Valanzuolo v. New Haven

Plaintiff: Vincent Valanzuolo
Defendant: City of New Haven
Case Number: 3:2011cv01336
Filed: August 22, 2011
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: New Haven
Presiding Judge: Janet Bond Arterton
Nature of Suit: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 16, 2013 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OF DECISION. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of the defendant. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 9/16/2013.(Rodko, B.)
April 18, 2013 57 Opinion or Order of the Court RULING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTIONS IN LIMINE: granting in large part 49 Motion in Limine; granting in large part 50 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Joan G. Margolis on 4/18/2013. (Rodko, B.)
September 21, 2012 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: Defendant's Motion 19 to Dismiss Count One is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Janet Bond Arterton on 9/21/2012. (Flagg, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Valanzuolo v. New Haven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Valanzuolo
Represented By: John R. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New Haven
Represented By: Nicole C. Chomiak
Represented By: Stacey L. Pitcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?