Gulley v. Dzurenda et al

Plaintiff: Chaz O. Gulley
Defendant: James Dzurenda, Kyle Mitchell, Howard Burritt, James Durkin, Daniel Almeida and Michael Fraser
Case Number: 3:2008cv00492
Filed: April 3, 2008
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: Civil Rights: Other Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 28:1331 Fed. Question

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2010 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 55 Motion for Production of DVD Recordings Served on Defendants; denying 56 Motion for Production of DVD Recordings Served on Defendants; denying 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Thomas P. Smith on August 27, 2010. (Hyne, J.)
February 25, 2010 46 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying without prejudice 44 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith on 2/25/10. (Ferguson, L.) Modified on 2/26/2010 to mark as an Opinion (Ferguson, L.).
February 17, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING denying 42 Motion to Amend Complaint; denying 43 Motion to Modify and Withdraw Subpoenas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas P. Smith on 2/17/10. (Ferguson, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gulley v. Dzurenda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chaz O. Gulley
Represented By: Kimberly Coleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyle Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Howard Burritt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Durkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Almeida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Fraser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?