Davis et al v. Connecticut Community Bank
Plaintiff: Christina M. Davis, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Daniel L. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Jason M. Rausher, Melissa Doron, Marsha H. Rausher, Paula S. Katz, Loretta D. Weinberg, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Traci D. Davis, Richard Abramowitz, Rita S. Katz, Daniel S. Katz, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Robin S. Abramowitz, Sol Davis, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Mitchell J. Rausher, Bernard B. Wineberg, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Frank S. Katz, Eric M. Rausher, Peggy Kohn, Theresa A. Wolfe and Jing W. Davis
Defendant: Connecticut Community Bank NA and All Plaintiffs
Petitioner: Giuseppe C Basili
Interested Party: David S Golub
Case Number: 3:2010cv00261
Filed: February 23, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L Bryant
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2013. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2013 Filing 420 Acknowledgment of Receipt All of Plantiffs' and Defendants' trial exhibits Acknowledgment filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (LaLone, L.)
July 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 419 ORDER DISMISSING CASE as settled. After the close of evidence, the parties have reported that this case has settled. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/19/13.(LaLone, L.) Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/19/13.(LaLone, L.)
July 19, 2013 JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (LaLone, L.)
July 17, 2013 Filing 418 Marked Witness List by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (LaLone, L.)
July 17, 2013 Filing 417 Marked Exhibit List by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (LaLone, L.)
July 17, 2013 Filing 416 Marked Witness List by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (LaLone, L.)
July 17, 2013 Filing 415 Marked Exhibit List by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (LaLone, L.)
July 11, 2013 Filing 414 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Trial held on 7/11/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 7/15/13 at 9:30am. Total Time: 1 hours and 46 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
July 10, 2013 Filing 413 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Trial (Charge Conference) held on 7/10/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 7/11/13 at 9:30am. Total Time: 3 hours and 31 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.) Modified text on 7/11/2013 (LaLone, L.).
July 8, 2013 Filing 412 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. The Court sets the Jury Charge Conference for 7/10/2013 at 03:30 PM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. (Rock, K.)
July 1, 2013 Filing 411 OBJECTION re #408 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel)
July 1, 2013 Filing 410 OBJECTION re #407 MOTION to Amend/Correct Proposed Verdict Forms Regarding Liability filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel)
July 1, 2013 Filing 409 Memorandum in Opposition re #405 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Rule 50(a) Motion) filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
June 28, 2013 Filing 408 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 7/19/2013 (Merschman, Joseph)
June 28, 2013 Filing 407 MOTION to Amend/Correct Proposed Verdict Forms Regarding Liability by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 7/19/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Revised Proposed Verdict Form - Liability)(Merschman, Joseph)
June 28, 2013 Filing 406 Memorandum in Support re #405 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Rule 50(a) Motion) filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel)
June 28, 2013 Filing 405 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law (Rule 50(a) Motion) by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 7/19/2013 (Jo, Daniel)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 404 ORDER Granting #250 Motion in Limine to Exclude Improper Opinions Given by Plaintiffs' Expert Steven L. Henning and #327 Motion to Strike Henning's Revised Expert Report; Order on Plaintiffs' Proffer of Evidence of CUTPA Violation [Levinson Dkt. 555; Davis Dkt. #346 ]. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/27/13. (Rock, K.)
June 27, 2013 Filing 403 Minute Entry. Proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: taking under advisement 402 Oral Motion for Directed Verdict; Jury Trial held on 6/27/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 7/11/13 at 9:30am; Motion Hearing held on 6/27/2013 re 402 ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. Total Time: 5 hours and 18 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
June 27, 2013 Filing 402 ORAL MOTION for Directed Verdict by Connecticut Community Bank NA. Responses due by 7/1/2013 (LaLone, L.)
June 27, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 401 ORDER. Motion for Directed Verdict is due by midnight on Friday 6/28/2013, opposition to the motion is due by midnight on Monday 7/1/2013. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/27/13.(LaLone, L.)
June 25, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER: Plaintiffs have sought to offer testimony from which the jury could conclude that Westport National Bank ("WNB") employees should have been aware of the OCC's Custody Services Comptroller's Handbook, dated January 2002 (the "Handbook") and complied with its terms. By this Order the Court rules that such testimony or other evidence may not be elicited. The Handbook does not impose procedures with which banks are either required or encouraged to comply in performing their duties under custodial agreements such as the one at issue in this case. The Handbook expressly provides that "[t]his booklet addresses the fundamentals of securities custody and related services, and provides guidance for examining those activities in national banks." Handbook at page 1. The Handbook does not purport to define a custodial relationship or custodial duties. Instead, it expressly states that while "[s]ervices provided by a bank custodian are typically the settlement, safekeeping, and reporting of customers' marketable securities and cash[.], [a] custody relationship is contractual, and services performed for a customer may vary." Handbook at page 1. Accordingly, testimony and other evidence which has a tendency to lead the jury to believe that Ms. Murphy or any other bank employee should have read and assured that WNB complied with the Handbook, which recognizes the contractual nature of the relationship, would mislead the jury and may not therefore be offered by either party. See Fed. R. Evid. 403 ("The Court may exclude evidence if its probative value is substantially outweighed by a danger of... confusing the issues, misleading the jury,..."). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/25/13.(Rock, K.)
June 25, 2013 Filing 399 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Trial held on 6/25/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 6/27/13 at 9:30am. Total Time: 5 hours and 45 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
June 24, 2013 Filing 398 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Trial held on 6/24/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 6/25/13 at 9:30am. Total Time: 4 hours and 22 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
June 21, 2013 Filing 397 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Trial held on 6/21/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 6/24/13 at 9:30am. Total Time: 3 hours and 10 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
June 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER Overruling Plaintiffs' Objection to Defendant's Response to the Court's May 31, 2013 Order #376 . See attached Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/20/13. (Rock, K.)
June 20, 2013 Filing 395 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Trial held on 6/20/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 6/21/13 at 9:30am. Total Time: 5 hours and 14 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
June 18, 2013 Filing 394 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Trial held on 6/18/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 6/20/13 at 9:30am. Total Time: 6 hours and 0 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
June 18, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 393 ORDER: Page 34, footnote 10 of the Court's ruling on summary judgment in the Levinson matter, dated September 28, 2012, does not preclude all testimony concerning the IRS. [Levinson Dkt. 457.] The Court wrote: "To the extent that the Plaintiffs rely on 26 U.S.C. 408 (2006) or WNB's obligation to provide Form 5498's to the Internal Revenue Service to establish that the contract required WNB to provide records and statements which reflected that the Plaintiffs' BLMIS investments did not exist, this Court concludes that neither imposes any duties on WNB beyond those in the custodial agreements. The custodial agreement therefore determines the scope of WNB's responsibility to ensure the accuracy of information reported to the IRS and whether WNB could permissibly rely solely on information provided by BLMIS in fulfilling its obligations under the Internal Revenue Code." [Levinson Dkt 457 at 34-35 fn.10.] Further, the Court granted summary judgment on the Plaintiffs' CUTPA claim on the basis of WNB's violation of IRS regulations. [Levinson Dkt. 457 at 45-48; Davis Dkt. 268 at 34-41.] These rulings do not preclude all testimony concerning the IRS. Accordingly, Plaintiffs' oral motion to play the inadvertently deleted portions of the Clark videotape deposition relating to the bank's obligation to perform due diligence to determine the fair market value of the assets under management by BLMIS for IRS reporting purposes is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/18/13. (Rock, K.)
June 17, 2013 Filing 392 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Trial held on 6/17/2013. Jury Trial Continued Until 6/18/13 at 9:30am, in North Courtroom, 450 Main St. Total Time: 6 hours and 41 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
June 14, 2013 Filing 391 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Trial held on 6/14/2013 Jury Trial Continued Until 6/17/13 at 9:30am, ( Jury Trial set for 6/17/2013 09:30 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant). Total Time: 3 hours and 0 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 389 ORDER: See attached Order on Objections to Proposed Trial Exhibits. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/14/13. (Ives, D)
June 13, 2013 Filing 390 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Jury Selection held on 6/13/2013. Jury Trial set for 6/14/2013 09:30 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant Total Time: 2 hours and 27 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 388 ORDER granting Defendant's #373 Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Designation of a New Damages Expert. The Court's order to not present duplicative expert testimony was not an order to designate new trial experts, but rather for the parties to consider reaching a mutual agreement to identify which of the Plaintiffs' experts would offer testimony on a particular subject matter so as to avoid the introduction of cumulative expert evidence at trial. See the Court's May 20, 2013 Order on Motions in Limine ("It is only where an additional expert addresses a distinct issue that such testimony would not be cumulative."). Two experts presenting differing damages theories for two separate sets of plaintiffs is not cumulative. Thus Mr. Humphryes' May 31, 2013 Supplemental Expert Report is not responsive to the Court's orders to not present cumulative expert testimony and his designation as the Davis Plaintiffs' damages expert in place of Mr. Kreuter is improper, as Humphryes and Kreuter do not appear to offer cumulative damages testimony. Further, the designation of Humphryes as an expert as to the Davis Plaintiffs' damages is untimely as the deadline for the disclosure of experts in Davis was June 21, 2012, and the deadline for the submission of the parties' Joint Trial Memorandum in all three cases consolidated for trial was April 19, 2013. Plaintiffs have presented no good cause for this new designation and have not sought leave of the Court for such designation. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/12/13. (Ives, D)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 387 ORDER granting Defendant's #363 Motion to Strike. Mr. Humphryes' May 31, 2013 Supplemental Expert Report is inadmissible as it is untimely and no good cause has been shown. See Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(e). The ONLY permissible updates to Mr. Humphryes' Expert Report are (1) the exclusion of any losses prior to the day WNB became custodian, and (2) the exclusion of losses attributable to the opt-outs from the Levinson class. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/12/13. (Ives, D)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER striking #370 Defendant's and the Short Plaintiffs' Notice of Supplement to Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum of Fact Stipulations and Exhibits, and sustaining (in part) #378 the Davis and Levinson Plaintiffs' Objection to the Submission of these Stipulations as Defendant's Exhibit 1632. The Court strikes Defendant's proposed Exhibit 1632. These stipulations are not responsive to the Court's suggestion that the parties reach stipulations regarding uncontested facts prior to the commencement of trial, as the Court requested that the parties collectively stipulate to such facts, and as these stipulations were filed in the Short case several years ago. Further, these stipulations are admissions. While it is not permissible beyond the deadline set by the Court for the parties to offer additional exhibits absent leave of the Court and absent good cause, that fact does not preclude the introduction of the substance of these stipulations at trial. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/12/13. (Ives, D)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 385 ORDER striking Plaintiffs' #379 Notice of Update to Exhibit B (Plaintiffs' Exhibit List) of the Joint Trial Memorandum; striking Plaintiffs' #381 Final Update to Exhibit B (Plaintiffs' Exhibit List) of the Joint Trial Memorandum; and striking Defendant's #380 Notice of Filing Updated Exhibit List and Supplement to the Joint Trial Memorandum. In its 121 Scheduling Order, the Court set April 1, 2013 as the deadline for the submission of the parties' Joint Trial Memorandum, subsequently extending this deadline three separate times at the parties' request, and making the ultimate deadline for submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum April 19, 2013. The Court's Joint Trial Memorandum Order required the parties to list and forward to the Court all of their exhibits. Neither Plaintiffs nor Defendant have cited authority for adding additional exhibits to their trial exhibit lists at this late date, nor have they sought leave from the Court to do so. Further, there is no need to amend any exhibit list to reflect the Court's ruling on the motions in limine as the Court has already ruled that those proposed exhibits subject to motions in limine that the Court has granted may not be offered at trial. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/12/13. (Ives, D)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 384 ORDER: Defendant's #359 Objection to Plaintiffs' Proposal Regarding Cumulative Industry Expert Testimony is OVERRULED without prejudice to the Defendant objecting at trial to cumulative evidence while the expert witness is on the stand. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/12/13. (Ives, D)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 383 ORDER granting Defendant's #352 Motion for Reconsideration. Plaintiffs have proposed to offer as evidence the August 2009 SEC Office of the Inspector General report, issued after Madoff's Ponzi scheme had been exposed and critical of prior government examinations and investigations of BLMIS. This 2009 SEC report is admissible in its totality, INCLUDING any exhibits or attachments referenced therein and which Defendant seeks to offer into evidence, for totality and completeness. The admission of the report's attachments, which Defendant seeks to offer, would not be confusing to the jury as references in the August, 2009 report to those attached reports, investigations, and examinations cannot be understood fully in their absence. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/12/13. (Ives, D)
June 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 382 ORDER: Defendant's objections to Plaintiffs' exhibits 104, 106, 111, 121A, 121E, 134A, 135A, 136A, 137A, 138A, 142A, 143A, 144A, 145A, 146A, 147A, 148A, 150A, 151A, 171, and 207 are OVERRULED. Such a letter, which references a "fiduciary to fiduciary transfer," is admissible not for its truth but for the Bank's knowledge that numerous Plaintiffs submitted form letters indicating that the Bank was a fiduciary. Such a letter is admissible to establish the claim of breach of fiduciary duty. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/12/13. (Ives, D)
June 12, 2013 Filing 381 NOTICE by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe NOTICE OF FINAL UPDATE TO EXHIBIT B (PLAINTIFFS EXHIBIT LIST) OF THE JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jo, Daniel)
June 12, 2013 Filing 380 NOTICE by Connecticut Community Bank NA re #309 Notice (Other),, Notice of Filing Updated Exhibit List and Supplement to the Joint Trial Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Revised Exhibit C (Defendant's Exhibit List) to the Joint Trial Memorandum)(Merschman, Joseph)
June 11, 2013 Filing 379 NOTICE by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe NOTICE OF FILING OF UPDATE TO EXHIBIT B (PLAINTIFFS' EXHIBIT LIST) OF THE JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Jo, Daniel)
June 11, 2013 Filing 378 OBJECTION TO CCBS SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED EXHIBIT 1632 filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jo, Daniel)
June 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER denying #354 Motion for Clarification: The Court denies the Davis Plaintiffs' Motion for Clarification [Davis Dkt. 355]. Those of the Davis Plaintiffs' claims that remain for trial were explicitly laid out in the Courts March 26, 2013 decision on summary judgment in the Davis litigation. [Memorandum of Decision Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant's Partial Motion for Summary Judgment and Denying as Moot Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to Defendant's First Counterclaim, Davis Dkt. 268, at 57]. Additionally, the Court's May 20, 2013 Order on Motions in Limine reiterated the claims that remain for trial following summary judgment in all three actions. [Davis Dkt. 345]. Further, Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification is actually an untimely motion for reconsideration of this Courts March 26, 2013 decision on summary judgment in the Davis litigation. District of Connecticut Local Rule 7(c) requires motions for reconsideration to be filed and served within 14 days of the decision or order from which relief is sought. D. Conn. L. Civ. R. 7(c). The Order on summary judgment in the Davis litigation was entered March 26, 2013, 64 days before the Davis Plaintiffs filed their Motion for Clarification on May 29, 2013. Even if the Plaintiff could avoid the time limit imposed by Local Rule 7(c) by stylizing its motion as a Rule 59(e) motion to alter or amend a judgment (a question the Court need not address in this decision), the motion would remain untimely, as such a Rule 59(e) motion must be brought within 28 days. Fed. R. Civ. P. 59(e). Finally, Plaintiff has failed to distinguish the claims in the Motion for Clarification from the recognized claims. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 06/11/13. (Rock, K.)
