MGA Management, LLC
Debtor: MGA Management, LLC
Trustee: George M. Purtill
Us Trustee: U. S. Trustee
Case Number: 2:2022bk20315
Filed: May 9, 2022
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: James J Tancredi
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 7, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2022 Filing 94 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #88 Order on Motion for 2004 Examination). Notice Date 07/07/2022. (Admin.)
July 7, 2022 Filing 93 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #88 Order on Motion for 2004 Examination). Notice Date 07/07/2022. (Admin.)
July 7, 2022 Filing 92 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #85 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/07/2022. (Admin.)
July 7, 2022 Filing 91 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #84 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 07/07/2022. (Admin.)
July 7, 2022 Filing 90 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 7/7/2022 12:10:08 PM ]. File Size [ 27813 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:17:16 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (courtspeak).
July 7, 2022 Filing 89 Exhibit A Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #80 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
July 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Order Granting Motion for 2004 Examination of Michael Ancona. (RE: #61) . (ts)
July 5, 2022 Filing 87 Certificate of Service and Hearing Date Notice Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #82 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph). Related document(s) #85 Notice of Hearing. Modified on 7/5/2022 (Clerks Office ts).
July 5, 2022 Filing 86 Objection Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Extensia Financial, LLC, as servicer for Garden Savings Federal Credit Union Creditor, (RE: #80 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (Linsey, Patrick)
July 1, 2022 Filing 85 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #82 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Hearing to be held on 7/21/2022 at 02:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 7/14/2022. (dd)
July 1, 2022 Filing 84 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #80 Amended Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Hearing to be held on 7/7/2022 at 12:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. (lbw)
July 1, 2022 Filing 83 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #82 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
July 1, 2022 Filing 82 Application to Employ Attorney Michael Clinton as Summary Process Attorney Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit #2 Proposed Order) (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 30, 2022 Filing 81 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #80 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 30, 2022 Filing 80 Amended Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC, Debtor (RE: #29 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit Checklist #3 Exhibit Budget) (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 28, 2022 Filing 79 Notice of Appearance , Request for Notices Filed by Claudia M. Sklar on behalf of M&T BANK Creditor, . (Sklar, Claudia)
June 27, 2022 Filing 78 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #77 Withdrawal filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 27, 2022 Filing 77 Withdrawal Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #57 Motion To Designate filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 27, 2022 Filing 76 Meeting of Creditors Closed on 6/27/2022. Debtor Appeared. Attorney For Debtor Appeared. Testimony Taken. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Mackey, Steven)
June 27, 2022 Filing 75 Statement of Financial Affairs - Part 3 #7 Legal Actions Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #65 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph) Modified on 6/27/2022 (ts).
June 27, 2022 Filing 74 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #65 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC, #73 Corrected Amendment filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 27, 2022 Filing 73 Corrected Amendment Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #65 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Added Creditors) (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 26, 2022 Filing 72 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #67 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.)
June 26, 2022 Filing 71 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #67 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.)
June 26, 2022 Filing 70 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #68 Deficiency Notice). Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.)
June 26, 2022 Filing 69 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #66 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 06/26/2022. (Admin.)
June 24, 2022 Filing 68 Amendment Deficiency Notice Issued. Certification of Service is not attached for amended Schedule D or EF, List of Added Creditors (RE: #65 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (ts)
June 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 67 Order Authorizing Debtor to Employ Attorney Joseph J. D'Agostino, Jr. (RE: #10). (ts)
June 24, 2022 Filing 66 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #56 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC, #57 Motion To Designate Chapter 11 Subchapter V as a Chapter 11 Single Asset Real Estate Case filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Hearing to be held on 7/7/2022 at 12:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. (lbw)
June 24, 2022 Filing 65 Amended List of Creditors and Amended Schedules AB, D,. SOFA, Amended Declaration of Schedules, Amended Summary of Assets and Liabilities Receipt #A10214525 Fee Amount $32. Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor,. (D'Agostino, Joseph) Modified on 6/24/2022 (ts).
June 24, 2022 Filing 64 Amended Conflict Waiver Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 22, 2022 Filing 63 Meeting of Creditors Continued in Advance due to Unavailability of UST Conference Line on Friday, June 24, 2022. Filed by U.S. Trustee. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 6/27/2022 at02:00 PM. telephonic. Continued For Testimony and Requested Documents. (Mackey, Steven)
June 22, 2022 Filing 62 Meeting of Creditors Continued due to Meeting of Creditors Examination Not Completed. Debtor Appeared. Attorney For Debtor Appeared. Testimony Taken. Filed by U.S. Trustee. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 6/24/2022 at10:00 AM. telephonic. Continued For Testimony and Requested Documents. (Mackey, Steven)
June 21, 2022 Filing 61 Motion for 2004 Examination of Michael Ancona Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Extensia Financial, LLC, as servicer for Garden Savings Federal Credit Union, Creditor. (Linsey, Patrick)
June 21, 2022 Filing 60 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 5/31/2022 Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor,. (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 21, 2022 Filing 59 Conflict Waiver Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 21, 2022 Filing 58 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #57 Motion To Designate filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 21, 2022 Filing 57 Motion To Change Designation of Chapter 11 Sub Chapter V as a Chapter 11 Single Asset Real Estate Case Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (D'Agostino, Joseph) Modified on 6/21/2022 (ts).
