Krasko v. Board of Education of the City of Bridgeport

Plaintiff: Margaret Krasko
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Bridgeport
Case Number: 3:2011cv00468
Filed: March 25, 2011
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Robert N. Chatigny
Nature of Suit: Employment
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 18, 2013 62 Opinion or Order of the Court Settlement Conference Order attached. (Constantine, A.)
November 27, 2012 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : A Settlement Conference is scheduled for 1/25/2013 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. See attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 11/27/12. (Constantine, A.)
June 25, 2012 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : At the request of the parties, the settlement conference is RESCHEDULED to 9/12/2012 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. Please note the new date and see the attached order for important instructions. (Constantine, A.)
May 2, 2012 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : A Settlement Conference is scheduled for 7/11/2012 at 1:00 PM in Chambers Room 262, 450 Main St., Hartford, CT before Judge Donna F. Martinez. See attached order for important instructions. Signed by Judge Donna F. Martinez on 5/2/12. (Constantine, A.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Krasko v. Board of Education of the City of Bridgeport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Krasko
Represented By: Thomas W. Bucci
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Education of the City of Bridgeport
Represented By: Michel Bayonne
Represented By: Jarad M. Lucan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?