June 11, 2013 Filing 376 OBJECTION re #364 Response, Plaintiffs' Objection to #364 CCB's Response to 358 Court's May 31, 2013 Order filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel)
June 11, 2013 Filing 375 OBJECTION re #365 Response,, to Plaintiffs' Expert Disclosure filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Sergi, Jessica)
June 10, 2013 Filing 374 RESPONSE re #373 MOTION to Strike #371 Response,, Plaintiffs' Designation of a New Damages Expert filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel)
June 7, 2013 Filing 373 MOTION to Strike #371 Response,, Plaintiffs' Designation of a New Damages Expert by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 6/28/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sergi, Jessica)
June 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 372 ORDER: The parties are ordered to respond to any outstanding motions or notices on the docket by Tuesday, June 11, 2013, including but not limited to (1) Defendant's #339 [Levinson 552] [Short 216] Notice of Update to the Expert Reports of Theodore Martens and Supplement to the Joint Trial Memorandum, and (2) Plaintiffs' #365 [Levinson 571] and Defendant's #364 [Levinson 569] [Short 231] Responses to the Court's order regarding the use of expert reports. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/6/13. (Ives, D)
June 6, 2013 Filing 371 RESPONSE re #363 Objection and Motion Strike #360 Plaintiffs' Notice of Update to Humphryes Report and Supplement to JTM filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Golub, David)
June 6, 2013 Filing 370 NOTICE by Connecticut Community Bank NA re #309 Notice (Other),, of Supplement to Joint Pre-Trial Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sergi, Jessica)
June 6, 2013 Filing 369 RESPONSE re #359 Response PLAINTIFFS' RESPONSE TO #359 DEFENDANT'S OBJECTION TO PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSAL REGARDING INDUSTRY EXPERT TESTIMONY filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
June 6, 2013 Filing 368 RESPONSE re #354 MOTION for Clarification filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Merschman, Joseph)
June 6, 2013 Filing 367 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Held on 5/23/13 (Pretrial Conference) before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Court Reporter: Steve Bowles. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 6/27/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/7/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/4/2013. (Bowles, S.)
June 5, 2013 Filing 366 OBJECTION to PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO #352 CCB'S Motion for Reconsideration of the #345 Court's Decision Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Inspections, Examinations, or Investigations of BLMIS by Regulatory or Law Enforcement Agencies filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Jo, Daniel) Modified on 6/6/2013 to remove text (Grady, B.).
June 5, 2013 Filing 365 RESPONSE re 358 Order,,,, filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 6), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 6), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 6), #4 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 6), #5 Exhibit A (Part 5 of 6), #6 Exhibit A (Part 6 of 6))(Jo, Daniel)
June 5, 2013 Filing 364 RESPONSE re 358 Order,,,, Regarding Expert Report filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, Part 1, #6 Exhibit E, Part 2)(Sergi, Jessica)
June 5, 2013 Filing 363 OBJECTION re #360 Notice (Other),, and Motion to Strike Plaintiffs' Purported Update to the Damages Expert Report of Terry Humphreyes filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Sergi, Jessica)
June 4, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #354 MOTION for Clarification. Responses due by 6/7/2013. see order dkt# 362 . (LaLone, L.)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER: Given the limited amount of time before trial in this matter, the Defendant is ordered to respond by Friday, 6/7/13 to the Davis Plaintiffs' #354 Motion for Clarification regarding the claims extant for trial. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/4/13. (Ives, D)
June 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 361 ORDER: the Court reminds the parties that the Court will not consider any reply or sur-reply advancing arguments that could have been advanced in the motion or opposition/response to such motion. The rules clearly prescribe the limits of replies and sur-replies. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/4/13. (Ives, D)
May 31, 2013 Filing 360 NOTICE by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe NOTICE OF UPDATE TO THE EXPERT REPORT OF TERRY HUMPHRYES AND SUPPLEMENT TO THE JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14)(Jo, Daniel)
May 31, 2013 Filing 359 RESPONSE to Plaintiffs' Proposal Regarding Cumulative Industry Expert Testimony filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sergi, Jessica)
May 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDER: The parties have identified the following expert reports as exhibits in their Joint Trial Memorandum: Donald Moore and Robert Barrett 11-19-10 Expert Rebuttal Report (Short); John Rodgers, III 10-19-12 Substitute Expert Report (Levinson); Steven Henning and Eric Kreuter 6-21-12 Expert Report (Davis); Edward Seifried 10-19-12 Expert Report (Levinson); Edward Seifried 7-29-11 Rebuttal Expert Report (Levinson); Edward Seifried 10-13-10 Expert Report (Short); Edward Seifried 12-14-10 Rebuttal Expert Report (Short), [529-4] Edward Seifried 8-10-12 Rebuttal Expert Report (Davis); Terry Humphryes 7-1-11 Expert Report (Levinson); Theodore Martens 9-1-11 Expert Report (Levinson); Theodore Martens 10-3-11 Supplemental Expert Report (Levinson); and Theodore Martens 8-10-12 Expert Report (Davis). The parties are to notify the Court by Wednesday, June 5 as to which of the above reports the parties will be offering in their case in chief. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/31/13. (Ives, D)
May 30, 2013 Filing 357 RESPONSE re #347 Response,, PLAINTIFFS' REPLY TO DEFENDANT CCB'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO THE COURTS QUESTIONS ABOUT FIDUCIARY-TO-FIDUCIARY TRANSFER LETTER EXHIBITS #347 filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Golub, David)
May 29, 2013 Filing 356 AFFIDAVIT re #354 MOTION for Clarification Signed By Daniel S. Jo filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Jo, Daniel)
May 29, 2013 Filing 355 Memorandum in Support re #354 MOTION for Clarification filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
May 29, 2013 Filing 354 MOTION for Clarification by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
May 29, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER: Given the limited amount of time before trial in this matter, the Plaintiffs are ordered to respond to the Defendant's #352 Motion for Reconsideration re #345 Order on Motion in Limine by Wednesday, June 5, 2013. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/29/13. (Ives, D)
May 29, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #352 MOTION for Reconsideration re #345 Order on Motion in Limine Order on Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Regarding Plaintiffs. Responses due by 6/5/2013. See order dkt# 353 . (LaLone, L.)
May 28, 2013 Filing 352 MOTION for Reconsideration of the Court's Decision Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Inspections, Examinations, or Investigations of BLMIS by Regulatory or Law Enforcement Agencies, re: #345 Order on Motion in Limine by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 6/18/2013 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Merschman, Joseph) Modified on 5/29/2013 to remove text (Grady, B.).
May 28, 2013 Filing 351 RESPONSE re #347 Response,, Opposition to Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to the Court's Questions about "Fiduciary-to-Fiduciary Transfer" Letter Exhibits filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
May 28, 2013 Filing 350 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,, with Affirmative Defenses. Connecticut Community Bank's Answer to Amendment Adding Tenth Claim for Relief to Second Amended Complaint (Pls' Motion for Leave at Dkt. # 283) by Connecticut Community Bank NA.(Merschman, Joseph)
May 24, 2013 Filing 348 RESPONSE re #346 Response,, Defendant's Response to Plaintiffs' Memorandum re: Evidence to Support Plaintiffs' CUTPA Claim filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Merschman, Joseph)
May 24, 2013 Filing 347 RESPONSE TO THE COURTS QUESTIONS ABOUT FIDUCIARY TO FIDUCIARY TRANSFER LETTER EXHIBITS filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Jo, Daniel)
May 23, 2013 Filing 349 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Pretrial Conference held on 5/23/2013. Total Time: 1 hours and 49 minutes(Court Reporter D.Smith(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
May 23, 2013 Filing 346 RESPONSE by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. WolfeMemorandum re Evidence to Support Plaintiffs' CUTPA Claim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Golub, David)
May 20, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #294 Motion in Limine; granting #295 Motion in Limine; granting #296 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #297 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #298 Motion in Limine; granting #299 Motion in Limine; granting #300 Motion in Limine; finding as moot #302 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #304 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #305 Motion in Limine; granting #306 Motion in Limine; granting in part and denying in part #307 Motion in Limine; granting #308 Motion in Limine; granting #329 Motion for Leave to File; granting #330 Motion for Leave to File; granting #331 Motion for Leave to File; granting #332 Motion for Leave to File. SEE ATTACHED ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/20/13. (Ives, D)
May 15, 2013 Filing 344 AFFIDAVIT re #343 Memorandum in Opposition to #327 MOTION to Strike Signed By David S. Golub filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) Modified on 5/17/2013 to link to motion (Grady, B.).
May 15, 2013 Filing 343 Memorandum in Opposition re #327 MOTION to Strike #310 Response,, specifically Revised Expert Report of Steven L. Henning filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
May 13, 2013 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #327 MOTION to Strike #310 Response,, specifically Revised Expert Report of Steven L. Henning. Responses due by 5/15/2013. See order dkt# 342 (LaLone, L.)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER: Plaintiffs are ordered to file by Wednesday, 5/15/13 at 4:30 PM a response to Defendant's #327 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/13/13. (Ives, D)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 341 ORDER: All objections raised in Exhibits D and E to the Joint Trial Memorandum are OVERRULED, as the parties have failed to illuminate where in the record or in the parties' voluminous trial binders the Court may find the deposition transcripts referenced in these Exhibits. The parties have until Wednesday, May 15 at 4:30 PM to file on the docket the whereabouts of the deposition transcripts referenced in these Exhibits. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/13/13. (Ives, D)
May 13, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 340 ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #283 Motion to Amend/Correct the complaint to add a CUTPA claim that is identical to the claim alleged in Levinson et al v. PSCC Svc Inc. et al, 3:09-cv-269 as Rule 15(a)(2) directs that the Court freely give leave to amend the complaint when justice so requires and Rule 15(b) permits amendment during and after trial to conform to the evidence presented at trial. Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(2) and (b)(1). Further, Defendants have not demonstrated prejudice as discovery on this claim occurred in Levinson and the Davis Plaintiffs assert that they are relying on that discovery in support of their identical claim. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/13/13. (Ives, D)
May 9, 2013 Filing 339 NOTICE by Connecticut Community Bank NA re #309 Notice (Other),, Notice of Update to the Expert Reports of Theodore Martens and Supplement to the Joint Trial Memorandum (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 13 to Joint Witness List - Update to the Expert Reports of Theodore Martens)(Merschman, Joseph)
May 9, 2013 Filing 338 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. RESET FROM 6/4/13 - Jury Selection set for 6/13/2013 at 09:30 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant (LaLone, L.)
