting Related Relief ((RE: #18 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Watson, Lisa)
August 30, 2021 Filing 179 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #177 Motion for Protective Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 9/9/2021 at 02:00 PM. Certificate of Service due by 9/2/2021. (Watson, Lisa)
August 30, 2021 Filing 178 Second Interim Order Granting Motion of Debtor for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form Of Adequate Assurance Of Payment To Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures For Determining Adequate Assurance Of Payment For Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers From Altering, Refusing, Or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief (RE: #19 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Watson, Lisa)
August 30, 2021 Filing 177 Motion for Protective Order Joint Motion to Approve Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order Between the Debtor and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Birney, Patrick)
August 30, 2021 Filing 176 Notice of Appearance and, Request for Notices Filed by Jon P. Newton on behalf of Saint Bernard School Interested Party, . (Newton, Jon)
August 28, 2021 Filing 175 Supplemental Document Supplemental Declaration of Louis T. DeLucia and Amended Disclosure Statement Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #111 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 (Amended Disclosure Statement)) (Birney, Patrick)
August 27, 2021 Filing 174 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 07/31/2021 Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
August 27, 2021 Filing 173 Transcript . Hearing held on 7/30/21 Requested by Patrick M. Birney Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the judicial conference, viewing of a transcript is restricted for 90 days from the file date. Transcripts will be available for viewing only at the clerk's office during the 90 day period or may be purchased from the court transcriber. For more information contact the Clerk's Office. The following deadlines apply: Redaction Request due By 09/17/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission due By 09/28/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/29/2021. (Fiore Reporting Service, LLC)
August 24, 2021 Filing 172 Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #54 Meeting of Creditors). (Garabato, Sid)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 Affidavit of Service re: Interim Order Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto and (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (III) Granting Related Relief; Order Authorizing Debtor to Retain and Employ Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent as of the Petition Date; and Notice of Filing of Proposed and Second Interim Order Granting Motion of Debtor for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #158 Proposed Order Requested by Judge filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #164 Proposed Order Requested by Judge filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #165 Proposed Order Requested by Judge filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
August 24, 2021 Filing 170 Transcript . Hearing held on 8/10/21 Requested by Patrick M. Birney Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the judicial conference, viewing of a transcript is restricted for 90 days from the file date. Transcripts will be available for viewing only at the clerk's office during the 90 day period or may be purchased from the court transcriber. For more information contact the Clerk's Office. The following deadlines apply: Redaction Request due By 09/14/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission due By 09/24/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 11/22/2021. (Fiore Reporting Service, LLC)
August 23, 2021 Filing 169 Affidavits of Verification of Publication for USA Today, Norwich Bulletin, New Haven Register, and Hartford Courant Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #54 Meeting of Creditors). (Garabato, Sid) Modified on 8/23/2021 (Borton, Kristopher).
August 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Order Authorizing Debtor to Retain and Employ EPIQ Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent. (RE: #17). (Watson, Lisa)
August 20, 2021 Filing 167 Request for Transcript Sent to Fiore Reporting and Transcription (RE: #166 Request for Transcript filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing held on July 30, 2021. (DeNicola, Donna)
August 20, 2021 Filing 166 Request for Transcript (RE:) 101 Hearing Held Hearing held on 07/30/2021 Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor Transcription Service Requested: Fiore Reporting and Transcription (Birney, Patrick)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on August 10, 2021. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, 126 Hearing Continued/Rescheduled, #128 Order). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on July 30, 2021. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #17 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, 101 Hearing Held). (Birney, Patrick)
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 Affidavit of Service re: Order Granting the Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporations Consented to Motion for Continuance of the August 17, 2021 Hearing to September 9, 2021; and Interim Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, Peoples United Bank, National Association Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #149 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing, #150 Proposed Order Requested by Judge filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
August 19, 2021 Filing 162 Notice of Appearance and Notice Request Filed by Jon P. Newton on behalf of Mercy High School Corporation Interested Party, . (Newton, Jon)
August 19, 2021 Filing 161 U.S. Trustee's Statement of No Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #151 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). (Mackey, Steven)
