Auto-Swage Products, Inc.
Debtor: Auto-Swage Products, Inc.
Us Trustee: U. S. Trustee
Case Number: 5:2021bk50502
Filed: August 7, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Julie A Manning
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 5, 2021 Filing 71 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/5/2021 2:07:15 PM ]. File Size [ 7361 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:20:27 ]. (courtspeak).
October 5, 2021 Filing 70 Objection Filed by Holley L. Claiborn on behalf of U. S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, (RE: #14 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc., #17 Chapter 11 Plan filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Claiborn, Holley)
October 5, 2021 Filing 69 The scheduled hearing or conference before the Honorable Julie A. Manning on Tuesday, October 12, 2021, will be conducted over the ZoomGov platform. Follow the instructions on the attached notice to receive the ZoomGov Connection information (Senteio, Renee)
October 5, 2021 Filing 68 Hearing Held (RE: #16 Motion for Order (1) Authorizing and Approving Form of Stalking Horse Agreement, (2) Authorizing and Approving Bidding Procedures, (3) Authorizing and Approving Break-up Fee, (4) Scheduling an Auction, (5) Approving Form and Manner of Notice Concerning Auction, Sale Procedures and Sale Hearing, and (6) Granting Other Related Relief filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). Hearing continued to 10/12/2021 at 02:00 PM for the reasons stated on the record. (Senteio, Renee)
October 5, 2021 Filing 67 Small Business Monthly Operating Report for Filing Period August 7, 2021 to August 31, 2021 Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor,. (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
September 29, 2021 Filing 66 Request for Notices and Notice of Appearance Filed by Francis A. Teodosio on behalf of City of Shelton Creditor ,. (Teodosio, Francis) Modified on 9/30/2021 (Staton, Sandra).
September 27, 2021 Filing 65 Objection Filed by Holley L. Claiborn on behalf of U. S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, (RE: #16 Motion for Order filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Claiborn, Holley)
September 21, 2021 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance Filed by Scott N. Koschwitz on behalf of Connecticut Department of Energy and Environmental Protection 20 Largest Creditor, . (Koschwitz, Scott)
September 20, 2021 Filing 63 Amended Schedules AB,. and Amended Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor,. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service #2 Official Form 106Dec) (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
September 20, 2021 Filing 62 Meeting of Creditors Closed on 9/20/2021. Debtor Appeared. Attorney For Debtor Appeared. Testimony Taken. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Claiborn, Holley)
September 17, 2021 Filing 61 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #57 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 09/17/2021. (Admin.)
September 17, 2021 Filing 60 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #57 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 09/17/2021. (Admin.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 59 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #54 Clerks Notice of ZoomGov Instructions Regarding Scheduled Hearing). Notice Date 09/16/2021. (Admin.)
September 15, 2021 Filing 58 In light of the revised order submitted by counsel for the Debtor, the continued hearing on the Application to Employ, ECF No. #13, scheduled to be held on September 15, 2021 at 4:00 p.m. will not be held, see ECF No. #57.(RE: #13 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Esposito, Pamela)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 Order Granting Application for Authority to Employ Levey Miller Maretz, LLC as Real Estate Broker and Consultant for the Debtor (RE: #13). (Esposito, Pamela)
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on 9/14/2021. Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #13 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
September 14, 2021 Filing 55 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/14/2021 4:11:43 PM ]. File Size [ 3334 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:16 ]. (courtspeak).
September 14, 2021 Filing 54 The scheduled hearing or conference before the Honorable Julie A. Manning on Wednesday, September 15, 2021, will be conducted over the ZoomGov platform. Follow the instructions on the attached notice to receive the ZoomGov Connection information (Senteio, Renee)
September 14, 2021 Filing 53 Hearing Held (RE: #13 Application to Employ Levey Miller Maretz, LLC as Real Estate Broker and Consultant for the Debtor Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc., Debtor). Hearing continued to 9/15/2021 at 04:00 PM for the reasons stated on the record. (Senteio, Renee)
September 13, 2021 Filing 52 Certificate of Service Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #14 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc., #16 Motion for Order filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc., #39 Notice of Hearing, #41 Notice of Hearing). (Kornafel, Joanna)
September 13, 2021 Filing 51 Affidavit / Amended Declaration of Steve Miller Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #13 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Connections to the Debtor and Its Estate #2 Exhibit B - Brokerage/Listing Agreement) (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
September 11, 2021 Filing 50 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #45 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 09/11/2021. (Admin.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 49 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #37 Clerks Notice of ZoomGov Instructions Regarding Scheduled Hearing). Notice Date 09/10/2021. (Admin.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 48 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #39 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/10/2021. (Admin.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 47 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #41 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 09/10/2021. (Admin.)
