Mercexchange LLC v. eBay, Inc et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: Mercexchange LLC
Defendant: eBay, Inc and HALF.COM Inc
Respondent: Kenneth Nahan
Case Number: 3:2007mc00038
Filed: February 2, 2007
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: Motion to Compel
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2010. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2007 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Allan M. Soobert on behalf of eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc (Pesta, J.)
February 26, 2007 19 Featured Case ORDER granting 13 Motion for Reconsideration, vacating prior ruling & denying 1 Motion to Compel;. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/23/07. (Pesta, J.)
February 21, 2007 18 Sealed Document by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc re 17 Sealed Document, 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re 6 Order on Motion to Compel MOTION for Reconsideration re 6 Order on Motion to Compel. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-8)(Torday, B.)
February 21, 2007 17 Sealed Document by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc re 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re 6 Order on Motion to Compel MOTION for Reconsideration re 6 Order on Motion to Compel. (Torday, B.)
February 21, 2007 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting 15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Gregory N. Stillman for Mercexchange LLC and Kenneth Nahan added.. Signed by Clerk on 2/21/07. THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE THE COURT SHALL ISSUE!(Torday, B.)
February 21, 2007 15 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Gregory N. Stillman Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number N020594. by Mercexchange LLC, Kenneth Nahan. (Torday, B.)
February 20, 2007 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert M. Frost, Jr on behalf of Mercexchange LLC, Kenneth Nahan (Pesta, J.)
February 15, 2007 13 MOTION for Reconsideration re 6 Order granting Motion to Compel by Mercexchange LLC, Kenneth Nahan.Responses due by 3/8/2007 (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Edward R. Scofield# 2 Memorandum in Support # 3 Exhibits A & B# 4 Exhibits C thru I)(Inferrera, L.)
February 15, 2007 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward R. Scofield on behalf of Kenneth Nahan, Mercexchange LLC (Inferrera, L.)
February 12, 2007 11 Featured Case ORDER granting 9 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Jeffrey G. Randall to Appear pro hac vice by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/07. (Pesta, J.)
February 12, 2007 10 Featured Case ORDER granting 8 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Allan M. Soobert to Appear pro hac vice by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc. Signed by Clerk on 2/12/07. (Pesta, J.)
February 12, 2007 6 RULING granting 1 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 2/9/07. (Pesta, J.)
February 9, 2007 9 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Jeffrey G. Randall to Appear pro hac vice by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number N020519. (Pesta, J.)
February 9, 2007 8 MOTION for Leave for Attorney Allan M. Soobert to Appear pro hac vice by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc. Filing Fee $25.00. Receipt Number N020519. (Pesta, J.)
February 9, 2007 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Rowena Amanda Moffett on behalf of eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc (Pesta, J.)
February 2, 2007 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc. (Pesta, J.)
February 2, 2007 4 NOTICE of Appearance by David R. Schaefer on behalf of eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc (Pesta, J.)
February 2, 2007 3 AFFIDAVIT re 1 MOTION to Compel Signed By David R. Schaefer filed by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc. Exhibits in paper format only (too large) (Pesta, J.)
February 2, 2007 2 Memorandum in Support re 1 MOTION to Compel filed by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc. Modified text on 2/5/2007 to indicate no exhibits(Pesta, J.)
February 2, 2007 1 MOTION to Compel Kenneth Nahan to comply with a subpoena duces tecum by eBay, Inc, HALF.COM Inc.Responses due by 2/23/2007 (Pesta, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mercexchange LLC v. eBay, Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mercexchange LLC
Represented By: Gregory N. Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: eBay, Inc
Represented By: Allan M. Soobert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HALF.COM Inc
Represented By: Allan M. Soobert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kenneth Nahan
Represented By: Gregory N. Stillman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?