August 18, 2021 Filing 160 Affidavit of Service RE: Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto; (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (III) Granting Related Relief; Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief; Interim Order Granting Motion of Debtor for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III)Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief; and Notice of Continued Hearing Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #18 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #128 Order, #131 Notice). (Garabato, Sid)
August 18, 2021 Filing 159 Affidavit of Service re: Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief; Debtors Application for Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention of Ice Miller LLP as Counsel for the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021 and Granting Related Relief; Debtors Application for an Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention of Robinson & Cole LLP as Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021 Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and Granting Related Relief; Interim Order Granting Motion of Debtor for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief; Notice of Continued Hearing; and Notice of Hearing Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #111 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #112 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #128 Order, #131 Notice, #132 Notice of Hearing). (Garabato, Sid)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on 8/10/2021. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #18 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, 125 Hearing Continued/Rescheduled). (Birney, Patrick)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 Withdrawal Notice of Withdrawal of Proposed Order Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #146 Proposed Order Requested by Judge filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
August 17, 2021 Filing 156 Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #54 Meeting of Creditors). (Garabato, Sid)
August 17, 2021 Filing 155 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #151 Application to Employ filed by Creditor Committee Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors). Hearing to be held on 9/9/2021 at 02:00 PM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 9/2/2021. Certificate of Service due by 9/2/2021. (DeNicola, Donna)
August 17, 2021 Filing 154 Interim Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, People's United Bank, National Association (RE: #93). (Borton, Kristopher)
August 17, 2021 Filing 153 Statement - of No Objection to the Continuation of Interim Orders and Its Full Reservation of Rights. Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Creditor Committee, (RE: #149 Order on Motion to Continue Hearing). (Kindseth, Stephen)
August 17, 2021 Filing 152 Meeting of Creditors Continued due to for continued questioning regarding schedules and SOFA. Debtor Appeared. Attorney For Debtor Appeared. Testimony Taken. Filed by U.S. Trustee. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 9/1/2021 at01:00 PM. DUE TO COVID-19 THE MEETING OF CREDITORS WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. Continued For Testimony. (Claiborn, Holley)
August 16, 2021 Filing 151 Application to Employ Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. as Counsel for the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, Creditor Committee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement #2 Proposed Order) (Kindseth, Stephen)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on 8/10/2021. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor (RE: #93 Motion for Order Approving Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, People's United Bank, National Association). (Adam-Zeini, Zahra).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 Order Granting Consented to Motion for Continuance of Hearings (RE: #148). Hearing to be held on 9/9/2021 at 02:00 PM (RE: #13 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorize Debtor to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; #14 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtor's Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms Filed by Patrick M. Birney; #15 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures; (II) Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement; #18 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto; (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend or Purchase Insurance Policies; #19 Debtor's Motion for Continuation of Utility Service and Approval of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Company Under Section 366(b) (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service). (DeNicola, Donna)
August 13, 2021 Filing 148 Motion to Continue Hearing The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation's Expedited Motion on Consent to Continue All Matters Scheduled for the August 17, 2021 Hearing to September 9, 2021 Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #18 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, 45 Hearing Held, 46 Hearing Held, 47 Hearing Held, #60 Notice of Hearing, #62 Notice of Hearing, #75 Notice of Hearing) (Birney, Patrick)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on 8/10/2021. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #18 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, 125 Hearing Continued/Rescheduled). (Birney, Patrick)
August 13, 2021 Filing 145 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #141 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 9/9/2021 at 02:00 PM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 9/2/2021. Certificate of Service due by 9/2/2021. (DeNicola, Donna)
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 Order Excusing Local Counsel, Kellianne Baranowsky from Further Attendance (RE: #140). (Borton, Kristopher)
August 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 Order Excusing Local Counsel, Jeffrey M. Sklarz From Further Attendance. (RE: #139). (Watson, Lisa)
August 12, 2021 Filing 142 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #138 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 9/9/2021 at 02:00 PM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 9/2/2021. Certificate of Service due by 9/2/2021. (DeNicola, Donna) Modified on 8/16/2021 Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Resent due to internal CM/ECF error.(Allegro, Deirdre).