May 9, 2013 Filing 337 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Pretrial Conference set for 5/23/2013 at 09:30 AM in North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant (LaLone, L.)
May 6, 2013 Filing 336 Memorandum in Support re #283 MOTION to Amend/Correct #175 Amended Complaint,, (with Exhibit A - Proposed Amendment to Complaint) filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
May 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 335 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: In light of the Court's schedule, jury selection has been rescheduled for 6/13/2013 at 9:30 am in the North Courtroom, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Trial will commence on 6/14/2013 at 9:30am in the North Courtroom and conclude at 12:00pm. On 6/17/2013, 6/18/2013, and 6/20/2013, Trial will start at 9:30am and conclude at 4:30pm. On 6/21/2013, Trial will start at 9:30am and conclude at 12:00pm. On 6/24/2013, 6/25/2013, and 6/27/2013, Trial will start at 9:30am and conclude at 4:30pm. On 6/28/2013, Trial will start at 9:30am and conclude at 12:00pm. On 7/8/2013, Trial will start at 9:30am and conclude at 4:30pm. On 7/11/2013, Trial will start at 9:30am and conclude at 4:30pm. On 7/12/2013, Trial will start at 9:30am and conclude at 12:00pm. On 7/15/2013, 7/16/2013, and 7/18/2013, Trial will start at 9:30am and conclude at 4:30pm. On 7/19/2013, Trial will start at 9:30am and conclude at 12:00pm. Due to the Court's schedule, trial will not be held on 6/19/2013, 6/26/2013, 7/1/2013 through 7/5/2013, 7/9/2013, 7/10/2013, and 7/17/2013. The Parties are ordered to be present by 9:00am to address any evidentiary or other housekeeping matters prior to the start of trial. The pretrial conference is scheduled for 5/23/2013 at 9:30am in the North Courtroom. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5/6/2013.(Fernandez, Melissa)
May 3, 2013 Filing 334 Memorandum in Opposition re #299 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Reliance on IRS Forms 5305 and 5498, #294 MOTION in Limine that the Court Admit into Evidence Criminal Informations and Plea Allocution Transcripts of BLMIS Co-Conspirators, #250 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from the Summary Judgment Record and from Trial Improper Opinions Given by Plaintiffs' Proffered Industry Expert, #296 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Cumulative Industry Expert Testimony by Plaintiffs, #300 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Plaintiffs from Offering any Expert Testimony regarding Collective Investment Funds, #297 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence about CCB Transfers to BLMIS, #295 MOTION in Limine to Exclude all Evidence Relating to Plaintiffs Claims in the BLMIS Bankruptcy, #298 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Damages Relating to Investments Made Prior to 7/99 filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 29, 2013 Filing 333 Memorandum in Opposition re #283 MOTION to Amend/Correct #175 Amended Complaint,, (with Exhibit A - Proposed Amendment to Complaint) filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
April 29, 2013 Filing 332 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion in Limine to Admit into Evidence Criminal Informations and Plea Allocution Transcripts of BLMIS Co-Conspirators by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Reply, with attached Declaration of J. Merschman in Support, and Exhibits 1-3)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 29, 2013 Filing 331 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Damages Relating to Investments Made Prior to 7/99 by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Errata 1. Reply)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 29, 2013 Filing 330 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Reliance on IRS Forms 5305 and 5498 by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Reply)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 29, 2013 Filing 329 MOTION for Leave to File Reply in Support of Motion in Limine to Preclude the Plaintiffs from Offering any Expert Testimony regarding Collective Investment Funds by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1. Reply)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 29, 2013 Filing 328 Memorandum in Support re #327 MOTION to Strike #310 Response,, specifically Revised Expert Report of Steven L. Henning filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of J. Merschman, #2 Exhibit 1 to J. Merschman Declaration, #3 Exhibit 2 to J. Merschman Declaration, #4 Exhibit 3 to J. Merschman Declaration)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 29, 2013 Filing 327 MOTION to Strike #310 Response,, specifically Revised Expert Report of Steven L. Henning by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 5/20/2013 (Merschman, Joseph)
April 22, 2013 Filing 326 Memorandum in Opposition re #302 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Opinions From Defendant's Banking Practices Expert, Edward E. Seifried, re: Common Law Standards of Conduct filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 22, 2013 Filing 325 Memorandum in Opposition re #306 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Inspections, Examinations or Investigations of BLMIS by the SEC or Other Regulatory or Law Enforcement Agencies, and Supporting Memo of Law filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 22, 2013 Filing 324 Memorandum in Opposition re #308 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Defendant Westport National Bank's "Community Involvement" and Memo of Law in Support Thereof filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
April 22, 2013 Filing 323 Memorandum in Opposition re #304 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Operation of Custodial Accounts at Westport Bank & Trust and Supporting Memo of Law filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
April 22, 2013 Filing 322 Memorandum in Opposition re #305 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Criminal Cases Involving Bernard Madoff and BLMIS, and Memo of Law in Support Thereof filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
April 22, 2013 Filing 321 Memorandum in Opposition re #307 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding So-Called "Net Winners" in the Liability Phase of Trial and Memo of Law in Support Thereof filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 22, 2013 Filing 320 AFFIDAVIT re #319 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, Signed By Ilze Thielman filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 319 Memorandum in Opposition re #297 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence about CCB Transfers to BLMIS filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 318 AFFIDAVIT re #317 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, Signed By Ilze Thielmann filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 317 Memorandum in Opposition re #299 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Reliance on IRS Forms 5305 and 5498 filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 316 AFFIDAVIT re #315 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, Signed By Ilze Thielmann filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 315 Memorandum in Opposition re #300 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Plaintiffs from Offering any Expert Testimony regarding Collective Investment Funds filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 314 Memorandum in Opposition re #296 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Cumulative Industry Expert Testimony by Plaintiffs filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 313 Memorandum in Opposition re #294 MOTION in Limine that the Court Admit into Evidence Criminal Informations and Plea Allocution Transcripts of BLMIS Co-Conspirators filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 312 Memorandum in Opposition re #298 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Damages Relating to Investments Made Prior to 7/99 filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 311 Memorandum in Opposition re #295 MOTION in Limine to Exclude all Evidence Relating to Plaintiffs Claims in the BLMIS Bankruptcy filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 22, 2013 Filing 310 Supplemental RESPONSE re #250 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from the Summary Judgment Record and from Trial Improper Opinions Given by Plaintiffs' Proffered Industry Expert filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 19, 2013 Filing 309 NOTICE by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe (NOTICE OF FILING JOINT TRIAL MEMORANDUM) (Jo, Daniel)
April 19, 2013 Filing 308 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding Defendant Westport National Bank's "Community Involvement" and Memo of Law in Support Thereof by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Jo, Daniel)
April 19, 2013 Filing 307 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding So-Called "Net Winners" in the Liability Phase of Trial and Memo of Law in Support Thereof by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Jo, Daniel)
April 19, 2013 Filing 306 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Inspections, Examinations or Investigations of BLMIS by the SEC or Other Regulatory or Law Enforcement Agencies, and Supporting Memo of Law by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Jo, Daniel)
April 19, 2013 Filing 305 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Regarding the Criminal Cases Involving Bernard Madoff and BLMIS, and Memo of Law in Support Thereof by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Jo, Daniel)
April 19, 2013 Filing 304 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence Relating to Operation of Custodial Accounts at Westport Bank & Trust and Supporting Memo of Law by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Jo, Daniel)
April 19, 2013 Filing 303 Memorandum in Support re #302 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Opinions From Defendant's Banking Practices Expert, Edward E. Seifried, re: Common Law Standards of Conduct filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Ilze C. Thielmann in Support of Motion in Limine)(Jo, Daniel)
April 19, 2013 Filing 302 MOTION in Limine To Exclude Opinions From Defendant's Banking Practices Expert, Edward E. Seifried, re: Common Law Standards of Conduct by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Jo, Daniel)
April 19, 2013 Filing 301 STIPULATION Regarding Evidence Relating to the Bernard Madoff and BLMIS Bankruptcy Proceedings by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel)
April 19, 2013 Filing 300 MOTION in Limine to Preclude the Plaintiffs from Offering any Expert Testimony regarding Collective Investment Funds by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of J. Merschman, #2 Exhibit A)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 19, 2013 Filing 299 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Plaintiffs Reliance on IRS Forms 5305 and 5498 by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Merschman, Joseph)
April 19, 2013 Filing 298 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Alleged Damages Relating to Investments Made Prior to 7/99 by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Merschman, Joseph)
April 19, 2013 Filing 297 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence about CCB Transfers to BLMIS by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Merschman, Joseph)
April 19, 2013 Filing 296 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Cumulative Industry Expert Testimony by Plaintiffs by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Merschman, Joseph)
April 19, 2013 Filing 295 MOTION in Limine to Exclude all Evidence Relating to Plaintiffs Claims in the BLMIS Bankruptcy by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Merschman, Joseph)
April 19, 2013 Filing 294 MOTION in Limine that the Court Admit into Evidence Criminal Informations and Plea Allocution Transcripts of BLMIS Co-Conspirators by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 5/10/2013 (Merschman, Joseph)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #288 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica C. Sergi to be admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 04/17/2013. (Grady, B.)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting #287 MOTION for Attorney Joseph P. Curtin to be admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Clerk on 04/17/2013. (Grady, B.)
April 17, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 291 ORDER granting #286 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tracy A. Miner to be admitted pro hac vice. Attorney Tracy A. Miner for Connecticut Community Bank NA added. Signed by Clerk on 04/17/2013. (Grady, B.)
April 15, 2013 Filing 290 STIPULATION regarding Trial Exhibits and Testimony by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe, Loretta D. Weinberg, All Plaintiffs. (Golub, David) Modified on 4/17/2013 (Grady, B.).
April 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 289 ORDER: The Court grants the Parties' request for extension of time to file the joint trial memorandum, jury instructions, voir dire, and motions in limine until April 19, 2013 as conveyed to the Court by PJO Hawkins. No further extensions of time will be granted. The Parties are also ordered to file objections to the motions in limine by April 22, 2013. The Parties are further directed to send the original copy of the joint trial memorandum and exhibits to the Clerk's office to the attention of Loraine LaLone on April 19, 2013 and two courtesy copies of the joint trial memorandum and exhibits should be sent to Chambers. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/15/2013.(Fernandez, Melissa)
April 12, 2013 Filing 288 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica C. Sergi to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Jessica C. Sergi, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 12, 2013 Filing 287 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph P. Curtin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph P. Curtin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 12, 2013 Filing 286 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tracy A. Miner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tracy A. Miner, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 9, 2013 Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons no longer assigned to case. (Jaiman, R.)
April 8, 2013 Filing 284 Memorandum in Support re #283 MOTION to Amend/Correct #175 Amended Complaint,, (with Exhibit A - Proposed Amendment to Complaint) filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 8, 2013 Filing 283 MOTION to Amend/Correct #175 Amended Complaint,, (with Exhibit A - Proposed Amendment to Complaint) by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 4/29/2013 (Golub, David)
April 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 282 ORDER denying #278 , #279 , #280 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to refiling in compliance with Local Rule 83.1(d). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/8/13. (LaLone, L.)
April 4, 2013 Filing 285 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/4/2013. 15 minutes (Jaiman, R.)
April 4, 2013 Set Deadlines: Trial Brief due by 4/15/2013 (LaLone, L.)