September 10, 2021 Filing 46 U.S. Trustee's Statement that an Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Has NOT Been Appointed Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Claiborn, Holley)
September 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 Order Granting Application to Employ Green & Sklarz LLC as Counsel to Debtor-in-Possession (RE: #19). (Rai, Sujata)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on September 7, 2021. Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
September 7, 2021 Filing 43 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/7/2021 12:08:16 PM ]. File Size [ 25534 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:10:56 ]. (courtspeak).
September 7, 2021 Filing 42 Hearing Held. (RE: #19 Application to Employ Green & Sklarz LLC as Counsel to Debtorfiled by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). Granted for the reasons stated on the record. Revised Order Due: September 8, 2021. (Senteio, Renee)
September 7, 2021 Filing 41 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #14 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 10/12/2021 at 02:00 PM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 10/5/2021. (Senteio, Renee)
September 7, 2021 Filing 40 Status conference held. (RE: #14 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). Notice of hearing to be issued scheduling a hearing on the Disclosure Statement for October 12, 2021 at 2:00 PM. (Senteio, Renee)
September 7, 2021 Filing 39 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #16 Motion for Order (1) Authorizing and Approving Form of Stalking Horse Agreement, (2) Authorizing and Approving Bidding Procedures, (3) Authorizing and Approving Break-up Fee, (4) Scheduling an Auction, (5) Approving Form and Manner of Notice Concerning Auction, Sale Procedures and Sale Hearing, and (6) Granting Other Related Relief Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc., Debtor). Hearing to be held on 10/5/2021 at 02:00 PM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 9/28/2021. (Senteio, Renee)
September 7, 2021 Filing 38 Status Conference Held. (RE: #16 Motion for Order (1) Authorizing and Approving Form of Stalking Horse Agreement, (2) Authorizing and Approving Bidding Procedures, (3) Authorizing and Approving Break-up Fee, (4) Scheduling an Auction, (5) Approving Form and Manner of Notice Concerning Auction, Sale Procedures and Sale Hearing, and (6) Granting Other Related Relief Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc., Debtor). Notice of hearing to be issued scheduling hearing for October 5, 2021 at 2:00 PM for the reason stated on the record. (Senteio, Renee)
September 7, 2021 Filing 37 The scheduled hearing or conference before the Honorable Julie A. Manning on Tuesday, September 14, 2021, will be conducted over the ZoomGov platform. Follow the instructions on the attached notice to receive the ZoomGov Connection information (Senteio, Renee)
September 7, 2021 Filing 36 Hearing Held (RE: #13 Application to Employ Levey Miller Maretz, LLC as Real Estate Broker and Consultant for the Debtor filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). Hearing continued to 9/14/2021 at 04:00 PM for the reasons stated on the record. (Senteio, Renee)
September 7, 2021 Filing 35 Case Management Conference held. No further Case Management Conferences will be scheduled at this time for the reasons stated on the record. (RE: #5 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). (Senteio, Renee)
September 7, 2021 Filing 34 Affidavit / Supplemental Declaration of Jeffery M. Sklarz Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc., #30 Objection filed by U.S. Trustee U. S. Trustee). (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
September 6, 2021 Filing 33 Reply to (related document(s): #13 Application to Employ Levey Miller Maretz, LLC as Real Estate Broker and Consultant for the Debtor Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc., Debtor filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc., #19 Application to Employ Green & Sklarz LLC as Counsel to Debtor Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc., Debtor filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.)and in Response to Objections Filed by US Trustee ECF Nos. 30 and 31 Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #13 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc., #19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
September 3, 2021 Filing 32 Notice of Debtor's Status Report Prior to Initial Chapter 11 Case Management Conference Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #5 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 31, 2021 Filing 31 Objection to Debtor's Application to Employ Levey Miller Maretz LLC Filed by Holley L. Claiborn on behalf of U. S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, (RE: #13 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Claiborn, Holley)
August 31, 2021 Filing 30 Objection to Debtor's Application to Employ Green & Sklarz Filed by Holley L. Claiborn on behalf of U. S. Trustee U.S. Trustee, (RE: #19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Claiborn, Holley)
August 30, 2021 Filing 29 Meeting of Creditors Continued due to Debtor to provide additional information regarding unsecured debts and assets; debtor to amend schedules and SOFA as appropriate. Debtor Appeared. Attorney For Debtor Appeared. Testimony Taken. Filed by U.S. Trustee. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 9/20/2021 at10:00 AM. DUE TO COVID-19 THE MEETING OF CREDITORS WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. Continued For Testimony and Requested Documents. (Claiborn, Holley)
August 30, 2021 Filing 28 Certificate of Service Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #13 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc., #15 Notice of Hearing, #19 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc., #20 Notice of Hearing). (Kornafel, Joanna)
August 25, 2021 Filing 27 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #24 Order Setting Status Conference). Notice Date 08/25/2021. (Admin.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #25 Generate BNC Notice/Form). Notice Date 08/25/2021. (Admin.)