August 12, 2021 Filing 141 Application of the Debtor for an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of Brown Jacobson PC as as Special Corporate Counsel Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B - Langevin Declaration #3 Exhibit C - Discoll Declaration with Schedules #4 Exhibit D - Disclosure of Compensation) (Birney, Patrick). Modified on 8/16/2021 Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Resent due to internal CM/ECF error.(Allegro, Deirdre).
August 12, 2021 Filing 140 Motion for Order Excusing Local Counsel From Further Attendance Filed by Kellianne Baranowsky on behalf of The Catholic Mutual Relief Society of America, Interested Party. (Baranowsky, Kellianne)
August 12, 2021 Filing 139 Motion for Order Excusing Local Counsel From Further Attendance Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of The Catholic Mutual Relief Society of America, Interested Party. (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 12, 2021 Filing 138 Application of the Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Retention and Employment of B. Riley Advisory Services as as Financial Advisor Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -Weitz Declaration #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
August 11, 2021 Filing 147 Notice of Pro Se Filer/Litigant Appearance Filed by Michael Quartararo, Managing Director of EDPM Advisory Services, Creditor . (Adam-Zeini, Zahra)
August 11, 2021 Filing 137 Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
August 11, 2021 Filing 136 Schedules include AB, D, EF, G, H, Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
August 11, 2021 Filing 135 Notice of Appearance Filed by Christopher H. Blau on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Creditor Committee, . (Blau, Christopher)
August 11, 2021 Filing 134 Notice of Appearance Filed by Eric A. Henzy on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Creditor Committee, . (Henzy, Eric)
August 11, 2021 Filing 133 Notice of Appearance Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Creditor Committee, . (Kindseth, Stephen)
August 11, 2021 Filing 132 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #111 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #112 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 9/9/2021 at 02:00 PM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 9/2/2021. Certificate of Service due by 9/2/2021. (Adam-Zeini, Zahra)
August 11, 2021 Filing 131 Notice of Continued Hearing Issued (RE: #18 Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto; (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #19 Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation) Hearing to be held on 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM. (Watson, Lisa)
August 11, 2021 Filing 130 Request for Transcript Sent to Fiore Reporting and Transcription (RE: #123 Request for Transcript filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing held on August 20, 2021 (DeNicola, Donna)
August 10, 2021 Filing 129 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 8/10/2021 11:02:24 AM ]. File Size [ 35616 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:38:56 ]. (courtspeak).
August 10, 2021 Filing 128 Interim Order Granting Motion of Debtor For Entry Of An Order (I) Approving Proposed Form Of Adequate Assurance Of Payment To Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures For Determining Adequate Assurance Of Payment For Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers From Altering, Refusing, Or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief (RE: #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Watson, Lisa)
August 10, 2021 Filing 127 Hearing Held. Approval to enter, subject to submission of revised Proposed Order consistent with statements on the record (RE: #93 Motion for Order Approving Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, People's United Bank, National Association filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Watson, Lisa)
August 10, 2021 Filing 126 Hearing Held. Hearing will be continued for the reasons stated on the record. Debtor to submit a revised proposed order that is consistent with statements made on the record. The Court will enter an order providing for interim relief until the next hearing. (RE: #19 Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Continued Hearing to be held on 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM. (Watson, Lisa)
August 10, 2021 Filing 125 Hearing Held. Hearing will be continued for the reasons stated on the record. Debtor to submit a revised proposed order that is consistent with statements made on the record. (RE: #18 Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto; (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (III) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Continued Hearing to be held on 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM. (Watson, Lisa)
August 10, 2021 Filing 124 Notice of Appearance and Notice Request Filed by Jon P. Newton on behalf of Xavier High School Corporation of Middletown Interested Party, . (Newton, Jon)
August 10, 2021 Filing 123 Request for Transcript (RE:)#33 Notice of Hearing Hearing held on 08/10/2021 Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor Transcription Service Requested: Fiore Reporting and Transcription (Birney, Patrick)
August 9, 2021 Filing 122 Notice of Agenda for Hearings Scheduled for August 10, 2021 at 11:00 A.M. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #33 Notice of Hearing). (Birney, Patrick)
August 9, 2021 Filing 121 Supplemental Document Revised Proposed Order Re Motion for Continuation of Utility Service Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
August 9, 2021 Filing 120 Affidavit of Service re: Ex Parte Motion of the Debtor to Schedule an Expedited Hearing on, and Limit Notice of, Debtors Motion Approving Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, Peoples United Bank, National Association; and Order Granting Ex Parte Motion of the Debtor to Schedule an Expedited Hearing on, and Limit Notice of, Debtors Motion Approving Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, Peoples United Bank, National Association Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #94 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #102 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Garabato, Sid)
August 9, 2021 Filing 119 Affidavit of Service re: Debtors Motion for Entry of Order Approving Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, Peoples United Bank, National Association Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #93 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
