Martinez v. Ferguson Library et al Featured Case

Americans with Disabilities lawsuit - claim that library has architectural barriers e.g. only stairs to third floor.

Plaintiff: Jose Ernesto Martinez
Defendant: Ferguson Library and Ernest DiMattia
Case Number: 3:2007cv01212
Filed: August 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: No cause code entered
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 47
ORDER: The parties having reported that this action has been settled in full. Rather than continue to keep the case open on the docket, the Clerk is directed to administratively close the file. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/18/08. (Wood, R.)
March 28, 2008 Filing 44
First MOTION for Extension of Time until April 22, 2008 to file responsive pleading by Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia. (Bayonne, Michel)
March 5, 2008 Filing 39
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss until 3/4/08 by Jose Ernesto Martinez. (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
February 25, 2008 Filing 36
Third MOTION for Extension of Time until March 10, 2008 to file responses/objections to Plaintiff's First Set of Discovery by Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia. (Bayonne, Michel)
February 22, 2008 Filing 34
Third MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendants' Motion to Dimiss as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss until March 10, 2008 by Jose Ernesto Martinez. (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
January 3, 2008 Filing 32
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until February 28, 2008 to file objections/responses to discovery requests by Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia. (Bayonne, Michel)
December 28, 2007 Filing 30
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss until 02/23/2008 by Jose Ernesto Martinez. (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
December 14, 2007 Filing 28
MOTION for Reconsideration re 25 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,,,, by Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia.Responses due by 1/4/2008 (Bayonne, Michel)
December 11, 2007 Filing 26
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendants' Motion to Dismiss as to 20 MOTION to Dismiss until 01/09/2007 by Jose Ernesto Martinez. (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
December 6, 2007 Filing 24
First MOTION for Extension of Time until January 14, 2007 or until 3 weeks after ruling on Motion to Dismiss to file responses/objections to admissions by Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia. (Bayonne, Michel)
November 9, 2007 Filing 18
REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cortese-Costa, Loraine)
October 15, 2007 Filing 15
Second MOTION for Extension of Time until November 29, 2007 to file responsive pleading by Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia. (Cortese-Costa, Loraine)
October 9, 2007 Filing 13
MOTION for Pre-Filing Conference by Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia. (Cortese-Costa, Loraine)
October 5, 2007 Filing 12
NOTICE of Appearance by Loraine M. Cortese-Costa on behalf of Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia (Cortese-Costa, Loraine)
September 27, 2007 Filing 11
NOTICE of Appearance by Michel Bayonne on behalf of Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia (Bayonne, Michel)
September 14, 2007 Filing 9
First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 15, 2007 to file responsive pleading by Ferguson Library, Ernest DiMattia. (Hodgson, Christopher)
September 10, 2007 Filing 7
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Ernesto Martinez. Ferguson Library served on 8/24/2007, answer due 9/13/2007. (Kaloidis, Ioannis)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 5
ORDER RE: Judges Chambers Practices and Standing Orders. Counsel/Parties please see attached order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/6/07. (Wood, R.)
August 8, 2007 Filing 4
NOTICE of Appearance by Ioannis A. Kaloidis on behalf of Jose Ernesto Martinez (Brown, S.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez v. Ferguson Library et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Ernesto Martinez
Represented By: Ioannis A. Kaloidis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ferguson Library
Represented By: Christopher M. Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ernest DiMattia
Represented By: Christopher M. Hodgson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?