Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.
Debtor: Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.
Us Trustee: U. S. Trustee
Case Number: 5:2021bk50521
Filed: August 20, 2021
Court: U.S. Bankruptcy Court for the District of Connecticut
Presiding Judge: Julie A Manning
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2021 Filing 88 The scheduled hearing or conference before the Honorable Julie A. Manning on Wednesday, October 20, 2021, will be conducted over the ZoomGov platform. Follow the instructions on the attached notice to receive the ZoomGov Connection information (Senteio, Renee)
October 13, 2021 Filing 87 Objection Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Caretech Supplies, LLC Creditor, (RE: #12 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens per 363(f) filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). (Linsey, Patrick)
October 12, 2021 Filing 86 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 10/12/2021 1:05:56 PM ]. File Size [ 3683 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:14 ]. (courtspeak).
October 12, 2021 Filing 85 Hearing Held. No qualified bids were received. The auction scheduled to be held on October 15, 2021, at 1:00 p.m. will not be held due to the lack of submission of any qualified bids. (RE: #61 Order on Motion to Sell Free and Clear 363(f)). (Esposito, Pamela)
October 9, 2021 Filing 84 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #81 Deficiency Notice). Notice Date 10/09/2021. (Admin.)
October 8, 2021 Filing 83 Certificate of Service Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #80 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). (Kindseth, Stephen)
October 8, 2021 Filing 82 Corrected Amendment -Declaration Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #80 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). (Kindseth, Stephen)
October 7, 2021 Filing 81 Amendment Deficiency Notice Issued. Certification of Service is deficient does not show service of 341 notice to new creditors, Declaration Under Penalty for Non-Individual Debtors.Official Form 202 (RE: #80 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). (Staton, Sandra)
October 6, 2021 Filing 80 Amended Schedules D,. Fee Amount $32. Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
October 6, 2021 Receipt of Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors(21-50521) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00) filing fee - $ 32.00. Receipt number 9948248. (U.S. Treasury)
September 30, 2021 Filing 79 Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 08/31/2021 Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 24, 2021 Filing 78 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #74 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 09/24/2021. (Admin.)
September 24, 2021 Filing 77 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #73 Order on Application to Employ). Notice Date 09/24/2021. (Admin.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 76 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #66 Order Setting Status Conference). Notice Date 09/22/2021. (Admin.)
September 22, 2021 Filing 75 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #65 Order Setting Status Conference). Notice Date 09/22/2021. (Admin.)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Order Approving Employment of Brass Moon Realty By the Debtor (RE: #28). (Staton, Sandra)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 Order Approving Appointment Of Counsel To The Debtor (RE: #3). (Staton, Sandra)
September 21, 2021 Filing 72 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/21/2021 11:03:57 AM ]. File Size [ 4118 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:11:26 ]. (courtspeak).
September 21, 2021 Filing 71 Amended Notice of Sale of Estate Property: 540 Bond Street a/k/a 600 Bond Street and 735 Palisades Avenue, Bridgeport, Connecticut and all improvements and personal property situated thereon. by public sale on October 15, 2021. A hearing on any accompanying motion to sell or objections to the sale to be heard on October 20, 2021 at 1:00PM. Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, . Objections due by 10/13/2021. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 21, 2021 Filing 70 Status Conference Held. (RE: #66 Amended Order Setting Status Conference). Amended Notice of Sale of Estate Property due: September 22, 2021 for the reasons stated on the record. (Senteio, Renee)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on September 15, 2021. Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #28 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., 55 Hearing Held). (Attachments: #1 Redline) (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on September 15, 2021. Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #3 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., 55 Hearing Held). (Attachments: #1 Redline) (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 20, 2021 Filing 67 Certificate of Service Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #61 Order on Motion to Sell Free and Clear 363(f)). (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 20, 2021 Filing 66 Corrected Order Scheduling Status Conference (RE: #62 Notice of Sale of Estate Property filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). Status Conference to be held on 9/21/2021 at 11:00 AM. (Senteio, Renee)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 Order Scheduling Telephonic Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 9/21/2021 at 11:00 AM. (Senteio, Renee)
September 18, 2021 Filing 64 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #61 Order on Motion to Sell Free and Clear 363(f)). Notice Date 09/18/2021. (Admin.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 63 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #52 Clerks Notice of ZoomGov Instructions Regarding Scheduled Hearing). Notice Date 09/16/2021. (Admin.)