August 9, 2021 Filing 118 Supplemental Document - Certificate of Good Standing of Jason M. Torf Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
August 9, 2021 Filing 117 Supplemental Document - Certificate of Good Standing of Daniel R. Swetnam Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
August 9, 2021 Filing 116 Supplemental Document - Certificate of Good Standing of Annecca H. Smith Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
August 9, 2021 Filing 115 Supplemental Document - Certificate of Good Standing of Alyson Fiedler Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
August 9, 2021 Filing 114 Supplemental Document - Certificate of Good Standing of Louis DeLucia Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
August 9, 2021 Filing 113 Supplemental Document - Certificate of Good Standing of John C. Cannizzaro Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
August 6, 2021 Filing 112 Application to Employ Debtor's Application for an Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention of Robinson & Cole LLP as Counsel Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021 Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 327(a) and Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Birney Declaration #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
August 6, 2021 Filing 111 Application to Employ Debtors Application for Order Authorizing and Approving the Employment and Retention of Ice Miller LLP as Counsel for the Debtor Nunc Pro Tunc to July 15, 2021 and Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-DeLucia Declaration #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
August 4, 2021 Filing 110 Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #54 Meeting of Creditors). (Garabato, Sid)
August 4, 2021 Filing 109 Affidavit of Service re: Order Granting Debtors Motion (I) Extending the Time to File the Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #92 Order on Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules). (Garabato, Sid)
August 3, 2021 Filing 108 Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #54 Meeting of Creditors). (Garabato, Sid)
August 3, 2021 Filing 107 Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #54 Meeting of Creditors). (Garabato, Sid)
August 3, 2021 Filing 106 Affidavit of Service re: Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Extending the Time to File the Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #80 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
August 3, 2021 Filing 105 U.S. Trustee's Response Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Claiborn, Holley)
August 2, 2021 Filing 104 Objection (Re: Adequate Assurance) Filed by Lloyd L. Langhammer on behalf of Norwich Public Utilities Creditor, (RE: #19 Motion for Continuation of Utility Service filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Langhammer, Lloyd)
July 30, 2021 Filing 103 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/30/2021 11:17:59 AM ]. File Size [ 24884 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:09:07 ]. (courtspeak).
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Order Granting Motion for Expedited Hearing on and Limiting Notice of Debtor's Motion Approving the Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, Peoples United Bank, National Association and the Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, Peoples United Bank, National Association. Hearing to be held on 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM. (RE: #93) (Watson, Lisa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 101 Hearing held. The Court shall enter a Final Order approving the Debtor's Application to Employ EPIQ as Claims and Noticing Agent upon the Debtor's submission of a revised Proposed Order pursuant to statements made on the record. (RE: #17 Application to Employ EPIQ Corporate Restructuring, LLC as as Claims and Noticing Agent filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Watson, Lisa)
July 30, 2021 Filing 100 Case Management Conference held and concluded pursuant to statements made on the record. (RE: #4 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). (Watson, Lisa)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order Excusing Local Counsel Patrick M. Birney from Further Attendance (Borton, Kristopher)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Order Excusing Local Counsel Suzanne B. Sutton from Further Attendance (Borton, Kristopher)
July 30, 2021 Filing 97 Statement - Initial Chapter 11 Case Management Conference Statement. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
July 30, 2021 Filing 96 Notice of Agenda for Hearings Scheduled for July 30, 2021 at 11:00 AM Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
July 30, 2021 Filing 95 Transcript . Hearing held on 7/21/21 Requested by Patrick M. Birney Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the judicial conference, viewing of a transcript is restricted for 90 days from the file date. Transcripts will be available for viewing only at the clerk's office during the 90 day period or may be purchased from the court transcriber. For more information contact the Clerk's Office. The following deadlines apply: Redaction Request due By 08/20/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission due By 08/30/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 10/28/2021. (Fiore Reporting Service, LLC)
July 29, 2021 Filing 94 Motion to Expedite Hearing Ex Parte Motion of the Debtor to Schedule an Expedited Hearing on, and Limit Notice of, Debtor's Motion Approving Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, People's United Bank, National Association Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor (RE: #93 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 29, 2021 Filing 93 Motion for Order Approving Order and Stipulation Authorizing Use of Cash Collateral of, and Granting Adequate Protection to, People's United Bank, National Association Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order and Stipulation) (Birney, Patrick)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Order Granting Motion Extending the Time to File the Schedules of Assets and Liabilities and Statement of Financial Affairs to August 11, 2021 (Related Doc #80). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 29, 2021 Filing 91 U.S. Trustee's Statement of Consent to Limited Extension: The United States Trustee has conferred with counsel for the Debtor regarding a shorter extension so that the schedules and other documents are filed prior to the section 341 meeting scheduled for August 16, 2021, and have agreed on an extension to August 11, 2021. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #80 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Claiborn, Holley)
