Trusz v. USB Rlty Investors LLC et al

Plaintiff: Richard Trusz
Defendant: USB Rlty Investors LLC and USB AG
Case Number: 3:2009cv00268
Filed: February 13, 2009
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: 18:1514 Civil action to restrain harassment of a victim or witness
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 18, 2016 452 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER RE: MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Defendants' motion for summary judgment, Doc. # 287 , is DENIED. See attached amended ruling. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 4/18/16. (Adriance, S)
March 25, 2016 449 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. There are triable issues of fact on all claims except the ADA claim. Accordingly, defendants' motion with respect to Count Six is GRANTED, and defendants' motion with respect to Counts One through Four is DENIED (Doc. # 287 ). Plaintiff's motions are DENIED in their entirety (Docs. # 284 and # 316 ). It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 3/25/16. (Adriance, S)
January 14, 2015 406 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING RE PENDING DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS 185 209 253 262 . See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Jeffrey A. Meyer on 1/14/2015.(Norman, D.)
March 9, 2012 346 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: denying 327 Motion to Compel, denying 341 Motion for Attorney's Fees. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 3/9/2012. (Rodko, B.)
August 10, 2011 277 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: denying 265 Motion for Leave to Serve Subpoena on Foot Locker. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 8/10/2011. (Rodko, B.)
July 8, 2011 254 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING FOLLOWING IN CAMERA REVIEW. Defendants need not produce any additional documents to plaintiff as a result of this in camera review. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 7/8/2011. (Rodko, B.)
June 27, 2011 241 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: granting in part and denying in part 224 Motion to Quash Deposition Subpoena Directed to Karl Koch of IPERS. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/27/2011. (Rodko, B.)
June 23, 2011 233 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: granting 210 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/23/2011. (Rodko, B.)
June 21, 2011 232 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: denying without prejudice as moot regarding the subpoenas served on SURS, Ruggles and FSBA; granting in part and denying in part regarding subpoenas served on Townsend Group, Hewitt EnnisKnupp, and Dohrmann 204 Motion to Quash Six Third-Party Subpoenas; granting 227 Motion to Seal Exhibit A. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 6/21/2011. (Rodko, B.)
February 14, 2011 180 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: granting 163 Motion for Independent Mental Examination. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/14/2011. (Rodko, B.)
February 8, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING Regarding Plaintiff's Desire to Depose Several Employees who Reside and are Employed in Europe. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 2/8/2011. (Rodko, B.)
January 13, 2011 168 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION: granting in part 127 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 1/13/2011. (Rodko, B.)
September 7, 2010 124 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING: granting in part to the extent set forth in ruling 104 Motion to Compel; denying 104 Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 9/7/2010. (Rodko, B.)
March 30, 2010 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint 23 is granted as to Count Five and denied as to Counts One, Two, Three, and Four. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 03/30/2010. (Kretman, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trusz v. USB Rlty Investors LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Trusz
Represented By: Todd D. Steigman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USB Rlty Investors LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USB AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?