April 4, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER granting #277 Motion for Extension of Time until April 15, 2013 for the parties to file their Joint Trial Memorandum. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/4/13. (Ives, D)
April 3, 2013 Filing 280 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica C. Sergi to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jessica Sergi, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 3, 2013 Filing 279 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph P. Curtin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Joseph Curtin, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 3, 2013 Filing 278 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tracy A. Miner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Tracy Miner, #2 Certificate of Good Standing)(Merschman, Joseph)
April 3, 2013 Filing 277 MOTION for Extension of Time until Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Joint Trial Memorandum Joint Trial Memoradum by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 276 ORDER denying #270 , #271 , #272 Motions for Admission Pro Hac Vice without prejudice to refiling in compliance with Local Rule 83.1(d). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/2/13. (LaLone, L.)
April 1, 2013 Filing 275 REPLY to Response to #250 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from the Summary Judgment Record and from Trial Improper Opinions Given by Plaintiffs' Proffered Industry Expert filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
March 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 274 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons for Status Conference Signed by Clerk on 3/28/2013.(Malone, P.)
March 28, 2013 Filing 273 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.Pursuant to an up coming referral order the parties are hereby directed to initiate a conference call. Telephone Status Conference set for 4/4/2013 11:45 AM before Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate this call. Once all parties are on the line, please contact Chambers at (203)579-5640. (Blough, B.)
March 28, 2013 Filing 272 MOTION for Attorney(s) Jessica C. Sergi to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2825227) by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Jessica C. Sergi)(Merschman, Joseph)
March 28, 2013 Filing 271 MOTION for Attorney(s) Joseph P. Curtin to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2825218) by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Joseph P. Curtin)(Merschman, Joseph)
March 28, 2013 Filing 270 MOTION for Attorney(s) Tracy A. Miner to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $75 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2825189) by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Tracy A. Miner)(Merschman, Joseph)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 269 ORDER denying #229 Motion to Strike as moot as the Court neither relies on either set of documents that are the subject of the motion to strike in its determination that summary judgment is warranted on the claim at issue. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/26/2013. (Fernandez, Melissa)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 268 ORDER denying #178 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying #181 Motion for Summary Judgment as moot; granting in part and denying in part #185 Motion for Summary Judgment. See attached memorandum of decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/26/2013. (Fernandez, Melissa)
March 26, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 267 ORDER granting #243 Motion to Seal; granting #248 Motion to Seal; granting #257 Motion to Seal; granting #190 Motion to Seal; granting #205 Motion to Seal; granting #212 Motion to Seal; granting #214 Motion to Seal; granting #231 Motion to Seal; granting #233 Motion to Seal for the limited purpose of the Court's review on the motions for summary judgment and the motion to strike. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/26/2013. (Fernandez, Melissa)
March 22, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 266 ORDER granting #265 Motion for Extension of Time ; granting #265 Motion to Continue. The Court grants the parties' request to extend the deadline for the Joint Trial Memorandum, motions in limine, jury instructions and voir dire until 4/8/2013. In addition, the Court reschedules the conference with PJO Hawkins for April 1, 2013 at 10:00 AM in Hartford Annex Room A146, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/22/2013. (Fernandez, Melissa)
March 22, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Trial Brief due by 4/8/2013; Conference set for 4/1/2013 at 10:00 AM in Hartford Annex Room A146, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before PJO Hawkins. See order dkt# 266 (LaLone, L.)
March 21, 2013 Filing 265 MOTION to adjourn conference with Parajudicial Officer Hawkins and to extend deadline to 04/08/2013 for filing the Joint Trial Memorandum by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David). Added MOTION to Continue on 3/22/2013 (Grady, B.).
March 20, 2013 Filing 264 Sealed Document: Exhibit E and Exhibit F by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe to #259 Memorandum in opposition to #250 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from the Summary Judgment Record and from Trial Improper Opinions Given by Plaintiffs' Proffered Industry Expert. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit F, #2 Certificate of Service)(Grady, B.)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 263 ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Exhibits returned to Attorney David S. Golub. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 03/19/2013.(Grady, B.)
March 19, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER: The Court has appointed James R. Hawkins, II as a ParaJudicial Officer in this matter to meet with the parties to discuss the Joint Trial Memorandum, motions in limine, jury instructions and voir dire as well as appointment of lead counsel. The parties are directed to meet with PJO Hawkins on March 26, 2013 at 10:00am in Room A146, First Floor, 450 Main Street, Hartford, CT. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/19/2013.(Fernandez, Melissa)
March 19, 2013 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Conference set for 3/26/2013 at 10:00 AM in Hartford Annex Room A146, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before James R. Hawkins, II -PJO. See order dkt# 262 . (LaLone, L.)
March 18, 2013 Filing 261 AFFIDAVIT re #260 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E and F of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Steven L. Henning Signed By Daniel S. Jo filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel)
March 18, 2013 Filing 260 MOTION to Seal Exhibits E and F of Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Steven L. Henning by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
March 18, 2013 Filing 259 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion in Limine to Exclude Certain Opinions of Dr. Steven L. Henning re #250 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from the Summary Judgment Record and from Trial Improper Opinions Given by Plaintiffs' Proffered Industry Expert filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
March 13, 2013 Filing 258 Sealed Document: Surreply Memoroandum in Oppositon by Connecticut Community Bank NA, re: #229 MOTION to Strike. (Grady, B.)
March 12, 2013 Filing 257 MOTION to Seal #255 - CCB's Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' #229 Motion to Strike by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Joseph C. Merschman in Support of CCB's Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Freiman, Jonathan)
March 12, 2013 Filing 256 AFFIDAVIT re #255 Reply to Response to Motion (Supplemental Declaration in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike) Signed By Joseph C. Merschman filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Merschman, Joseph)
March 12, 2013 Filing 255 REPLY to Response to #229 MOTION to Strike (CCB Surreply Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike) filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
March 11, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 254 ORDER granting #253 Motion to Modify the Protective Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3/11/2013. (Fernandez, Melissa)
March 8, 2013 Filing 253 Joint MOTION for Modify Protective Order Order by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe, Loretta D. Weinberg, Peggy Kohn, Walter R. Johnson (Golub, David) Modified on 3/11/2013 to add filers (Grady, B.).
February 27, 2013 Filing 252 Sealed Document: Reply Memorandum in Support of by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe, re: #229 MOTION to Strike. (Grady, B.)
February 26, 2013 Filing 251 Memorandum in Support re #250 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from the Summary Judgment Record and from Trial Improper Opinions Given by Plaintiffs' Proffered Industry Expert filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
February 26, 2013 Filing 250 MOTION in Limine to Exclude from the Summary Judgment Record and from Trial Improper Opinions Given by Plaintiffs' Proffered Industry Expert by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 3/19/2013 (Merschman, Joseph)
February 26, 2013 Filing 249 AFFIDAVIT re #248 MOTION to Seal Pl's Reply Memorandum in support of Pl's Motion to Strike Signed By David S. Golub filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2013: #1 OCR REPLACEMENT) (Grady, B.).
February 26, 2013 Filing 248 MOTION to Seal Pl's Reply Memorandum in support of Pl's Motion to Strike by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2013: #1 OCR REPLACEMENT) (Grady, B.).
February 26, 2013 Filing 247 Memorandum in Support re #243 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Strike, #229 MOTION to Strike filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2013: #1 OCR REPLACEMENT) (Grady, B.).
February 22, 2013 Filing 246 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Follow-up Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 2/22/2013. Counsel are instructed by the court to individually send to chambers an updated ex parte brief by Friday, March 1, 2013. 30 minutes (Sanders, C.)
February 20, 2013 Filing 245 Sealed Document: Memorandum in opposition by Connecticut Community Bank NA re #229 MOTION to Strike. (Grady, B.)
February 15, 2013 Filing 244 Memorandum in Opposition re #229 MOTION to Strike filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
February 15, 2013 Filing 243 MOTION to Seal Portions of Memorandum in Opposition to #229 Motion to Strike by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph C. Merschman in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Freiman, Jonathan)
February 8, 2013 Filing 242 Supplemental Memorandum in Opposition re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
February 5, 2013 Filing 241 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.Follow-up Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference is set for 2/22/2013 @ 10:00 AM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Attorney David Golub is requested to initiate this phone call. Once all parties are on the line, contact chambers at 203-579-5593. (Sanders, C.)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 240 ORDER denying Plaintiffs' #225 Motion for Leave to file an additional motion for summary judgment. "Whether to permit a party to make such a motion generally rests within a court's discretion." Ramos v. SimplexGrinnell LP, No. 7-cv-981(SMG), 2011 WL 4710814, at *2 (E.D.N.Y. Oct. 4, 2011) (citing 11 Moore's Federal Practice 56.121 #1 [b]). "[C]ourts typically judge whether to grant leave to file a supplemental motion based on criteria similar to those governing motions for reconsideration. Those include whether there has been a change in the law, or whether new evidence has come to light that was not previously available In making this decision, we consider the strong interests of judicial efficiency, finality, and scarce judicial resources discussed by the courts in setting the standards for motions for reconsideration, as well as any prejudice to the plaintiff in having to respond to an additional motion and having his case further delayed." Jackson v. Goord, 664 F.Supp.2d 307, 314 (S.D.N.Y. 2009). The Court notes that the deposition testimony of Roberta Murphy which Plaintiffs point to is not new evidence that has only now come to light. First, the deposition testimony was produced in an entirely different matter in State court. Plaintiffs conducted discovery in this case and have cited no reason why it could not or did not and thus have failed to established good cause as to why it did not elicit this evidence in the instant action. Second, that deposition occurred on October 19, 2012 which was three weeks prior to the dispositive motion deadline which had been extended to November 8, 2012 in this case. Moreover, Plaintiffs have waited almost three months after that deposition occurred and after several motions for summary judgment had been filed and almost fully briefed to raise this issue now. Permitting leave to file an additional summary judgment motion at this late juncture of the litigation where trial is scheduled for June would be certainly be judicially inefficient, cause prejudice to the Defendant and result in the case being further delayed. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/31/2013. (Fernandez, Melissa)
January 31, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for settlement conference. In view of the approaching trial date, the Court refers the parties in Levinson et al v. PSCC Svc Inc et al, 3:09-cv-269, Short et al v. Connecticut Community Bank NA, 3:09-cv-1955, and Davis et al v. Connecticut Community Bank, 3:10-cv-261 to a global settlement conference before Magistrate Judge Garfinkel. Considering the overlapping claims and identical facts at issue in all three cases, the Court intends to consolidate the cases for trial purposes and try all three matters together. In view of this, the Court would like the parties to also discuss trial management with Magistrate Judge Garfinkel at the settlement conference, including grouping Plaintiffs with similar damage claims. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/31/2013.(Fernandez, Melissa)
January 28, 2013 Filing 238 Sealed Document: Reply in support #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Grady, B.)
January 28, 2013 Filing 237 Sealed Document: Reply memoraandum in support of #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief by All Plaintiffs. (Grady, B.)
January 28, 2013 Filing 236 Sealed Document: Memorandum in support of #229 MOTION to Strike by All Plaintiffs. (Grady, B.)
January 25, 2013 Filing 235 Supplemental AFFIDAVIT re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment Supplemental Declaration in Support of CCB's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed By Jenny Chou filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 28, #2 Exhibit Ex. 29, #3 Exhibit Ex. 30, #4 Exhibit Ex. 31, #5 Exhibit Ex. 32, #6 Exhibit Ex. 33)(Chou, Jenny)
January 25, 2013 Filing 234 REPLY to Response to #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
January 25, 2013 Filing 233 MOTION to Seal CCB's Reply Brief in Support of its Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jenny Chou in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed] Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Chou, Jenny)
January 25, 2013 Filing 232 AFFIDAVIT re #231 MOTION to Seal Documents # 227 and #230 Signed By David S. Golub filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 231 MOTION to Seal Documents # 227 and #230 by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 230 Memorandum in Support re #229 MOTION to Strike filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 229 MOTION to Strike #200 memorandum in opposition to #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 2/15/2013 (Golub, David) Modified on 2/21/2013 to link to opposition (Grady, B.). Modified on 2/21/2013 to create association (Grady, B.).