July 29, 2021 Filing 90 Notice of Appointment of Creditor Committee Filed by U.S. Trustee. (McCabe, Kim)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Daniel J. Schufreider (RE: #84). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Jin Yan (RE: #83). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney David M. Spector (RE: #82). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney J. Mark Fisher (RE: #79). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 28, 2021 Filing 85 Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #54 Meeting of Creditors). (Garabato, Sid)
July 28, 2021 Filing 84 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Daniel J. Schufreider Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Lawrence S. Grossman on behalf of Catholic Mutual Group, Creditor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Grossman, Lawrence)
July 28, 2021 Filing 83 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Jin Yan Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Lawrence S. Grossman on behalf of Catholic Mutual Group, Creditor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Grossman, Lawrence)
July 28, 2021 Filing 82 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney David M. Spector Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Lawrence S. Grossman on behalf of Catholic Mutual Group, Creditor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Grossman, Lawrence)
July 28, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9876570. (U.S. Treasury)
July 28, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9876582. (U.S. Treasury)
July 28, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9876592. (U.S. Treasury)
July 27, 2021 Filing 81 Affidavit of Service re: Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing Debtor to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; and (II) Granting Related Relief; Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtors Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms and (II) Granting Related Relief; Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures; (II) Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement; and (III) Granting Related Relief; Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtors Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms and (II) Granting Related Relief; Notice of Final Hearing; Interim Order (I) Authorizing Debtor to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; and (II) Granting Related Relief; Notice of Final Hearing; Interim Order on Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures; (II) Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement; and (III) Granting Related Relief; Notice of Final Hearing Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #59 Order on Motion for Order, #60 Notice of Hearing, #61 Order on Motion to Pay, #62 Notice of Hearing, #74 Order, #75 Notice of Hearing). (Garabato, Sid)
July 27, 2021 Filing 80 Motion to Extend Deadline to File Schedules or Provide Required Information to August 28, 2021 Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 27, 2021 Filing 79 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney J. Mark Fisher Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Lawrence S. Grossman on behalf of Catholic Mutual Group, Creditor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Grossman, Lawrence)
July 27, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9875028. (U.S. Treasury)
July 26, 2021 Filing 78 Notice of Appearance Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Catholic Mutual Group Creditor, . (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
July 26, 2021 Filing 77 Request for Transcript Sent to Fiore Reporting and Transcription (RE: #73 Request for Transcript filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing held on July 21, 2021. (DeNicola, Donna)
July 26, 2021 Filing 76 Notice of Appearance Filed by Lloyd L. Langhammer on behalf of Norwich Public Utilities Creditor, . (Langhammer, Lloyd)
July 24, 2021 Filing 75 Notice of Final Hearing Issued (RE: #15 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures; (II) Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement; and (III) Granting Related Relief ). Hearing to be held on 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM. Objection deadline on or before 8/13/2021. Certificate of Service due by 7/28/2021. (Adam-Zeini, Zahra)
July 24, 2021 Filing 74 Interim Order on Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (1) Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures; (II) Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement; and (III) Granting Related Relief (RE: #15). A Notice of Final Hearing will be issued. (Adam-Zeini, Zahra)
July 23, 2021 Filing 73 Request for Transcript (RE:) 45 Hearing Held, 46 Hearing Held, 47 Hearing Held, 48 Hearing Held Hearing held on 07/21/2021 Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor Transcription Service Requested: Fiore Reporting and Transcription (Birney, Patrick)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on 07/21/2021. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
July 22, 2021 Filing 71 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #38 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/22/2021. (Admin.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 70 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #37 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/22/2021. (Admin.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 69 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #36 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/22/2021. (Admin.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 68 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #35 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/22/2021. (Admin.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 67 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #34 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/22/2021. (Admin.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 66 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #32 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/22/2021. (Admin.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 65 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #31 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/22/2021. (Admin.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 64 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #30 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice). Notice Date 07/22/2021. (Admin.)
