Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC
Debtor: Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC
Us Trustee: U. S. Trustee
Trustee: Kara S. Rescia
Case Number: 5:2021bk50305
Filed: May 5, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Connecticut
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2021 Filing 54 Meeting of Creditors Continued in Advance due to scheduling conflict. Filed by U.S. Trustee. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 7/12/2021 at03:30 PM. DUE TO COVID-19 THE MEETING OF CREDITORS WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. Continued For Testimony. (Claiborn, Holley)
June 21, 2021 Filing 53 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 05/31/21 Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor,. (Charmoy, Scott)
June 21, 2021 Filing 52 Amended Schedules G,. Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor,. (Charmoy, Scott)
June 17, 2021 Filing 51 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #46 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/17/2021. (Admin.)
June 17, 2021 Filing 50 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #45 Deficiency Notice). Notice Date 06/17/2021. (Admin.)
June 17, 2021 Filing 49 Meeting of Creditors Continued in Advance due to debtor to file amended schedules and provide additional documentation. Filed by U.S. Trustee. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 6/28/2021 at03:00 PM. DUE TO COVID-19 THE MEETING OF CREDITORS WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. Continued For Testimony and Requested Documents. (Claiborn, Holley)
June 15, 2021 Filing 48 Amended Statements - of Financial Affairs. Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: #44 Amended Statements filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Charmoy, Scott)
June 15, 2021 Filing 47 Certificate of Service Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: 4 Meeting of Creditors, #43 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Charmoy, Scott)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 Order Granting Application to Employ Attorney (RE: #22). (Rai, Sujata)
June 15, 2021 Filing 45 Amendment Deficiency Notice Issued. Certification of Service is not attached for amended Schedule D or EF (RE: #43 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Rai, Sujata)
June 14, 2021 Filing 44 Amended Statements - of Financial Affairs. Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: #26 Amended Statements filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Charmoy, Scott)
June 14, 2021 Filing 43 Amended Schedules AB, EF,. Fee Amount $32. Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor,. (Charmoy, Scott)
June 14, 2021 Receipt of Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors(21-50305) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00) filing fee - $ 32.00. Receipt number 9829863. (U.S. Treasury)
June 10, 2021 Filing 42 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #40 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 06/10/2021. (Admin.)
June 8, 2021 Filing 41 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 6/8/2021 11:05:32 AM ]. File Size [ 13256 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:36:49 ]. (courtspeak).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Order Granting Application to Employ Accountant (RE: #23). (Staton, Sandra)
June 8, 2021 Filing 39 Hearing Held. (RE: #7 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference, Status Conference held. For the reasons stated on the record, no further status conference will be scheduled at this time, #22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Order Approving to enter subject to the submission of a revised proposed order to be filed on or before June 11, 2021, #23 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, Order Approving to enter for the reasons stated on the record.). (Esposito, Pamela)
June 3, 2021 Filing 38 Meeting of Creditors Continued due to Debtor to file amended Schedules. Debtor Appeared. Attorney For Debtor Appeared. Testimony Taken. Filed by U.S. Trustee. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 6/18/2021 at02:00 PM. DUE TO COVID-19 THE MEETING OF CREDITORS WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. Continued For Testimony. (Claiborn, Holley)
June 2, 2021 Filing 37 Certificate of Service Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: #33 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, (Charmoy, Scott). Modified on 6/2/2021 remove docket relation from ECF NO. #34.(Staton, Sandra).
June 1, 2021 Filing 36 Statement of U.S. Trustee - No Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, #24 Supplemental Document filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, #31 Supplemental Document filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Claiborn, Holley)
May 30, 2021 Filing 35 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #34 Deficiency Notice). Notice Date 05/30/2021. (Admin.)
May 28, 2021 Filing 34 Amendment Deficiency Notice Issued. Certification of Service is not attached for amended Schedule D or EF, (RE: #33 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Staton, Sandra)
May 27, 2021 Filing 33 Amended Schedules AB, EF, H,. Fee Amount $32. Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor,. (Charmoy, Scott)
May 27, 2021 Filing 32 Supplemental Document (1116 documents) Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: #8 Amended Voluntary Petition filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Charmoy, Scott)
May 27, 2021 Filing 31 Supplemental Document (supplemental affidavit) Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: #22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Charmoy, Scott)
May 27, 2021 Filing 30 Statement of U.S. Trustee - No Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #23 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Claiborn, Holley)
May 27, 2021 Receipt of Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors(21-50305) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00) filing fee - $ 32.00. Receipt number 9811206. (U.S. Treasury)
May 25, 2021 Filing 29 Section 1188(c) Report Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor,. (Charmoy, Scott)
May 20, 2021 Filing 28 Certificate of Service Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: #22 Application to Employ filed Charmoy & Charmoy, LLC by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, #23 Application to Employ The Innovative CPA Group, LLC filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, #25 Notice of Hearing). Related document(s) #24 Supplemental Document filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC.(Charmoy, Scott). Modified on 5/21/2021 to add docket relation with ECF No.#24.(Staton, Sandra).