September 16, 2021 Filing 62 Notice of Sale of Estate Property: 540 Bond Street a/k/a 600 Bond Street and 735 Palisades Avenue, Bridgeport, Connecticut and all improvements and personal property situated thereon. by public sale on October 20, 2021. A hearing on any accompanying motion to sell or objections to the sale to be heard on October 20, 2021 at 2:00PM. Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, . Objections due by 10/13/2021. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 Order Granting In Part Debtor's Motion for Entry of (I) An Order (A) Approving Bid Procedures For The Sale Of Substantially All Of The Debtor's Assets, (B) Authorizing The Debtor To Enter Into Purchase And Sale Agreement With Stalking Horse Bidder and (C) Scheduling A Final Sale Hearing and Approving The Form and Manner Of Notice Thereof and (II) An Order (A) Authorizing The Sale Of Substantially All Of The Debtor's Assets and (B) Granting Certain Related Relief (RE: #12). (Esposito, Pamela)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 Supplemental Document - Redline Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #59 Proposed Order Requested by Judge filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 Proposed Order Requested by Judge. Hearing was held on 09/15/2021. Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: 56 Hearing Held). (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 16, 2021 Filing 58 U.S. Trustee's Statement of No Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #28 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). (Mackey, Steven)
September 15, 2021 Filing 57 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/15/2021 1:15:04 PM ]. File Size [ 40130 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:51:28 ]. (courtspeak).
September 15, 2021 Filing 56 Hearing Held. (RE: #12 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens per 363(f) filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). Granted in part for the reasons stated on the record. Revised Order Due: September 16, 2021 re: Notice to be served by 7:00 PM on September 16, 2021. Debtor to file Local form Notice of Sale of Estate Property. Bid deadline: October 8, 2021 by 5:00 PM. Hearing to determine qualified bidders: October 12, 2021 at 1:00 PM. Objections to sale due: October 13, 2021 by 12:00 Noon. Auction: October 15, 2021 at 1:00 PM. Sale approval hearing: October 20, 2021 at 2:00 PM. (Senteio, Renee)
September 15, 2021 Filing 55 Hearing Held. (RE: #3 Application to Employ Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debto, #28 Application to Employ Brass Moon Realty as Real Estate Broker Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debtor). Applications granted for the reasons stated on the record. Revised Orders Due: September 20, 2021. (Senteio, Renee)
September 15, 2021 Filing 54 Conference Held. (RE: #9 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). No further conferences to be scheduled at this time for the reasons stated on the record. (Senteio, Renee)
September 14, 2021 Filing 53 PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/14/2021 2:09:51 PM ]. File Size [ 38991 KB ]. Run Time [ 01:48:19 ]. (courtspeak).
September 14, 2021 Filing 52 The scheduled hearing or conference before the Honorable Julie A. Manning on Wednesday, September 15, 2021, will be conducted over the ZoomGov platform. Follow the instructions on the attached notice to receive the ZoomGov Connection information (Senteio, Renee)
September 14, 2021 Filing 51 Hearing Held (RE: #3 Application to Employ Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debtor, #9 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference, #12 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens per 363(f) filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., #28 Application to Employ Brass Moon Realty as Real Estate Broker Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debtor). Hearing continued to 9/15/2021 at 01:00 PM for the reasons stated on the record. (Senteio, Renee)
September 14, 2021 Filing 50 U.S. Trustee's Statement of No Objection Filed by U.S. Trustee. (RE: #3 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). (Mackey, Steven)
September 14, 2021 Filing 49 Certificate of Service Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #12 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens per 363(f) filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., #13 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., #16 Order). (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 14, 2021 Filing 48 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor AMENDED Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 13, 2021 Filing 47 Meeting of Creditors Closed on 9/13/2021. Debtor Appeared. Attorney For Debtor Appeared. Testimony Taken. Filed by U.S. Trustee. (Mackey, Steven)
September 13, 2021 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance Filed by Patrick R. Linsey on behalf of Caretech Supplies, LLC Creditor, . (Linsey, Patrick)
September 13, 2021 Filing 45 Notice of Appearance Filed by Douglas S. Skalka on behalf of Caretech Supplies, LLC Creditor, . (Skalka, Douglas)
September 11, 2021 Filing 44 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #41 Deficiency Notice). Notice Date 09/11/2021. (Admin.)
September 9, 2021 Filing 43 Certificate of Service Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #28 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., #39 Order on Motion to Expedite Hearing). (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 42 Certificate of Service Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #8 Meeting of Creditors, #12 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens per 363(f) filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., #16 Order, #41 Deficiency Notice). (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Filing 41 Amendment Deficiency Notice Issued. Certificate of Service is not attached. (RE: #40 Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). (Rai, Sujata)
September 9, 2021 Filing 40 Amended List of Creditors.. and List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims and Are Not Insiders Fee Amount $32. Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 9, 2021 Receipt of Amended Schedules/Amended List of Creditors(21-50521) [misc,amdsch] ( 32.00) filing fee - $ 32.00. Receipt number 9920423. (U.S. Treasury)
September 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 Order Granting in Part Motion to Expedite and Schedule Hearing and Prescribe Notice. Hearing to be held on September 14, 2021 at 02:00 PM. (RE: #28 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.) Service to be made September 8, 2021 by 5:00 PM. Certificate of Service to be filed on or before September 9, 2021 by 5:00 PM. (Senteio, Renee)
September 3, 2021 Filing 38 Amended Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen). Related document(s) #34 Statement of Corporate Ownership filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.. Modified on 9/7/2021 (Rai, Sujata).