July 22, 2021 Filing 63 Affidavit of Service Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #33 Notice of Hearing). (Garabato, Sid)
July 22, 2021 Filing 62 Notice of Final Hearing Issued (RE: #13 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorize Debtor to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; and (II) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM. Objection deadline on or before 8/13/2021. Certificate of Service due by 7/28/2021. (DeNicola, Donna)
July 22, 2021 Filing 61 Interim Order (I) Authorizing Debtor to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; and (I) Granting Related Relief (RE: #13). (DeNicola, Donna)
July 22, 2021 Filing 60 Notice of Final Hearing Issued (RE: #14 Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtor's Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms and related relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 8/17/2021 at 10:00 AM. Objection deadline on or before 8/13/2021. Certificate of Service due by 7/28/2021. (DeNicola, Donna)
July 22, 2021 Filing 59 Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtor's Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms and (II) Granting Related Relief (RE: #14). A Notice of Final Hearing will be issued. (DeNicola, Donna)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on 07/21/2021. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on 07/21/2021. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Notice of Withdrawal of Proposed Order Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #55 Proposed Order Requested by Judge filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on 07/21/2021. Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
July 22, 2021 Filing 54 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 8/16/2021 at 1:00 PM. DUE TO COVID-19 THE MEETING OF CREDITORS WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. (Cicolini, Pietro)
July 21, 2021 Filing 53 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #4 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). Notice Date 07/21/2021. (Admin.)
July 21, 2021 Filing 52 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #20 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). Notice Date 07/21/2021. (Admin.)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER REGARDING NOTICE OF COMMENCEMENT OF CASE: The Debtor and EPIQ Corporate Restructuring, LLC, are authorized and directed to promptly cause the service of the Notice of Commencement of Chapter 11 Case upon claimants and parties in interest and to thereafter certify such service upon the docket of the Court, consistent with current sealing protocols relating to survivors and employees (RE: #15 Motion Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Signed by Judge James J. Tancredi on July 21, 2021. (Watson, Lisa)
July 21, 2021 Filing 50 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/21/2021 4:59:44 PM ]. File Size [ 10974 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:30:29 ]. (courtspeak).
July 21, 2021 Filing 49 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/21/2021 2:20:48 PM ]. File Size [ 52313 KB ]. Run Time [ 02:25:19 ]. (courtspeak).
July 21, 2021 Filing 48 Status Conference Held. Order to enter authorizing Debtor to cause meeting notice to be served by agent. Final Hearing date is July 30, 2021 at 11:00 AM (RE: #17 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Watson, Lisa)
July 21, 2021 Filing 47 Hearing Held. Interim Approval regarding noticing to enter, subject to submission of revised Proposed Order consistent with statements on the record. Continued date is 8/17/2021 (RE: #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Watson, Lisa)
July 21, 2021 Filing 46 Hearing Held. Interim Approval to enter, subject to submission of revised Proposed Order consistent with statements on the record. Continued date is 8/17/2021 (RE: #14 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtor's Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Watson, Lisa)
July 21, 2021 Filing 45 Hearing Held. Interim Approval to enter, subject to submission of revised Proposed Order consistent with statements on the record. Continued date is 8/17/2021 (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Watson, Lisa) Modified on 7/21/2021 (Watson, Lisa).