May 19, 2021 Filing 27 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #21 Order on Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll). Notice Date 05/19/2021. (Admin.)
May 19, 2021 Filing 26 Amended Statements - (of Financial Affairs). Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Charmoy, Scott)
May 18, 2021 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, #23 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). Hearing to be held on 6/8/2021 at 11:00 AM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 6/1/2021. Certificate of Service due by 6/1/2021. (Esposito, Pamela)
May 17, 2021 Filing 24 Supplemental Document (retainer agreement) Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: #22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Charmoy, Scott)
May 17, 2021 Filing 23 Application to Employ The Innovative CPA Group, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc as Accountant for the Debtor Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, Debtor. (Charmoy, Scott) Modified on 5/17/2021 (Staton, Sandra).
May 17, 2021 Filing 22 Application to Employ Charmoy & Charmoy, LLC Nunc Pro Tunc as Attorney for the Debtor Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, Debtor. (Charmoy, Scott) Modified on 5/17/2021 (Staton, Sandra).
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Authority To Pay Pre-Petition Employee Compensation and Related Items (RE: #10). (Senteio, Renee)
May 13, 2021 Filing 20 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 5/13/2021 10:04:20 AM ]. File Size [ 6423 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:17:50 ]. (courtspeak).
May 13, 2021 Filing 19 Hearing Held. (RE: #10 Motion For Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Compensation And Related Items Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). Granted for the reasons stated on the record. Revised Proposed Order Due on or before May 21, 2021. (Senteio, Renee)
May 10, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance Filed by Douglas S. Skalka on behalf of Nicolangelo Cuoco Interested Party, . (Skalka, Douglas)
May 10, 2021 Filing 17 Certificate of Service Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: Related document(s) #10 Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC #11 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, #12 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Charmoy, Scott). Modified on 5/11/2021 add docket relation with ECF No. #10 (Staton, Sandra).
May 8, 2021 Filing 16 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #7 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). Notice Date 05/08/2021. (Admin.)
May 8, 2021 Filing 15 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #7 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). Notice Date 05/08/2021. (Admin.)
May 8, 2021 Filing 14 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: #5 Meeting of Creditors). Notice Date 05/08/2021. (Admin.)
May 8, 2021 Filing 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #6 Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal). Notice Date 05/08/2021. (Admin.)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Granting Motion to Expedite Hearing. Hearing to be held on 5/13/2021 at 10:00 AM. Service to be made on or before May 10, 2021 by 4:00 PM. Certificate of Service to be filed on or before May 11, 2021 by 4:00 PM. (RE: #10 Motion For Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Compensation And Related Items Nunc Pro Tunc filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC) (Senteio, Renee)
May 7, 2021 Filing 11 Motion to Expedite Hearing On The Debtor's Motion For Authority To Pay Pre-Petition Compensation And Related Items Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, Debtor (RE: #10 Motion to Pay Pre-Petition Payroll filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC) (Charmoy, Scott) Modified on 5/7/2021 (Staton, Sandra).
May 7, 2021 Filing 10 Debtor's Motion For Authority to Pay Pre-Petition Employee Compensation And Related Items Nunc Pro Tunc Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC, Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Charmoy, Scott) Modified on 5/7/2021 (Staton, Sandra).
May 6, 2021 Filing 9 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (amended) Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor,. (Charmoy, Scott)
May 6, 2021 Filing 8 Amended Voluntary Petition (and corporate authorization) Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor, (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC). (Charmoy, Scott)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Scheduling Status Conference in Chapter 11 Subchapter V Case. Status Conference to be held on 6/8/2021 at 11:00 AM at telephonic. Section 1188(c) Report Due By 5/25/2021. (Esposito, Pamela)
May 6, 2021 Filing 6 Deficiency Notice and Notice of Dismissal of Case for Failure to Cure Deficiency:. Statement of Corporate Resolution, due 5/19/2021. (Staton, Sandra)
May 6, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 6/3/2021 at 10:00 AM. telephonic. Proofs of Claims due by 7/6/2021. (Staton, Sandra)
May 6, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 6/3/2021 at 10:00 AM. telephonic. Proofs of Claims due by 7/6/2021. (Staton, Sandra) Modified on 5/6/2021 Clerk's error ,see ECF No.#5.(Staton, Sandra).
May 6, 2021 Filing 2 Appointment of Subchapter V Trustee Kara S. Rescia Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Attachments: #1 Verified Statement of Subchapter V Trustee) (McCabe, Kim)
May 5, 2021 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Scott M. Charmoy on behalf of Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Debtor,. (Staton, Sandra)
May 5, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Subchapter V Voluntary Petition Filed by Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC Filing Fee $1738. All schedules and statements filed except Statement of Corporate Resolution .Chapter 11 Subchapter V Small Business Plan Due by 08/3/2021. (Charmoy, Scott) Modified on 5/6/2021 (Staton, Sandra).
May 5, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-50305) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee - $1738.00. Receipt number 9788230. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Cuoco Structural Engineers, LLC
Represented By: Scott M. Charmoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U. S. Trustee
Represented By: Holley L. Claiborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: Kara S. Rescia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?