Pappas v. Enfield et al

Plaintiff: Margaret R. Pappas
Defendant: Town of Enfield, Planning And Zoning Commission, Anthony DiPace, Jeffrey D. Cooper, James A. Hickey, Jr. and Karen Weseliza
Case Number: 3:2008cv00250
Filed: February 15, 2008
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 7, 2014 103 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (see attached) granting 74 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk is directed to close the file. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on 5/07/2014. (Wang, S)
July 20, 2010 59 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (see attached) denying 52 Plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on July 20, 2010. (Lacedonia, J.)
February 3, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (see attached) granting in part and denying in part 31 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff's substantive due process claim is dismissed with prejudice. Defendants' motion to dismiss Plaintiff's equal protection claim is denied. Plaintiff's claim for taking of property is dismissed without prejudice. Notwithstanding the scheduling order of May 13, 2009, the parties are directed to confer and file on or before February 19, 2010 a joint proposal as to reasonable deadlines for completing discovery on the remaining claim and filing dispositive motions, or, if none are filed, a trial ready date.Signed by Judge Charles S. Haight, Jr. on February 3, 2010.(Lacedonia, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pappas v. Enfield et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret R. Pappas
Represented By: Kenneth R. Slater, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Enfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Planning And Zoning Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony DiPace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey D. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Hickey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Weseliza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?