June 20, 2022 Filing 56 Amended Motion for Joint Administration With 22-20316 Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC, Debtor (RE: #40 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 18, 2022 Filing 55 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #49 Generate BNC Notice/Form). Notice Date 06/18/2022. (Admin.)
June 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER ON APPLICATION TO EMPLOY: Upon the Application of the Debtor MGA Management, LLC for authority to employ and appoint Attorney Joseph J. D'Agostino LLC as attorneys to represent the Debtor-in-Possession (ECF No. 10), and pursuant to the statements made on the record at a hearing held on June 16, 2022, this retention is provisionally approved subject to final consideration following the docketing and submission to the U.S. Trustee by Debtor's counsel of satisfactory conflict waivers. (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Signed by Judge James J. Tancredi on June 17, 2022. (lbw)
June 16, 2022 Filing 53 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/16/2022 12:03:57 PM ]. File Size [ 16231 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:45:05 ]. (courtspeak).
June 16, 2022 Filing 52 Hearing Held and Continued Pursuant to the Statements made on the record. Budget to be filed by 7/1/2022. Objection due by 7/5/2022. (RE: #29 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC.) Hearing to be held on 7/7/2022 at 12:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT . (lbw)
June 16, 2022 Filing 51 Hearing Held. Application is conditionally approved subject to docketing waivers pursuant to the statements made on the Record (RE: #10 Application to Employ Attorney Joseph J. D'Agostino, Jr. as Attorney) (lbw)
June 16, 2022 Filing 50 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Status Conference held and completed (RE: #6) (lbw)
June 15, 2022 Filing 49 ECF No. 48 Generated for BNC Noticing. (dd)
June 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER ON MOTION FOR JOINT ADMINISTRATION: The Motion for Joint Administration With 22-20316, ECF No. 40, filed by MGA Management, LLC, Debtor, has the incorrect case number and a typographical misspelling of the Debtor's name on both the motion and proposed order Accordingly, it is herebyORDERED: That Debtor file an Amended Motion for Joint Administration with these errors corrected on or before Friday, June 17, 2022 (RE: #40 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Signed by Judge James J. Tancredi on June 15, 2022. (dd)
June 10, 2022 Filing 47 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #46 Amended Statements filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 10, 2022 Filing 46 Amended Statements - Schedule A/B and SOFA. Amended Declaration Form 202 Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph) Modified on 6/10/2022 (ts).
June 10, 2022 Filing 45 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #41 Affidavit filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC, #42 Affidavit filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC, #43 Exhibit(s) filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 10, 2022 Filing 44 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #40 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
June 10, 2022 Filing 43 Exhibit Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph) Modified on 6/10/2022 (ts).
June 10, 2022 Filing 42 Affidavit of Michael Ancona Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph) Modified on 6/10/2022 missing case number on document (ts).
June 10, 2022 Filing 41 Affidavit Of Joseph D'Agostino Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph) Modified on 6/10/2022 missing case number on document (ts).
June 10, 2022 Filing 40 Motion for Joint Administration With 22-20316 Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (D'Agostino, Joseph) Modified on 6/10/2022 case number should be 22-20315 on the motion and proposed order, also debtors name misspelled in heading. (ts).
June 2, 2022 Filing 39 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/2/2022 3:36:38 PM ]. File Size [ 14574 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:40:29 ]. (courtspeak).
June 2, 2022 Filing 38 Hearing held and continued pursuant to the statements made on the record. (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC, #29 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Hearing to be held on 6/16/2022 at 12:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. (lbw)
June 2, 2022 Filing 37 Hearing Rescheduled (time change only) pursuant to a change in the Court's calendar (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC, #29 Amended Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Hearing to be held on 6/2/2022 at 03:15 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. (dd)
May 31, 2022 Filing 36 U.S. Trustee's Statement of Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC, #25 Affidavit filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (Mackey, Steven)
May 31, 2022 Filing 35 Amended Statements - Section 1188(c). Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #33 Section 1188(c) Report filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 31, 2022 Filing 34 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #33 Section 1188(c) Report filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 31, 2022 Filing 33 Section 1188(c) Report Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor,. (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 31, 2022 Filing 32 Certificate of Service and Hearing Notice Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #29 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph). Related document(s) 31 Notice of Hearing. Modified on 5/31/2022 (Clerks Office ts).
May 27, 2022 Filing 31 Hearing Set (RE: #29 Amended Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Hearing to be held on 6/2/2022 at 02:30 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. (dd)
May 27, 2022 Filing 30 Checklist for Motions and Orders re: Use of Cash Collateral Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #29 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph) (ts).