January 25, 2013 Filing 228 REPLY to Response to #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim filed by Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg. (Golub, David)
January 25, 2013 Filing 227 Memorandum in Support re #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief and Def's Eighth Affirmative Defense filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Giuseppe C Basili, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
January 24, 2013 Filing 226 AFFIDAVIT re #225 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed By David S. Golub filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Golub, David)
January 24, 2013 Filing 225 MOTION for Leave to File Supplemental Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Golub, David)
January 23, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 224 ORDER granting #223 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/23/2013. (Fernandez, Melissa)
January 22, 2013 Filing 223 Joint MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
January 15, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER granting #221 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/15/2013. (Fernandez, Melissa)
January 14, 2013 Filing 221 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages [Motion for Permission to File Overlength Brief] by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
January 11, 2013 Filing 220 Sealed Document: Exhibit 24 by All Plaintiffs, re: #206 Affidavit. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 37)(Grady, B.) Modified on 1/14/2013 to link to the correct document (Grady, B.).
January 11, 2013 Filing 219 Sealed Document: Memorandum in opposition by All Plaintiffs, re: #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule Rule 56(a) 2 Statement)(Grady, B.) Modified on 1/14/2013 to link to the correct motion (Grady, B.).
January 9, 2013 Filing 215 AFFIDAVIT in Support of #214 Pls' Supplemental Motion to Seal Signed By Daniel S. Jo filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel) Modified on 1/28/2013 to link to document (Grady, B.).
January 9, 2013 Filing 214 Supplemental MOTION to Seal Exhibit 21 [Doc. # 202-13] and Exhibit 52 [Doc. # 202-24] to Declaration of Daniel S. Jo in Opp. to CCB's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment [Doc. # 202] by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel)
January 8, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER Returning Submission as Deficient: Motion to seal and opposition documents returned to David S. Golub. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 01/08/2013. (Grady, B.)
January 7, 2013 Filing 218 Sealed Document: Exhibits B and C by Connecticut Community Bank NA, re: #211 Affidavit in opposition to #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit C)(Grady, B.)
January 7, 2013 Filing 217 Sealed Document: Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement by Connecticut Community Bank NA, re: #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief. (Grady, B.)
January 7, 2013 Filing 216 Sealed Document: Opposition by Connecticut Community Bank NA, re: #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief. Attachments: #1 Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement)(Grady, B.)
January 4, 2013 Filing 212 MOTION to Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement, Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment on CCB's Counterclaim, Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion for Summary Judgment as to CCB's Counterclaim, and Exhibits B and C by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Joseph C. Merschman in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Freiman, Jonathan)
January 4, 2013 Filing 211 AFFIDAVIT re #209 Memorandum in Opposition to #181 Motion for Summary Judgment, #207 Memorandum in Opposition to #178 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed By Joseph C. Merschman filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 14, #2 Exhibit 15, #3 Exhibit 16, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 19, #7 Exhibit 20, #8 Exhibit 21, #9 Exhibit 22, #10 Exhibit 23, #11 Exhibit 24, #12 Exhibit 25, #13 Exhibit 26, #14 Exhibit 27, #15 Exhibit B, #16 Exhibit C)(Freiman, Jonathan) Modified on 1/9/2013 to link to motion (Grady, B.). Modified on 1/9/2013 to create association (Grady, B.).
January 4, 2013 Filing 210 Statement of Material Facts re #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
January 4, 2013 Filing 209 Memorandum in Opposition re #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
January 4, 2013 Filing 208 Statement of Material Facts re #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
January 4, 2013 Filing 207 Memorandum in Opposition re #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
January 4, 2013 Filing 206 AFFIDAVIT in support of pls' #205 Motion to Seal Signed By Daniel S. Jo filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) Modified on 1/7/2013 to link to motion (Grady, B.). Modified on 1/7/2013 to create association (Grady, B.).
January 4, 2013 Filing 205 MOTION to Seal papers in opposition to CCB's Motion for Summary Judgment by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
January 4, 2013 Filing 204 AFFIDAVIT re: {185} Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed By Steven L. Henning filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Golub, David) Modified on 1/7/2013 to link to motion (Grady, B.). Modified on 1/7/2013 to create association (Grady, B.).
January 4, 2013 Filing 203 AFFIDAVIT, re: (185) Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed By David S. Golub filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Errata G)(Golub, David) Modified on 1/7/2013 to link to motion (Grady, B.). Modified on 1/7/2013 to create association (Grady, B.).
January 4, 2013 Filing 202 AFFIDAVIT in support of Pl's Opposition to CCB's #185 Summary Judgment Motion Signed By Daniel S. Jo filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 (1 of 2), #4 Exhibit 3 (2 of 2), #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5 -6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8 -13, #9 Exhibit 14, #10 Exhibit 15 (1 of 2), #11 Exhibit 15 (2 of 2), #12 Exhibit 16 - 19, #13 Exhibit 20 - 23, #14 Exhibit 24 - SEALED, #15 Exhibit 25, #16 Exhibit 26- 30, #17 Exhibit 31 - 33, #18 Exhibit 34, #19 Exhibit 35 -36, #20 Exhibit 37 - SEALED, #21 Exhibit 38 - 41, #22 Exhibit 42 - 45A, #23 Errata 46 - 50, #24 Exhibit 51 - 52)(Golub, David) Modified on 1/7/2013 to link to motion (Grady, B.). Modified on 1/7/2013 to create association (Grady, B.).
January 4, 2013 Filing 201 Statement of Material Facts re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment Pls' Local Rule 56 (a) 2 Statement filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
January 4, 2013 Filing 200 Memorandum in Opposition re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
January 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER granting #197 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 1/2/13. (Ives, D)
January 2, 2013 Filing 198 RESPONSE re #197 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
December 31, 2012 Filing 197 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
December 13, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief, #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim. See order dkt.# 196 . Responses due by 1/4/2013 (LaLone, L.)
December 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 Motion for Extension of Time to file opposition briefs until January 4, 2013. Reply briefs will be due January 25, 2013. No further extensions of time will be granted for any party. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 12/13/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
December 12, 2012 Filing 195 MOTION for Extension of Time until Jan 4, 2012 briefs in response to cross motions for summary judgment #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim, #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) Modified on 12/14/2012 to change event (Grady, B.).
November 20, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief, #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim. Responses due by 12/14/2012 (LaLone, L.)
November 20, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting #193 Motion for Extension of Time until December 14, 2012 to serve summary judgment opposition briefs. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/20/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
November 19, 2012 Filing 193 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until December 14, 2012 to serve summary judgment opposition briefs #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim, #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment, #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief by Connecticut Community Bank NA., All Plaintiffs (Freiman, Jonathan) Modified on 11/21/2012 to add filers (Grady, B.).
November 16, 2012 Filing 192 ANSWER to #175 Amended Complaint,, with Affirmative Defenses., COUNTERCLAIM against Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg by Connecticut Community Bank NA.(Merschman, Joseph)
November 9, 2012 Filing 191 Sealed Document: Memorandum in support by Connecticut Community Bank NA, re: #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment. (Attachments: #1 Local Rule 56(a)(1) Statement, #2 Affidavit of Robert A. Murphy, #3 Exhibit A)(Grady, B.)
November 8, 2012 Filing 190 MOTION to Seal (1) CCB's Mem. of Law; (2) CCB's Local Rule 56(a)(1) Statement; (3) Affidavit of Roberta Murphy; (4) Exhibit A to Declation of Jenny Chou by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Jenny Chou in Support of Motion to Seal, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law)(Freiman, Jonathan)
November 8, 2012 Filing 189 AFFIDAVIT Declaration re: #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed By Jenny Chou, filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit Sealed Ex. A)(Freiman, Jonathan) Modified on 12/7/2012 to link to motion (Grady, B.).
November 8, 2012 Filing 188 AFFIDAVIT re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment Signed By Roberta Murphy filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
November 8, 2012 Filing 187 Statement of Material Facts re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
November 8, 2012 Filing 186 Memorandum in Support re #185 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
November 8, 2012 Filing 185 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 11/29/2012 (Freiman, Jonathan)
November 8, 2012 Filing 184 AFFIDAVIT re #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim, #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief Signed By Jonathan M. Levine, Esq. filed by Richard Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R (1 of 2), #19 Exhibit R (2 of 2), #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W)(Golub, David)
November 8, 2012 Filing 183 Statement of Material Facts re #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim filed by Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg. (Golub, David)
November 8, 2012 Filing 182 Memorandum in Support re #181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim filed by Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg. (Golub, David)
November 8, 2012 Filing 181 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Counterclaim by Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg.Responses due by 11/29/2012 (Golub, David)
November 8, 2012 Filing 180 Statement of Material Facts re #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief filed by Richard Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
November 8, 2012 Filing 179 Memorandum in Support re #178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief filed by Richard Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
November 8, 2012 Filing 178 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief by Richard Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 11/29/2012 (Golub, David)
November 6, 2012 Filing 177 Docket Entry Correction: Document #175 Amended Complaint has been modified to replace the pdf. (Grady, B.)
November 2, 2012 Filing 176 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Follow-up Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference held on 11/2/2012. Counsel are instructed by the court to individually send to chambers an ex parte brief by Friday, November 9, 2012. 30 minutes (Sanders, C.)
November 2, 2012 Filing 175 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Connecticut Community Bank NA, filed by Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Paula S. Katz, David L. Davis, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Richard Abramowitz, Daniel L. Davis, Robin S. Abramowitz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Samuel D. Davis, Arnold Kohn, Frank S. Katz, Melissa Doron, Sol Davis, Marsha H. Rausher, Rita S. Katz, Traci D. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Mitchell J. Rausher, Christina M. Davis, Howard L. Pomerantz, Theresa A. Wolfe, Jing W. Davis.(Golub, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/6/2012: #1 REPLACEMENT PDF) (Grady, B.).
November 2, 2012 Filing 174 NOTICE by All Plaintiffs (Golub, David)
November 2, 2012 Filing 173 STIPULATION re #56 Amended Complaint,, by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
November 2, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER granting #171 Motion for Extension of Time until November 8, 2012. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 11/2/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
November 2, 2012 Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2012 (LaLone, L.)
November 1, 2012 Filing 171 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until November 8, 2012 to File Dispositive Motions by Connecticut Community Bank NA, All Plaintiffs. (Merschman, Joseph) Modified on 11/2/2012 to add all plaintiffs (Grady, B.).
October 25, 2012 Filing 170 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephone Pre-Settlement Conference set for 11/2/2012 @ 2:00 PM before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Plaintiffs' Attorney is requested to initiate this phone call. Once all parties are on the line, contact chambers at 203-579-5593. (Sanders, C.)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER denying #123 Motion to Seal as moot; denying #138 Motion to Strike as moot ; denying #143 Motion to Seal as moot; denying #154 Motion to Seal as moot; denying #157 Motion to Strike as moot ; denying #159 Motion to Seal as moot in light of the Court's 168 Order denying Plaintiff Mitchell J. Rausher's motion for partial summary judgment without prejudice to renewing. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/24/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
October 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 168 ORDER denying #113 Plaintiff Mitchell J. Rausher's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment without prejudice to renewing citing authority for the ability of each individual Plaintiff to file separate pleadings and motions in the absence of severance. If each Plaintiff can and intends to move separately, the Plaintiff must also show cause why this action should not be severed. Fed.R.Civ.P. 21 permits a court to "sever any claim against a party." Fed.R.Civ.P. 21. "The decision whether to grant a severance motion is committed to the sound discretion of the trial court." State of N.Y. v. Hendrickson Bros., Inc., 840 F.2d 1065, 1082 (2d Cir.1988); accord Wausau Bus. Inc. Co. v. Turner Constr. Co., 204 F.R.D. 248, 250 (S.D.N.Y.2001). "Courts may order a Rule 21 severance when it will serve the ends of justice and further the prompt and efficient disposition of litigation." Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/24/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER denying #116 partial Motion for Summary Judgment on second counterclaim in light of the Court's 166 Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/23/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
October 23, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER granting #129 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss second counterclaim; granting #130 Motion to Amend/Correct eighth affirmative defense in light of the Plaintiff's consent. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/23/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
October 19, 2012 Set Deadlines: Dispositive Motions due by 11/1/2012 (LaLone, L.)
October 19, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER granting #164 Motion for Extension of Time until November 1, 2012 for Parties to File Dispositive Motions. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 10/19/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
October 5, 2012 Filing 164 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until November 1, 2012 for Parties to File Dispositive Motions by Connecticut Community Bank NA, All Plaintiffs (Freiman, Jonathan) Modified on 10/25/2012 to add filer - all plaintiffs (Grady, B.).
September 14, 2012 Filing 163 Memorandum in Opposition re #157 MOTION to Strike #152 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #153 Response filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Corrigan, Scott)
September 14, 2012 Filing 162 Sealed Document: Reply momorandum in support by Mitchell J. Rausher, re: #157 MOTION to Strike.(Grady, B.)