September 3, 2021 Filing 37 Amended Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen). Related document(s) #36 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.. Modified on 9/7/2021 (Rai, Sujata).
September 2, 2021 Filing 36 Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 35 Summary of Assets and Liabilities Schedules for Non-Individual Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 34 Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 33 Equity Security Holders Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 32 Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 31 Statement of Financial Affairs Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 30 Schedules include AB, D, EF, G, H, Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor,. (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 29 Motion to Expedite Hearing Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debtor (RE: #28 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kindseth, Stephen)
September 2, 2021 Filing 28 Application to Employ Brass Moon Realty as Real Estate Broker Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Proposed Order) (Kindseth, Stephen)
August 31, 2021 Filing 27 Notice of Appearance Filed by Gregory S. Kimmel on behalf of RTLF-CT, LLC Creditor, . (Kimmel, Gregory)
August 26, 2021 Filing 26 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #17 Clerks Notice of ZoomGov Instructions Regarding Scheduled Hearing). Notice Date 08/26/2021. (Admin.)
August 26, 2021 Filing 25 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #16 Order). Notice Date 08/26/2021. (Admin.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 24 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. (RE: #9 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference). Notice Date 08/25/2021. (Admin.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 23 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors. (RE: #8 Meeting of Creditors). Notice Date 08/25/2021. (Admin.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 22 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #14 Deficiency Notice re: Motions/Applications). Notice Date 08/25/2021. (Admin.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #10 Hearing Continued/Rescheduled). Notice Date 08/25/2021. (Admin.)
August 25, 2021 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance (Appearance by Mark S. Shipman) Filed by David M.S. Shaiken on behalf of 735 Palisade Avenue LLC Partner, . (Shaiken, David)
August 25, 2021 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance Filed by Juda J. Epstein on behalf of Water Pollution Control Authority For The City Of Bridgeport Creditor, . (Epstein, Juda)
August 25, 2021 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance and Notice Request Filed by Jon P. Newton on behalf of Jon P. Newton, Ch. 7 Trustee for Bridgeport Health Care Center Inc. Interested Party, . (Newton, Jon)
August 24, 2021 Filing 17 The scheduled hearing or conference before the Honorable Julie A. Manning on Tuesday, September 14, 2021, will be conducted over the ZoomGov platform. Follow the instructions on the attached notice to receive the ZoomGov Connection information (Senteio, Renee)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Order Regarding Initial Chapter 11 Case Management Conference, Scheduling Hearings on Pending Motions, and Denying Motion to Expedite (RE: #3 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., #9 Chapter 11 Case Management Conference/Status Conference, #12 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens per 363(f) filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., #13 Motion to Expedite Hearing filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). The Motion to Expedite Hearing is denied. The Chapter 11 Case Management Conference is rescheduled to September 14, 2021 at 2:00 PM. The Application to Employ is rescheduled to September 14, 2021 at 2:00 PM. A hearing on the Motion to Sell will be held on September 14, 2021 at 2:00 PM. (Senteio, Renee)
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Scott D. Rosen on behalf of People's United Bank, National Association Creditor, . (Rosen, Scott)
August 23, 2021 Filing 14 Deficiency Notice Regarding Motions/Applications. Not in compliance with D.Conn. Bankr. L.R. 6004-1 and 6004-2: Missing/Incomplete Notice of Sale of EstateProperty. (RE: #12 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens per 363(f) filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). Motion/Application Compliance due by 8/30/2021. (Staton, Sandra)
