Commissioner of Labor v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Plaintiff: Commissioner of Labor
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Case Number: 3:2011cv00997
Filed: June 22, 2011
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: Hartford
Presiding Judge: Alvin W. Thompson
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 6, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER: The plaintiff's Motion for Reconsideration (Doc. No. 51 ) is hereby DENIED. The Clerk shall close this case. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 3/6/2013. (Sykes, J.)
August 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER granting Defendants' Motion to Dismiss (Doc. No. 23 ). Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 08/15/2012. (Giering, A)
March 31, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RULING denying Motion To Remand to State Court (Doc. No. 12). Signed by Judge Alvin W. Thompson on 03/31/2012. (Giering, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Commissioner of Labor v. Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Commissioner of Labor
Represented By: Lawrence G. Widem
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chubb Group of Insurance Companies
Represented By: James M. Sconzo
Represented By: Jonathan C. Sterling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?