August 23, 2021 Filing 25 Generated for BNC Noticing Order Scheduling Status Conference, ECF No. #24. (Senteio, Renee)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Order Scheduling Status Conference (RE: #14 Disclosure Statement filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc., #16 Motion for Order (1) Authorizing and Approving Form of Stalking Horse Agreement, (2) Authorizing and Approving Bidding Procedures, (3) Authorizing and Approving Break-up Fee, (4) Scheduling an Auction, (5) Approving Form and Manner of Notice Concerning Auction, Sale Procedures and Sale Hearing, and (6) Granting Other Related Relief filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). Status Conference to be held on 9/7/2021 at 12:00 PM. (Senteio, Renee)
August 22, 2021 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #20 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.)
August 20, 2021 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #15 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/20/2021. (Admin.)
August 20, 2021 Filing 21 Supplemental Document Proposed Order Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #16 Motion for Order filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Notice of Auction and Sale Hearing) (Kornafel, Joanna)
August 20, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #19 Application to Employ Green & Sklarz LLC as Counsel to Debtor Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc., Debtor). Hearing to be held on 9/7/2021 at 12:00 PM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 8/31/2021. (Senteio, Renee)
August 19, 2021 Filing 19 Application to Employ Green & Sklarz LLC as Counsel to Debtor Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc., Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey M. Sklarz, Esq. #2 Retention Agreement #3 Proposed Order) (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2021 Filing 18 Supplemental Document Brokerage/Listing Agreement (As executed by Debtor) Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #13 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 19, 2021 Filing 17 Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor . (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2021 Filing 16 Motion for Order (1) Authorizing and Approving Form of Stalking Horse Agreement, (2) Authorizing and Approving Bidding Procedures, (3) Authorizing and Approving Break-up Fee, (4) Scheduling an Auction, (5) Approving Form and Manner of Notice Concerning Auction, Sale Procedures and Sale Hearing, and (6) Granting Other Related Relief Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc., Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Stalking Horse Agreement #2 Exhibit B - Bidding Procedures #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Notice) (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #13 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). Hearing to be held on 9/7/2021 at 12:00 PM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 8/31/2021. (Esposito, Pamela)
August 18, 2021 Filing 14 Disclosure Statement for Plan of Reorganization of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plan of Reorganization #2 Exhibit B - Proposed Stalking Horse Purchase and Sale Agreement #3 Exhibit C - Proposed Bidding and Auction Procedures #4 Exhibit D - Proposed Notice of Sale #5 Exhibit E - Liquidation Analysis #6 Exhibit F - Payment Waterfall)(Sklarz, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/19/2021 (Rai, Sujata).
August 18, 2021 Filing 13 Application to Employ Levey Miller Maretz, LLC as Real Estate Broker and Consultant for the Debtor Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc., Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brokerage/Listing Agreement #2 Declaration of Steve Miller #3 Proposed Order) (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 18, 2021 Filing 12 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor,. (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 15, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance Filed by Barbara H. Katz on behalf of Barbara H. Katz . (Katz, Barbara)
August 11, 2021 Filing 10 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #5 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). Notice Date 08/11/2021. (Admin.)
August 11, 2021 Filing 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #5 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). Notice Date 08/11/2021. (Admin.)
August 11, 2021 Filing 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: #4 Meeting of Creditors). Notice Date 08/11/2021. (Admin.)
August 9, 2021 Filing 7 Amended Voluntary Petition Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Auto-Swage Products, Inc.). (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2021 Filing 6 Notice of Appearance Filed by Joanna M. Kornafel on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor, . (Kornafel, Joanna)
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Scheduling Initial Chapter 11 Case Management Conference. Hearing to be held on 9/7/2021 at 12:00 PM. (Esposito, Pamela)
August 9, 2021 Filing 4 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 8/30/2021 at 02:00 PM. telephonic. Proofs of Claims due by 11/5/2021. (Staton, Sandra)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Clerk's Evidence of Repeat Filings(Admin)
August 7, 2021 Filing 3 Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Jeffrey M. Sklarz on behalf of Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Debtor,. (Staton, Sandra)
August 7, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Auto-Swage Products, Inc. Filing Fee $1738. All schedules and statements filed (Sklarz, Jeffrey)
August 7, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-50502) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee - $1738.00. Receipt number 9888286. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Auto-Swage Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Auto-Swage Products, Inc.
Represented By: Joanna M. Kornafel
Represented By: Jeffrey M. Sklarz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U. S. Trustee
Represented By: Holley L. Claiborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?