May 27, 2022 Filing 29 Amended Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC, Debtor (RE: #11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 26, 2022 Filing 28 Objection Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Extensia Financial, LLC, as servicer for Garden Savings Federal Credit Union Creditor, (RE: #11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (Linsey, Patrick)
May 26, 2022 Filing 27 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #26 Amended Statements filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 26, 2022 Filing 26 Amended Statements - Statement of Financial Affairs. Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 23, 2022 Filing 25 Affidavit Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 21, 2022 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #19 Generate BNC Notice/Form). Notice Date 05/21/2022. (Admin.)
May 21, 2022 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 05/21/2022. (Admin.)
May 20, 2022 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #15 Deficiency Notice - Notice of Appearance). Notice Date 05/20/2022. (Admin.)
May 20, 2022 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #17 Deficiency Notice re: Motions/Applications). Notice Date 05/20/2022. (Admin.)
May 18, 2022 Filing 20 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC, #11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Hearing to be held on 6/2/2022 at 02:30 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 5/26/2022. (dd)
May 18, 2022 Filing 19 ECF No. 18 Generated for BNC Noticing. (dd)
May 18, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ON APPLICATION TO EMPLOY: The Application to Employ Joseph J. D'Agostino, ECF No. 10, filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino, Debtor, is deficient in that it is missing the required verified statement of the person to be employed. Counsel shall have 7 days from the date of this Order to cure the deficiency (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Signed by Judge James J. Tancredi on May 18, 2022. (dd)
May 18, 2022 Filing 17 Deficiency Notice Regarding Motions/Applications. Not in compliance with D. Conn. Bankr. L.R. 4001-3: Use of Cash Collateral and Debtor in Possession Financing, D. Conn. Bankr. L.R. 9013-1 and Fed. R. Bankr. P. 7010: Form of Pleading of Certain Contested Matters, (RE: #11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). Motion/Application Compliance due by 5/25/2022. (kpb)
May 18, 2022 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance Filed by Nancy Bohan Kinsella on behalf of Extensia Financial, LLC, as servicer for Garden Savings Federal Credit Union Creditor, . (Kinsella, Nancy)
May 18, 2022 Filing 15 Deficiency Notice regarding Notice of Appearance issued to Attorney Nancy Bohan Kinsella for failure to file a separate Notice Appearance pursuant to D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 5(b), D. Conn. Bankr. L. R. 1001-1(b) and D. Conn. Bankr. L.R. 9010-1(b)(1). (RE: #14 Notice of Appearance filed by Creditor Extensia Financial, LLC, as servicer for Garden Savings Federal Credit Union). Notice of Appearance Deficiency Compliance due by 5/25/2022. (ts)
May 17, 2022 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance of Patrick R. Linsey and Nancy B. Kinsella Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Extensia Financial, LLC, as servicer for Garden Savings Federal Credit Union Creditor, . (Linsey, Patrick)
May 17, 2022 Filing 13 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 17, 2022 Filing 12 Certificate of Service Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #10 Application to Employ filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 16, 2022 Filing 11 Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order #2 Exhibit) (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 16, 2022 Filing 10 Application to Employ Attorney Joseph J. D'Agostino, Jr. as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 12, 2022 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #6 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). Notice Date 05/12/2022. (Admin.)
May 11, 2022 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: #3 Meeting of Creditors). Notice Date 05/11/2022. (Admin.)
May 11, 2022 Filing 7 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #4 Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal). Notice Date 05/11/2022. (Admin.)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Scheduling Status Conference in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case. Status Conference to be held on 6/16/2022 at 12:00 PM at United States Bankruptcy Court, 450 Main Street, 7th Floor Courtroom, Room 715B, Hartford, CT. Section 1188(c) Report Due By 6/2/2022. (lbw)
May 10, 2022 Filing 5 Statement - Corporate Resolution. Filed by Joseph J. D'Agostino Jr. on behalf of MGA Management, LLC Debtor, (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor MGA Management, LLC). (D'Agostino, Joseph)
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 Deficiency Notice and Notice of Dismissal of Case for Failure to Cure Deficiency:. Statement of Corporate Resolution, due 5/23/2022. (ts)
May 9, 2022 Filing 3 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 6/3/2022 at 10:00 AM. DUE TO COVID-19 THE MEETING OF CREDITORS WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. Proofs of Claims due by 7/8/2022. (ts)
May 9, 2022 Filing 2 Notice of Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee George M. Purtill. George M. Purtill added to the case. 341 Meeting Date: 06/03/2022. 341 Meeting Time: 10:00 AM. Location: Telephonically at (877) 915-2934, Participant Passcode 8494974. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee) (McCabe, Kim)
May 9, 2022 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Filed by MGA Management, LLC Receipt #A10166567 Filing Fee $1738. All schedules and statements filed except for: Statement of Corporate Resolution. Chapter 11 Subchapter V Small Business Plan Due by 08/8/2022. (D'Agostino, Joseph) Modified on 5/9/2022 (ts).
May 9, 2022 Judge James J. Tancredi added to case. (ts)

Search for this case: MGA Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: MGA Management, LLC
Represented By: Joseph J. D'Agostino, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: George M. Purtill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U. S. Trustee
Represented By: Steven E. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?