July 21, 2021 Filing 44 Affidavit of Service Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #17 Application to Employ filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #18 Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto; (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (III) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #19 Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER: In connection with the Hearing set for 2:00 PM on July 21, 2021 regarding the Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures and Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement (ECF No. #15), the Court will review with the parties the attached Proposed Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case, Official Form 309F1. Signed by Judge James J. Tancredi on July 21, 2021. (Adam-Zeini, Zahra)
July 21, 2021 Filing 42 Notice of Appearance Filed by Kellianne Baranowsky on behalf of Catholic Mutual Group Creditor, . (Baranowsky, Kellianne)
July 21, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of Appearance Filed by Lawrence S. Grossman on behalf of Catholic Mutual Group Creditor, . (Grossman, Lawrence)
July 20, 2021 Filing 40 Affidavit of Service Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #20 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing, #22 Notice filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
July 20, 2021 Filing 39 Affidavit of Service Filed by Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC Claims/Noticing Agent, (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #16 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Garabato, Sid)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Harrison H.D. Breakstone (RE: #25). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Jason M. Torf (RE: #24). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Allen G. Kadish (RE: #23). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Annecca H. Smith (RE: #10). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney John C. Cannizzaro (RE: #9). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 20, 2021 Filing 33 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #18 Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto; (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (III) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #19 Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). Hearing to be held on 8/10/2021 at 11:00 AM. Certificate of Service due by 8/3/2021. (Watson, Lisa)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Daniel R. Swetnam (RE: #8). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Alyson M. Fiedler (RE: #7). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Order Granting Motion To Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Louis T. DeLucia (RE: #6). (Borton, Kristopher)
July 20, 2021 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance Filed by Scott D. Rosen on behalf of People's United Bank, National Association Creditor, . (Rosen, Scott)
July 20, 2021 Filing 28 Notice of Appearance Filed by Honor S. Heath on behalf of Yankee Gas Services Company d/b/a Eversource, The Connecticut Light and Power Company d/b/a Eversource Creditors, . (Heath, Honor)
July 20, 2021 Filing 27 United States Trustee's Omnibus Objection and Response to Certain of Debtor's First Day Motions Filed by Holley L. Claiborn on behalf of U. S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Claiborn, Holley)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 SCHEDULING ORDER: Upon consideration of the Debtor's Application for Authorization to Retain and Employ Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC as Claims and Noticing Agent (the "Application", ECF No. 17); it is herebyORDERED: That the Application is Granted on a preliminary basis, subject to a Final Hearing to be held on July 30, 2021 at 11:00 AM; it is furtherORDERED: That a Status Conference on the Application will be held on July 21, 2021 at 2:00 PM. Signed by Judge James J. Tancredi on July 19, 2021. (Watson, Lisa)
July 19, 2021 Filing 25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Harrison H.D. Breakstone Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Suzanne B. Sutton on behalf of The Oceania Province of the Congregation of Christian Brothers, Interested Party. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Sutton, Suzanne)
July 19, 2021 Filing 24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Jason M. Torf Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 19, 2021 Filing 23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Allen G. Kadish Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Suzanne B. Sutton on behalf of The Oceania Province of the Congregation of Christian Brothers, Interested Party. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Sutton, Suzanne)
July 19, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9866200. (U.S. Treasury)
July 19, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9866202. (U.S. Treasury)
July 19, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9866216. (U.S. Treasury)
July 18, 2021 Filing 22 Notice of Debtor (I) Filing First Day Motions, (II) First Day Hearing, and (III) Proposed Agenda for Presentment of Emergency First Day Hearing Filed by Andrew A. DePeau on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #16 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (DePeau, Andrew)
July 18, 2021 Filing 21 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Andrew A. DePeau on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (DePeau, Andrew)
July 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Granting Motion for Expedited Consideration of Certain First Day Motions. Hearing to be held on 7/21/2021 at 02:00 PM. (RE: #13 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders to Authorize Debtor to Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; #14 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtor's Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms; #15 Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures and Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement. (Adam-Zeini, Zahra)
July 16, 2021 Filing 19 Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Approving Proposed Form of Adequate Assurance of Payment to Utility Providers; (II) Establishing Procedures for Determining Adequate Assurance of Payment for Future Utility Services; (III) Prohibiting Utility Providers from Altering, Refusing, or Discontinuing Utility Service; and (IV) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Interim Order #2 Exhibit B - Utility Service List) (Birney, Patrick) Modified on 7/19/2021 (Borton, Kristopher). Modified on 8/16/2021 Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) Resent due to internal CM/ECF error.(Allegro, Deirdre).
