USA v. JHW Greentree Capital, L.P.

Plaintiff: USA
Defendant: JHW Greentree Capital, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2012cv00116
Filed: January 25, 2012
Court: Connecticut District Court
Office: New Haven Office
County: Fairfield
Presiding Judge: Vanessa L. Bryant
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 3, 2014 102 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 101 Motion for Order Lifting the Judicial Stay for a Limited Purpose by SBA as Receiver for JHW Greentree Capital, L.P. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/3/14. (De Palma, C)
June 11, 2014 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting movant Weingarten Maya Tropicana, LLC's 78 Motion to Modify the Stay Order. See the attached Memorandum of Decision. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 6/11/14. (Ives, D)
April 18, 2013 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 28 Motion for Order Lifting the Judicial Stay for a Limited Purpose. See attached Order. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 4/18/13. (Ives, D)
September 27, 2012 25 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER: In light of the Court's 23 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Motion for Entry of an Order Approving the Form and Manner of Notice to Claimants and Establishing Claims Bar Date, and in light of the Receiver's 24 Proposed Order, the Court adopts the attached Order Approving Form and Manner of Notice to Claimants. Signed by Judge Vanessa L. Bryant on 9/27/12. (Ives, D)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: USA v. JHW Greentree Capital, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: USA
Represented By: Arlene M. Embrey
Represented By: John B. Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JHW Greentree Capital, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?