September 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER returning submission as deficient: reply memorandum returned to David S. Golub. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 09/11/2012. (Grady, B.)
September 10, 2012 Filing 160 REPLY to Response to #159 MOTION Mot to Seal, #138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #157 MOTION to Strike #152 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #153 Response filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David)
September 10, 2012 Filing 159 MOTION to Seal by Mitchell J. Rausher.Responses due by 10/1/2012 (Attachments: #1 Affidavit David S. Golub)(Golub, David) Modified on 10/2/2012 to change event (Grady, B.).
September 4, 2012 Filing 158 Memorandum in Support re #157 MOTION to Strike #152 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #153 Response filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David)
September 4, 2012 Filing 157 MOTION to Strike #152 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #153 Response by Mitchell J. Rausher.Responses due by 9/25/2012 (Golub, David)
August 29, 2012 Filing 156 Sealed Document: Unredact Opposition to #138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Connecticut Community Bank NA (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C)(Grady, B.) Modified on 8/30/2012 to add text (Grady, B.).
August 29, 2012 Filing 155 Sealed Document: Unredacted Sur-reply in Opposition by Connecticut Community Bank NA, re: #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief. (Grady, B.) Modified on 8/30/2012 to add text (Grady, B.).
August 27, 2012 Filing 154 MOTION to Seal CCBs Sur-Reply in Opp. Pl's Mot. for Partial Summ. J., CCBs Opp. to Pls Mot. to Strike, Ex. A to the Aff. of Roberta Murphy, Exhibit C to the Aff. of Jenny Chou by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Jenny Chou)(Corrigan, Scott)
August 27, 2012 Filing 153 RESPONSE to #141 Response (Plaintiff's Schedule A), re: #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Corrigan, Scott) Modified on 8/29/2012 to link to motion (Grady, B.).
August 27, 2012 Filing 152 Memorandum in Opposition Sur-Reply in Opposition re #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Corrigan, Scott)
August 27, 2012 Filing 151 Memorandum in Opposition re #138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Robert Murphy, #2 Exhibit A to Murphy Aff., #3 Affidavit of Joseph Mercshman, #4 Exhibit A to Merschman Aff., #5 Exhibit B to Merschman Aff., #6 Exhibit C to Merschman Aff., #7 Exhibit D to Merschman Aff., #8 Affidavit of Jenny Chou, #9 Exhibit A to Chou Aff., #10 Exhibit B to Chou Aff., #11 Exhibit C to Chou Aff., #12 Exhibit D to Chou Aff.)(Corrigan, Scott)
August 22, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion. Responses due by 8/27/2012 (LaLone, L.)
August 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER granting #147 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #138 MOTION to Strike until August 27, 2012 only. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 8/22/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
August 10, 2012 Filing 149 REPLY to Response to #147 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion until August 27, 2012 filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph C. Merschman, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joseph C. Merschman)(Freiman, Jonathan)
August 9, 2012 Filing 148 RESPONSE re #147 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion until August 27, 2012 filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David)
August 9, 2012 Filing 147 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion until August 27, 2012 by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
July 26, 2012 Filing 146 Sealed Document: Memorandum of Law in Support of by Mitchell J. Rausher, re: #138 MOTION to Strike (Grady, B.)
July 26, 2012 Filing 145 Sealed Document: Reply Memorandum in Support by Mitchell J. Rausher, re: #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief. (Attachments: #1 Improper Responses in its Local Rule 56(a)(2) Statement)(Grady, B.)
July 23, 2012 Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT re #139 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion, #140 Reply to Response to Motion, #141 Response Signed By David S. Golub filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David)
July 23, 2012 Filing 143 MOTION to Seal Portions of Reply Brief in support of Mitchell Rausher's Partial Mot for Summary Judgment, Mot to Strike and Schedule A. by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David)
July 23, 2012 Filing 142 AFFIDAVIT re #140 Reply to Response to #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Signed By Daniel Jo filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David) Modified on 7/25/2012 to link to motion (Grady, B.). Modified on 7/25/2012 to create association (Grady, B.).
July 23, 2012 Filing 141 RESPONSE re #140 Reply to Response to #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David) Modified on 7/25/2012 to link to motion (Grady, B.). Modified on 7/25/2012 to create association (Grady, B.).
July 23, 2012 Filing 140 REPLY to Response to #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David)
July 23, 2012 Filing 139 Memorandum in Support re #138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David)
July 23, 2012 Filing 138 MOTION to Strike #124 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Mitchell J. Rausher.Responses due by 8/13/2012 (Golub, David)
July 16, 2012 Filing 137 NOTICE by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Theresa A. Wolfe re #123 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1-27 [Confidential Documents], #128 Objection,, #136 Response (Golub, David)
July 10, 2012 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief. Responses due by 7/23/2012 (LaLone, L.)
July 10, 2012 Filing 136 RESPONSE re #128 Objection,, to Motion to Seal Exhibits filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
July 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #134 Consent Motion for Extension of Time until 7/23/12 to file and serve Reply Brief in support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 7/10/12. (Hildebrand, J.)
July 9, 2012 Filing 134 MOTION for Extension of Time until July 23, 2012 for service and filing of Reply Brief in Further Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment as to First Claim for Relief #113 by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David) Modified on 7/11/2012 to change event (Grady, B.).
July 3, 2012 Filing 133 REPLY to Response to #129 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily CCB's Second Counterclaim, Pursuant to Rule 41(a) filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
June 29, 2012 Filing 132 OBJECTION re #129 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily CCB's Second Counterclaim filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
June 27, 2012 Filing 130 Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct #63 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 7/18/2012 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer, Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaims to the Amended Complaint)(Freiman, Jonathan)
June 27, 2012 Filing 129 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntarily CCB's Second Counterclaim, Pursuant to Rule 41(a) by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 7/18/2012 (Freiman, Jonathan)
June 26, 2012 Filing 128 OBJECTION re #123 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1-27 [Confidential Documents] filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
June 25, 2012 Filing 131 Sealed Document: Connecticut Community Bank, NA's Unredacted version of Memorandum of Law in Opposition to #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief, Unredacted Version of Affidavit of Roberta Murphy, Unredacted version of Statement of Facts, Unredacted version of Exhibits 1-27 by Connecticut Community Bank NA re #123 MOTION to Seal [Confidential Documents], (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts, #2 Affidavit of Roberta Murphy, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15, #18 Exhibit 16, #19 Exhibit 17, #20 Exhibit 18, #21 Exhibit 19, #22 Exhibit 20, #23 Exhibit 21, #24 Exhibit 22, #25 Exhibit 23, #26 Exhibit 24, #27 Exhibit 25, #28 Exhibit 26, #29 Exhibit 27)(Kelsey, N.)
June 25, 2012 Filing 127 AFFIDAVIT re #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief Signed By Jenny R. Chou filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit [Exhibits 1 - 27, Filed Under Seal])(Freiman, Jonathan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 126 AFFIDAVIT re #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief Signed By Roberta Murphy filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 125 STATEMENT of Material Facts Local Rule 56(a)2 by Connecticut Community Bank NA re #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief (Freiman, Jonathan) Modified on 6/26/2012 to edit text. (Blue, A.).
June 25, 2012 Filing 124 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff Mitchell J. Rausher's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment re #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
June 25, 2012 Filing 123 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1-27 [Confidential Documents] by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit [Declaration of Jenny R. Chou], #2 Text of Proposed Order [Proposed Findings of Fact & Conclusions of Law])(Freiman, Jonathan)
June 19, 2012 Filing 122 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings: Held on 4/20/12 (Telephonic Conference) before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Court Reporter: Steve Bowles. IMPORTANT NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: To remove personal identifier information from the transcript, a party must electronically file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction with the Clerk's Office within seven (7) calendar days of this date. If no such Notice is filed, the court will assume redaction of personal identifiers is not necessary and the transcript will be made available through PACER without redaction 90 days from today's date. The transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. The policy governing the redaction of personal information is located on the court website at www.ctd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 7/10/2012. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/20/2012. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/17/2012. (Bowles, S.)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 121 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER: All discovery shall be completed by 09/10/2012; Dispositive Motions are due by 10/11/2012; the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 04/01/2013 and Jury Selection will take place on 06/04/2013 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Dates for the presentation of evidence will be designated following the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month of Jury Selection. All Proposed Voir Dire questions, Proposed Jury Charge Instructions, and Motions in Limine must be filed along with the Joint Trial Memorandum. All evidentiary objections raised in the Joint Trial Memorandum must be the subject of a corresponding Motion in Limine supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. Discovery due by 9/10/2012 Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2012 Trial Brief due by 4/1/2013 Jury Selection set for 6/4/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6-12-12. (Miller, K.)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER granting #112 Motion Modification of Protective Order. The parties' joint motion for modification of the protective order [Dkt. # 112] is granted. The modification of the protective order shall not effect the parties' obligations regarding documents sought to be filed under seal pursuant to Local Rule 5(e). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6-12-12. (Miller, K.)
June 5, 2012 Filing 119 Memorandum in Support re #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David)
June 4, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Trial Brief due by 1/29/2013 Jury Selection set for 2/5/2013 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant (LaLone, L.)
June 4, 2012 Filing 118 AFFIDAVIT re #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief Signed By David S. Golub filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Golub, David)
June 4, 2012 Filing 117 Memorandum in Support re #116 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to 2nd Counterclaim filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
June 4, 2012 Filing 116 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to 2nd Counterclaim by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 6/25/2012 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts)(Golub, David)
June 4, 2012 Filing 115 AFFIDAVIT re #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief Signed By Jonathan M. Levine filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Golub, David)
June 4, 2012 Filing 114 AFFIDAVIT re #113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief Signed By Mitchell J. Rausher filed by Mitchell J. Rausher. (Golub, David)
June 4, 2012 Filing 113 MOTION for Summary Judgment Partial as to 1st claim for relief by Mitchell J. Rausher.Responses due by 6/25/2012 (Attachments: #1 Statement of Material Facts)(Golub, David)
May 30, 2012 Filing 112 Joint MOTION Modification of Protective Order re 21 Order on Motion for Protective Order by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.Responses due by 6/20/2012 (Golub, David)
May 24, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #105 Motion for Extension of Time. The Plaintiffs' motion [Doc. No. 105] is granted. The Court hereby imposes the Plaintiffs' proposed deadlines. All discovery shall be completed by 09/10/2012; Dispositive Motions are due by 10/11/2012; if no Dispositive Motions are filed, the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 10/25/2012 and Jury Selection will take place on 11/05/2012 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant; if Dispositive Motions are filed the Joint Trial Memorandum is due by 01/29/2013 and Jury Selection will take place on 02/05/2013. Dates for the presentation of evidence will be designated following the submission of the Joint Trial Memorandum. Counsel shall be prepared to present evidence on any day during the month of Jury Selection. All Proposed Voir Dire questions, Proposed Jury Charge Instructions, and Motions in Limine must be filed along with the Joint Trial Memorandum. All evidentiary objections raised in the Joint Trial Memorandum must be the subject of a corresponding Motion in Limine supported by applicable Second Circuit precedent. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 5-24-12. (Miller, K.)
May 24, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 9/10/2012 Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2012 Trial Brief due by 10/25/2012 Jury Selection set for 11/5/2012 09:30 AM in Courtroom Two, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant (Miller, K.)
May 23, 2012 Filing 110 AFFIDAVIT re #105 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2012, July 20, 2012, August 10, 2012, September 10, 2012 and October 11, 2012 For Current expert disclosure, expert deposition and dispositive motions deadlines in Scheduling Order (Corrected) Signed By David S. Golub filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Golub, David)
May 23, 2012 Filing 109 REPLY to Response to #105 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2012, July 20, 2012, August 10, 2012, September 10, 2012 and October 11, 2012 For Current expert disclosure, expert deposition and dispositive motions deadlines in Scheduling Order (Corrected Reply) filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
May 23, 2012 Filing 108 ENTERED IN ERROR . . . AFFIDAVIT re #105 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2012, July 20, 2012, August 10, 2012, September 10, 2012 and October 11, 2012 For Current expert disclosure, expert deposition and dispositive motions deadlines in Scheduling Order Signed By David S. Golub filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I)(Golub, David) Modified on 5/24/2012 (Grady, B.).
May 23, 2012 Filing 107 ENTERED IN ERROR . . . REPLY to Response to #105 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2012, July 20, 2012, August 10, 2012, September 10, 2012 and October 11, 2012 For Current expert disclosure, expert deposition and dispositive motions deadlines in Scheduling Order filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) Modified on 5/24/2012 (Grady, B.).