August 23, 2021 Filing 13 Motion to Expedite Hearing AND SCHEDULE HEARING AND PRESCRIBE NOTICE ON DEBTORS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF (I) AN ORDER (A) APPROVING BIDDING PROCEDURES AND BIDDER PROTECTIONS IN CONNECTION WITH THE SALE OF SUBSTANTIALLY ALL OF THE DEBTORS ASSETS, (B) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO ENTER INTO PURCHASE AND SALE AGREEMENT WITH STALKING HORSE BIDDER AND (C) SCHEDULING A FINAL SALE HEARING AND APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE THEREOF AND (II) AN ORDER (A) AUTHORIZING THE SALE OF SUBSTANTIALLY ALL OF THE DEBTORS ASSETS FREE AND CLEAR OF ANY INTEREST IN SUCH ASSETS AND (B) GRANTING CERTAIN RELATED RELIEF Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debtor (RE: #12 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens per 363(f) filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.) (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Kindseth, Stephen)
August 23, 2021 Filing 12 Motion to Sell /MOTION FOR ENTRY OF (I) AN ORDER (A) APPROVING BIDDING PROCEDURES AND BIDDER PROTECTIONS IN CONNECTION WITH THE SALE OF SUBSTANTIALLY ALL OF THE DEBTORS ASSETS, (B) AUTHORIZING THE DEBTOR TO ENTER INTO PURCHASE AND SALE AGREEMENT WITH STALKING HORSE BIDDER AND (C) SCHEDULING A FINAL SALE HEARING AND APPROVING THE FORM AND MANNER OF NOTICE THEREOF AND (II) AN ORDER (A) AUTHORIZING THE SALE OF SUBSTANTIALLY ALL OF THE DEBTORS ASSETS FREE AND CLEAR OF ANY INTEREST IN SUCH ASSETS AND (B) GRANTING CERTAIN RELATED RELIEF Free and Clear of Liens . Fee Amount $188. Fee to be Paid by Internet Credit Card. Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debtor on 8/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A #2 Exhibit B #3 Exhibit C #4 Exhibit D #5 Exhibit E #6 Exhibit F) (Kindseth, Stephen)
August 23, 2021 Filing 11 Notice of Appearance Filed by David M.S. Shaiken on behalf of 735 Palisade Avenue LLC Partner, . (Shaiken, David)
August 23, 2021 Filing 10 Notice of Rescheduled Hearing due to the Court's calendar (RE: #3 Application to Employ filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). Hearing to be held on 9/7/2021 at 02:00 PM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 8/31/2021. (Senteio, Renee)
August 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Order Scheduling Initial Chapter 11 Case Management Conference. Conference to be held on 9/7/2021 at 02:00 PM. (Senteio, Renee)
August 23, 2021 Filing 8 Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case. The Meeting of Creditors pursuant to Section 341(a) to be held on 9/13/2021 at 02:00 PM. DUE TO COVID-19 THE MEETING OF CREDITORS WILL BE HELD TELEPHONICALLY. Proofs of Claims due by 11/18/2021. (Rai, Sujata)
August 23, 2021 Receipt of Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens per 363(f)(21-50521) [motion,msellfc] ( 188.00) filing fee - $ 188.00. Receipt number 9904236. (U.S. Treasury)
August 22, 2021 Filing 7 BNC Certificate of Mailing (RE: #4 Deficiency Notice/Notice of Dismissal). Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.)
August 22, 2021 Filing 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing (RE: #5 Notice of Hearing). Notice Date 08/22/2021. (Admin.)
August 20, 2021 Filing 5 Notice of Hearing Issued (RE: #3 Application to Employ Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debtor). Hearing to be held on 9/7/2021 at 10:00 AM. Objection deadline: before 4:00 pm on 8/31/2021. (Senteio, Renee)
August 20, 2021 Filing 4 Deficiency Notice and Notice of Dismissal of Case for Failure to Cure Deficiency: Schedule(s) A/B, D-H, Summary of your Assets and Liabilities and Certain Statistical Information, Statement of Financial Affairs, Attorneys Disclosure of Compensation, Declaration about Debtors Schedules for Non-Individuals, List of Creditors who have the 20 Largest Claims against you and are not Insiders, List of Equity Security Holders, Statement of Corporate Ownership, Statement of Corporate Resolution, due 9/3/2021. (Rai, Sujata)
August 20, 2021 Filing 3 Application to Employ Zeisler & Zeisler, P.C. as Counsel for the Debtor Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co., Debtor. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Proposed Order #2 Exhibit B- Verified Statement with Exhibits 1 and 2) (Kindseth, Stephen)
August 20, 2021 Filing 2 Supplemental Document Unanimous Consent for Bankruptcy Filed by Stephen M. Kindseth on behalf of Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Debtor, (RE: #1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.). (Kindseth, Stephen)
August 20, 2021 Filing 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co. Filing Fee $1738. All schedules and statements filed except for: Summary of Assets and Liabilities, Schedules A/B, D-H, Declaration of Debtor's Schedules, Statement of Financial Affairs, Attorney Disclosure Statement, List of Equity Security Holders, Corporate Ownership Statement, Corporate Resolution and 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors (Kindseth, Stephen) Modified on 8/20/2021 (Rai, Sujata).
August 20, 2021 Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)(21-50521) [misc,volp11] (1738.00) filing fee - $1738.00. Receipt number 9902072. (U.S. Treasury)

Search for this case: Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Debtor: Bridgeport Health Care Realty Co.
Represented By: Stephen M. Kindseth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Us trustee: U. S. Trustee
Represented By: Steven E. Mackey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?