July 16, 2021 Filing 18 Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders Authorizing Debtor to (I) Continue Insurance Coverage and Insurance Programs Entered into Prepetition and Satisfy Prepetition Obligations Related Thereto; (II) Renew, Amend, Supplement, Extend, or Purchase Insurance Policies; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Interim Order #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Order) (Birney, Patrick) Modified on 7/19/2021 (Borton, Kristopher).
July 16, 2021 Filing 17 Application to Employ EPIQ Corporate Restructuring, LLC as as Claims and Noticing Agent as of the Petition Date Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Interim Order #2 Exhibit Tran Declaration) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 16 Motion to Expedite Hearing Motion for Expedited Consideration of Certain First Day Motions Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor (RE: #13 Motion to Pay filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #14 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, #15 Motion for Order filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Interim Order #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 15 Motion for Order Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing and Approving Special Noticing and Confidentiality Procedures; (II) Authorizing and Approving Procedures for Providing Notice of Commencement; and (III) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Interim Order #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 14 Motion for Order Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorizing the Continued Use of the Debtor's Cash Management System, Bank Accounts and Business Forms and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Interim Order #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Order #3 Exhibit C- List of Bank Accounts #4 Exhibit D - Funds Flow Diagram) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to Pay Debtor's Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I) Authorize Debtor to (A) Pay Prepetition Wages, Salaries, Reimbursable Expenses, and Other Obligations on Account of Compensation and Benefits Programs and (B) Continue Compensation and Benefits Programs; and (II) Granting Related Relief Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Interim Order #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Final Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 12 Declaration of Reverend Peter J. Langevin Regarding the Diocese's Assets and Operations and in Support of the Chapter 11 Petition and First Day Pleadings Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation). (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 11 List of Creditors Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Annecca H. Smith Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney John C. Cannizzaro Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Daniel R. Swetnam Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Alyson M. Fiedler Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Visiting Attorney Louis T. DeLucia Filed by Sponsoring Attorney, Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation, Debtor. Fee Amount $200. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Affidavit #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Order) (Birney, Patrick)
July 16, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Papers Filed by Andrew A. DePeau on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor, . (DePeau, Andrew)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Scheduling Initial Chapter 11 Case Management Conference. Hearing to be held on 7/30/2021 at 11:00 AM. (DeNicola, Donna)
July 16, 2021 Filing 3 Notice of Appearance Filed by Suzanne B. Sutton on behalf of The Oceania Province of the Congregation of Christian Brothers Interested Party, . (Sutton, Suzanne)
July 16, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9865030. (U.S. Treasury)
July 16, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9865033. (U.S. Treasury)
July 16, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9865043. (U.S. Treasury)
July 16, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9865039. (U.S. Treasury)
July 16, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice(21-20687) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) filing fee - $ 200.00. Receipt number 9865036. (U.S. Treasury)
July 15, 2021 Filing 2 Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Patrick M. Birney on behalf of The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Debtor,. (Birney, Patrick)
July 15, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation Filing Fee $1738. All Schedules and Statements filed except for the following documents that remain due: List of Creditors, Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules A/B, D-H, Declaration of Debtor's Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Attorney Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders and 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors.(Birney, Patrick) Modified on 7/16/2021 (Adam-Zeini, Zahra).
July 15, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-20687) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee - $1738.00. Receipt number 9863141. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: The Norwich Roman Catholic Diocesan Corporation
Represented By: Patrick M. Birney
Represented By: John C. Cannizzaro
Represented By: Louis T. DeLucia
Represented By: Andrew A. DePeau
Represented By: Alyson M. Fiedler
Represented By: Annecca H. Smith
Represented By: Daniel R. Swetnam
Represented By: Jason M. Torf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U. S. Trustee
Represented By: Holley L. Claiborn
Represented By: Steven E. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By: Christopher H. Blau
Represented By: Eric A. Henzy
Represented By: Stephen M. Kindseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?