May 22, 2012 Filing 106 Memorandum in Opposition re #105 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2012, July 20, 2012, August 10, 2012, September 10, 2012 and October 11, 2012 For Current expert disclosure, expert deposition and dispositive motions deadlines in Scheduling Order filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jonathan M. Freiman, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Freiman, Jonathan)
May 21, 2012 Filing 105 MOTION for Extension of Time until June 21, 2012, July 20, 2012, August 10, 2012, September 10, 2012 and October 11, 2012 For Current expert disclosure, expert deposition and dispositive motions deadlines in Scheduling Order by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel)
May 18, 2012 Judge William I. Garfinkel added. (LaLone, L.)
May 18, 2012 ENTERED IN ERROR...Judge William I. Garfinkel no longer assigned to case. case not settled - see dkt #104. (LaLone, L.) Modified on 7/10/2012 (LaLone, L.).
May 18, 2012 Filing 104 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William I. Garfinkel: Settlement Conference held on 5/18/2012. Case not settled. No follow-up scheduled. (Sanders, C.)
May 11, 2012 Filing 103 Docket Entry Correction: Document #101 Certificate of Service has been modified to replace the PDF. (Grady, B.)
April 26, 2012 Filing 102 All parties are asked to read and comply with the #72 Court's Chambers Practices, including the filing and discovery dispute resolution requirements. Failure to comply may result in the summary denial of relief sought in a non-compliant pleading. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 04/26/2012. (Grady, B.)
April 25, 2012 Filing 101 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe re #97 Certificate of Good Standing,, (Jo, Daniel) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2012: #1 Replacement Certificate) (Grady, B.). Modified on 5/11/2012 (Grady, B.).
April 20, 2012 Filing 100 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant: Telephone Status Conference held on 4/20/2012. 55 minutes(Court Reporter R.WOOD(ECRO).) (LaLone, L.)
April 19, 2012 Filing 99 Supplemental RESPONSE Regarding Application of Connecticut's Survival Statute to the Parties' Discovery Dipsute, Pursuant to the Court's April 13, 2012 Electronic Discovery Order (Doc. No. 96) filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
April 19, 2012 Filing 98 RESPONSE by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe Plaintiffs' Supplemental Memorandum pursuant to Electronic Discovery Order [Doc. #96]. (Jo, Daniel)
April 13, 2012 Filing 97 CERTIFICATE OF GOOD STANDING re #92 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel S. Jo to be Admitted Pro Hac by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Jo, Daniel) Modified on 4/16/2012 to remove text (Grady, B.).
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ELECTRONIC DISCOVERY ORDER re #85 Response. As to the first issue raised by the parties, the deposition of David C. Johnson, son of the late Walter Johnson, one of the Plaintiffs, the parties are directed to file supplemental submissions on or before April 19, 2012 addressing the effect, if any of Conn. Gen Stat. sec. 52-599, Connecticut's right of survival statute, as well as whether Plaintiffs' counsel represents David C. Johnson and, if not, on what authority Plaintiffs' counsel requests to relieve David C. Johnson of his discovery obligations.As to the second issue, the additional depositions of eight of the Plaintiffs, the Court concludes that the Plaintiffs' requested order is not warranted and that the depositions shall proceed as prescribed by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. In lieu of deposition testimony about e-mail preservation and at the election of the eight Plaintiffs, the eight Plaintiffs may provide the Defendant with the same information by authorizing their internet service providers to allow the Defendant access to their remotely stored e-mail messages; if such access is determined to be insufficient or not feasible within thirty days of the date of this order, the eight Plaintiffs may elect to permit the Defendant to conduct a limited forensic examination of their personal computer(s). If the eight Plaintiffs elect to allow the Defendant this reasonable electronic access in lieu of deposition testimony, the parties will agree to reasonable conditions which adequately safeguard the eight Plaintiffs' privacy interests and will conduct any access or examination in a manner minimally disruptive to the eight Plaintiffs.As to the third issue, the adequacy of the Defendant's interrogatory response, this Court deems the Defendant's answer non-responsive. The Defendant shall state the date on which each of the Plaintiffs' custodian agreements terminated.Finally, as to the adequacy of the Defendant's Rule 30(b)(6) witness, this Court concludes that it appears from the parties' filings that the Plaintiffs sought opinion testimony from a fact witness, not that the Rule 30(b)(6) witness was inadequate. The Plaintiffs are free to file a formal motion expanding and elaborating on their request for relief on this point.Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4-13-12. (Miller, K.)
April 13, 2012 Filing 95 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE. Telephonic Status Conference set for Friday, 4/20/2012, at 3:00 PM before Judge Vanessa L. Bryant. The Plaintiffs shall provide a call-in number for the Court and all parties. The parties shall be prepared to discuss and answer relevant questions about discovery from the late Walter Johnson and the dispute about discovery of electronic material. (Miller, K.)
April 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #86 Motion for Extension of Time. If the depositions have not yet taken place, they must take place within fourteen days of the date of this order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4-13-12. (Miller, K.)
April 5, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #92 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel S. Jo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Certificate of Good Standing due by 6/4/2012. Signed by Clerk on 04/05/2012. (Grady, B.)
April 5, 2012 Filing 92 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel S. Jo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel S. Jo)(Golub, David)
April 3, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ELECTRONIC ORDER finding as moot #89 Motion for Attorney Daniel S. Jo to Appear pro hac vice; denying without prejudice #90 Motion for AttorneyDaniel S. Jo to Appear pro hac vice for failure to comply with Local Rule 83.1(d)(e). Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/3/2012. (Villano, P.)
March 30, 2012 Filing 90 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel S. Jo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel S. Jo)(Golub, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 89 MOTION for Attorney(s) Daniel S. Jo to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $25 PHV fee; receipt number 0205-2451960) by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Daniel S. Jo)(Golub, David)
March 29, 2012 Filing 88 NOTICE of Appearance by Marilyn J. Ramos on behalf of Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe (Ramos, Marilyn)
March 29, 2012 Filing 87 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Golub on behalf of Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe (Golub, David)
March 26, 2012 Filing 86 MOTION for Extension of Time until April 4-5, 2012 depositions of Sol Davis and Gary S. Davis 79 Order on Motion for Reconsideration, by Gary S. Davis, Sol Davis. (Golub, David)
March 21, 2012 ENTERED IN ERROR . . . Docket Entry Correction: Document #85 Parties' Joint Statement Re: Discovery Dispute - Entered in Error - per the local rules, discovery is not to be filed. (Grady, B.) Modified on 3/22/2012 to add document #85 back on the docket, per chambers. (Grady, B.).
March 20, 2012 Filing 85 Joint RESPONSE Parties' Joint Statement Re: Discovery Disputes filed by Robin S. Abramowitz, Giuseppe C Basili, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Golub, David) Modified on 3/21/2012 (Grady, B.). Modified on 3/22/2012 (Grady, B.).
March 19, 2012 Filing 84 ANSWER to #63 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe.(Golub, David)
March 14, 2012 Filing 83 SUGGESTION OF DEATH Upon the Record as to plaintiff-counterclaim defendant Walter R Johnson by David S Golub. (Golub, David)
March 13, 2012 Filing 82 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Daniel Katz by Connecticut Community Bank NA, Daniel S. Katz. (Golub, David)
March 13, 2012 Filing 81 STIPULATION re #56 Amended Complaint,, by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying as moot #68 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3-1-12. (Miller, K.)
March 1, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #77 Motion for Reconsideration. The Court hereby imposes the parties' proposed deadlines: fact discovery shall be completed on or before March 30, 2012; expert disclosure and discovery shall be completed on or before July 9, 2012; and dispositive motions shall be filed on or before August 17, 2012. The Court will grant no further extensions of these deadlines. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 3-1-12. (Miller, K.)
March 1, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 7/9/2012 Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2012 (Miller, K.)
February 22, 2012 Filing 78 RESPONSE to #77 MOTION for Reconsideration of 76 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part #69 Motion for Extension of Time filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph) Modified on 2/29/2012 to remove text (Grady, B.).
February 21, 2012 Filing 77 MOTION for Reconsideration of 76 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part #69 Motion for Extension of Time by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis. Responses due by 3/13/2012 (Golub, David) Modified on 2/23/2012 to correct the text (Grady, B.).
February 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting in part #69 Motion for Extension of Time. All deadlines are hereby extended for 30 days. Discovery shall be complete on or before 3/15/2012, and Dispositive Motions are due on or before 4/16/2012. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2-15-12. (Miller, K.)
February 15, 2012 Filing 75 NOTICE OF E-FILED CALENDAR: THIS IS THE ONLY NOTICE COUNSEL/THE PARTIES WILL RECEIVE.ALL PERSONS ENTERING THE COURTHOUSE MUST PRESENT PHOTO IDENTIFICATION. Global Settlement Conference set for 5/18/2012 @ 12:00 NOON in Magistrate Courtroom, 4th Floor, Room 435, 915 Lafayette Blvd., Bridgeport, CT before Judge William I. Garfinkel. Continuation of the Settlement Conference set for 6/1/2012 @ 12:00 NOON. Counsel shall check in with Judge Garfinkel's chambers, room 429 prior to the conferences. THE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE MEMO IS ATTACHED FOR REVIEW. (Sanders, C.)
February 15, 2012 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery due by 3/15/2012 Dispositive Motions due by 4/16/2012 (Miller, K.)
February 14, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William I. Garfinkel for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/14/2012. (Fernandez, Melissa)
February 7, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER all parties are asked to read and comply with the Court's #72 Chambers Practices, including the filing and discovery dispute resolution requirements. Failure to comply may result in the summary denial of relief sought in a non-compliant pleading. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/7/12. (LaLone, L.)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER RE: Judge's Chambers Practices. Counsel are directed to read and comply with the Chambers Practices and Standing Orders prior to filing any document. So ordered. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/6/12. (LaLone, L.)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 2/6/12. (LaLone, L.)
February 6, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Vanessa L. Bryant for all further proceedings. Signed by Clerk on 12/6/12. (Malone, P.)
January 27, 2012 Filing 69 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 30, 2012 completion of fact discovery 67 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Giuseppe C Basili, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) Modified on 1/30/2012 add link to #66 . (Torrenti, R.).
January 27, 2012 Filing 68 MOTION for Extension of Time until March 30, 2012 completion of fact discovery 67 Order on Motion for Extension of Time by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Giuseppe C Basili, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) Modified on 1/30/2012 to add link to #66 . (Torrenti, R.).
November 1, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #66 Motion for Extension of Time until January 31, 2012 completion of fact discovery. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/1/2011 (Villano, P.) Modified on 11/7/2011 (Villano, P.).
October 31, 2011 Filing 66 MOTION for Extension of Time until January 31, 2011 completion of fact discovery 65 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
August 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #64 Motion for Extension of Time until October 31, 2011 completion of fact discovery. All discovery shall be completed by 2/15/2012. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 3/15/2012. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 8/29/2011. (Villano, P.)
August 29, 2011 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 2/15/2012 Dispositive Motions due by 3/15/2012 (Villano, P.)
August 25, 2011 Filing 64 MOTION for Extension of Time until October 31, 2011 completion of fact discovery 57 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
June 15, 2011 Filing 63 ANSWER to #56 Amended Complaint,, with Affirmative Defenses., COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Connecticut Community Bank NA.(Freiman, Jonathan)
June 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #61 Motion for Extension of Time until June 15, 2011 to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 6/8/2011. (Villano, P.)
June 8, 2011 Answer deadline updated for Connecticut Community Bank NA to 6/15/2011. (Villano, P.)
June 7, 2011 Filing 61 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time until June 15, 2011 to Respond to the Amended Complaint by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
May 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #59 Motion for Extension of Time until 6/8/11 to respond to #56 Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 5/24/2011. (Villano, P.)
May 24, 2011 Answer deadline updated for Connecticut Community Bank NA to 6/8/2011. (Villano, P.)
May 23, 2011 Filing 59 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until 6/8/11 to respond to Amended Complaint #56 Amended Complaint,, by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
May 10, 2011 Filing 58 EXHIBIT by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Giuseppe C Basili, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe re #56 Amended Complaint,,. (Golub, David)
May 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #54 Motion for Extension of Time until August 31, 2011 to complete fact discovery 53 Order on Motion for Extension of Time. Discovery shall be completed by 11/30/2011. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 1/15/2012. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 5/10/2011. (Villano, P.)
May 10, 2011 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 11/30/2011 Dispositive Motions due by 1/15/2012 (Villano, P.)
May 9, 2011 Filing 56 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Connecticut Community Bank NA, filed by Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Paula S. Katz, David L. Davis, Melissa Doron, Sol Davis, Eric M. Rausher, Bernard B. Wineberg, Daniel S. Katz, Jason M. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Walter R. Johnson, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Richard Abramowitz, Daniel L. Davis, Marsha H. Rausher, Traci D. Davis, Rita S. Katz, Loretta D. Weinberg, Robin S. Abramowitz, Gary S. Davis, Christina M. Davis, Mitchell J. Rausher, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Samuel D. Davis, Peggy Kohn, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Frank S. Katz, Theresa A. Wolfe, Jing W. Davis.(Golub, David)
May 9, 2011 Filing 55 NOTICE by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe of Filing Amended Complaint (Golub, David)
May 9, 2011 Filing 54 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time until August 31, 2011 to complete fact discovery Set Deadlines/Hearings, 53 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
March 24, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ELECTRONIC ORDER denying #51 Motion for Order Modifying the Scheduling Order; granting #52 Motion for Extension of Time Modifying Scheduling Order 41 Order on Motion for Order. All Discovery shall be completed by 8/15/2011. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 9/15/2011. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 3/24/2011. (Villano, P.)
March 24, 2011 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 8/15/2011 Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2011 (Villano, P.)
March 21, 2011 Filing 52 MOTION for Extension of Time Modify Scheduling Order 41 Order on Motion for Order by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Giuseppe C Basili, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
March 21, 2011 Filing 51 MOTION for Order Modifying the Scheduling Order Order by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph) Modified on 3/22/2011 to correct motion relief (Garguilo, B).
November 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 50 RULING granting #29 Motion for Protective Order; and denying #34 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11-19-10. (Miller, K.)
November 5, 2010 Filing 49 Memorandum in Opposition re #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents filed by Giuseppe C Basili. (Golub, David)
November 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of DocumentsResponses due by 11/5/2010. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 11/2/2010. (Villano, P.)
October 29, 2010 Filing 47 MOTION for Extension of Time until Nov 5, 2010 respond to motion to compel #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents by Giuseppe C Basili. (Golub, David) Modified on 11/1/2010 to correct motion relief(Garguilo, B). (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/26/2013: #1 OCR REPLACEMENT) (Grady, B.).
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #44 Motion for Extension of Time until Nov 17, 2010 respond discovery requests. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/28/2010. (Villano, P.)
October 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #43 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents.Responses due by 10/29/2010. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/28/2010. (Villano, P.)
October 27, 2010 Filing 44 MOTION for Extension of Time until Nov 17, 2010 respond discovery requests by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
October 27, 2010 Filing 43 MOTION for Extension of Time until Oct. 29, 2010 to respond to #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David) Modified on 10/28/2010 to change motion event.(Villano, P.). Modified on 10/28/2010 to add link to motion(Garguilo, B).
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time until Oct 29, 2010 #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents, #29 MOTION for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/25/2010. (Villano, P.)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #39 Motion for Order Modifying the Scheduling Order. All discovery shall be completed by 6/20/2011. Dispositive motions shall be filed on or before 7/20/2011. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/25/2010. (Villano, P.)
October 25, 2010 Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 6/20/2011 Dispositive Motions due by 7/20/2011 (Villano, P.)
October 25, 2010 Reset Deadlines as to #29 MOTION for Protective Order, #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents. Responses due by 10/29/2010 (Villano, P.)
October 22, 2010 Filing 40 MOTION for Extension of Time until Oct 29, 2010 #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents, #29 MOTION for Protective Order by Giuseppe C Basili. (Golub, David) Modified on 10/25/2010 to correct event (Garguilo, B).
October 22, 2010 Filing 39 Joint MOTION for Order Modifying the Scheduling Order by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph) Modified on 11/19/2010 to correct motion relief (Garguilo, B).
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER granting #37 Motion for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Financial Records. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 10/12/2010. (Garguilo, B)
October 5, 2010 Filing 37 Joint MOTION for Order Authorizing Disclosure of Financial Records by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
September 28, 2010 Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT re #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents Signed By Joseph C. Merschman filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
September 28, 2010 Filing 35 Memorandum in Support re #34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Merschman, Joseph)
September 28, 2010 Filing 34 MOTION to Compel Deposition and Production of Documents by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 10/19/2010 (Merschman, Joseph)
September 28, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER granting #32 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 27, 2010 Plts' response Def's First Interrogatories and Request for Production. Signed by Clerk on 9/27/2010. (Garguilo, B)
September 27, 2010 Filing 32 First MOTION for Extension of Time until October 27, 2010 Plts' response Def's First Interrogatories and Request for Production by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Giuseppe C Basili, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
September 24, 2010 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Giuseppe C Basili re #28 Notice of Appearance (Golub, David)
September 23, 2010 Filing 30 Memorandum in Support re #29 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Giuseppe C Basili. (Golub, David)
September 23, 2010 Filing 29 MOTION for Protective Order by Giuseppe C Basili.Responses due by 10/14/2010 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Golub, David)
September 23, 2010 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Golub on behalf of Giuseppe C Basili (Golub, David)
July 16, 2010 Filing 27 RULING granting in part and denying in part #18 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:10-cv-00798 and 3:10-cv-00799. 3:10cv798 (PCD) Backus, et al v. Connecticut Community Bank, N.A. and 3:10cv799 (PCD) Sklar, et al v. Connecticut Community Bank, N.A., are hereby consolidated, but 3:10cv261 (PCD) Davis, et al v. Connecticut Community Bank, N.A. shall proceed as a separate case. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 7/16/2010. (Villano, P.)
July 13, 2010 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:10-cv-00798 and 3:10-cv-00799 filed by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Freiman, Jonathan)
July 7, 2010 Filing 25 OBJECTION re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:10-cv-00798 and 3:10-cv-00799 filed by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
June 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #23 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:10-cv-00798 and 3:10-cv-00799 Responses due by 7/7/2010. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 6/18/2010. (Villano, P.)
June 17, 2010 Filing 23 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:10-cv-00798 and 3:10-cv-00799 until July 7, 2010 by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ELECTRONIC ORDER approving and adopting in part #19 Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. Discovery is to be completed by 1/5/2011. Dispositive Motions are to be filed on or before 2/4/2011. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 6-3-10. (Miller, K.)
June 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #20 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 6/3/2010. (Villano, P.)
June 2, 2010 Filing 20 MOTION for Protective Order by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 6/23/2010 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Freiman, Jonathan)
June 2, 2010 Filing 19 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Freiman, Jonathan)
May 27, 2010 Filing 18 MOTION to Consolidate Cases. Case to be consolidated with 3:10-cv-00798 and 3:10-cv-00799 by Connecticut Community Bank NA.Responses due by 6/17/2010 (Freiman, Jonathan)
May 14, 2010 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Jenny R. Chou on behalf of Connecticut Community Bank NA (Chou, Jenny)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time until May 24, 2010 to submit Rule 26(f) Report. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 4/26/2010. (Villano, P.)
April 26, 2010 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 5/24/2010 (Villano, P.)
April 23, 2010 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time until May 24, 2010 to submit Rule 26(f) Report by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Connecticut Community Bank NA, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Loretta D. Weinberg, Bernard B. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe. (Golub, David)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ELECTRONIC ORDER granting #10 Motion to Transfer Judge. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/12/2010. (Villano, P.)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Peter C. Dorsey on 4/12/2010. (Villano, P.)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge Peter C. Dorsey for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 4/12/2010. (Barrille, J.)
March 18, 2010 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Affirmative Defenses with Jury Demand by Connecticut Community Bank NA.(Freiman, Jonathan)
March 16, 2010 Filing 10 MOTION to Transfer/Disqualify/Recuse Judge by Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Freiman, Jonathan)
March 11, 2010 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph C Merschman on behalf of Connecticut Community Bank NA (Merschman, Joseph)
March 11, 2010 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Freiman on behalf of Connecticut Community Bank NA (Freiman, Jonathan)
March 11, 2010 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott D. Corrigan on behalf of Connecticut Community Bank NA (Corrigan, Scott)
March 1, 2010 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan M. Levine on behalf of Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Loretta D. Wineberg (Levine, Jonathan)
March 1, 2010 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by David S. Golub on behalf of Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Bernard B. Wineberg, Loretta D. Wineberg (Golub, David)
March 1, 2010 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Paula S. Katz, David L. Davis, Melissa Doron, Sol Davis, Eric M. Rausher, Bernard B. Wineberg, Daniel S. Katz, Jason M. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Walter R. Johnson, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Richard Abramowitz, Daniel L. Davis, Marsha H. Rausher, Traci D. Davis, Rita S. Katz, Loretta D. Wineberg, Robin S. Abramowitz, Gary S. Davis, Christina M. Davis, Mitchell J. Rausher, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Samuel D. Davis, Peggy Kohn, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Frank S. Katz, Theresa A. Wolfe, Jing W. Davis. Connecticut Community Bank NA served on 2/25/2010, answer due 3/18/2010. (Golub, David)
February 25, 2010 Docket Entry Correction - Docket entry #1 Complaint modified to correct filing date. (Candee, D.)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Stefan R. Underhill on 2/23/2010. (Candee, D.)
February 23, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Motions to Dismiss due on 5/23/2010. Amended Pleadings due by 4/24/2010, Discovery due by 8/25/2010, Dispositive Motions due by 9/24/2010. Signed by Clerk on 2/23/2010. (Candee, D.)
February 23, 2010 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Connecticut Community Bank NA, Westport Natl Bank (Filing fee $350 receipt number B019309), filed by Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Paula S. Katz, David L. Davis, Melissa Doron, Sol Davis, Eric M. Rausher, Bernard B. Wineberg, Daniel S. Katz, Jason M. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Walter R. Johnson, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Richard Abramowitz, Daniel L. Davis, Marsha H. Rausher, Traci D. Davis, Rita S. Katz, Loretta D. Wineberg, Robin S. Abramowitz, Gary S. Davis, Christina M. Davis, Mitchell J. Rausher, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Samuel D. Davis, Peggy Kohn, Arnold Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Frank S. Katz, Theresa A. Wolfe, Jing W. Davis.(Candee, D.) Modified on 2/25/2010 (Candee, D.).
February 23, 2010 Summons Issued as to Connecticut Community Bank NA. (Candee, D.)
February 23, 2010 Security For Costs in the amount of $ 350.00 posted by Richard Abramowitz, Robin S. Abramowitz, Christina M. Davis, Daniel L. Davis, David L. Davis, Gary S. Davis, Jing W. Davis, Samuel D. Davis, Sol Davis, Traci D. Davis, Melissa Doron, Marcia B. Fitzmaurice, Thomas R. Fitzmaurice, Walter R. Johnson, Daniel S. Katz, Frank S. Katz, Paula S. Katz, Rita S. Katz, Arnold Kohn, Peggy Kohn, Howard L. Pomerantz, Wendy Sager Pomerantz, Eric M. Rausher, Jason M. Rausher, Marsha H. Rausher, Mitchell J. Rausher, Maria L. Sinaguglia, Westport Natl Bank, Bernard B. Wineberg, Loretta D. Wineberg, Theresa A. Wolfe Receipt Number B019309 (Corriette, M.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis et al v. Connecticut Community Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina M. Davis
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wendy Sager Pomerantz
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arnold Kohn
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard L. Pomerantz
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel L. Davis
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel D. Davis
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason M. Rausher
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Doron
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha H. Rausher
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula S. Katz
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loretta D. Weinberg
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David L. Davis
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary S. Davis
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Traci D. Davis
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Abramowitz
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rita S. Katz
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel S. Katz
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Fitzmaurice
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter R. Johnson
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin S. Abramowitz
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sol Davis
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcia B. Fitzmaurice
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell J. Rausher
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard B. Wineberg
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria L. Sinaguglia
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank S. Katz
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric M. Rausher
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy Kohn
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theresa A. Wolfe
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jing W. Davis
Represented By: Marilyn J. Ramos
Represented By: David S. Golub
Represented By: Jonathan M. Levine
Represented By: Daniel S. Jo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connecticut Community Bank NA
Represented By: Jonathan M. Freiman
Represented By: Joseph C. Merschman
Represented By: Scott D. Corrigan
Represented By: Joseph Curtin
Represented By: Tracy A. Miner
Represented By: Jenny R. Chou
Represented By: Jessica C Sergi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Plaintiffs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: David S Golub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Giuseppe C Basili
Represented By: David S. Golub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?