Hannah v. Walmart
Plaintiff: Kim Hannah, Tom Irving and Michael Barham
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. and Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Case Number: 3:2012cv01361
Filed: September 21, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Connecticut
Office: New Haven Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Janet C. Hall
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000 Job Discrimination (Race)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 698 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 670 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 675 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 676 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 677 Motion for Reconsideration ; denying 684 Motion to Alter Judgment ; denying 686 Motion to Amend/Correct.The Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce its judgment and address any further attorney's fees. As the Court has now resolved the motions, Kristan Peters-Hamlin shall pay the $1,000 previously ordered. The fine is payable by July 29, 2018, to Clerk, U.S. District Court. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 6/29/2018. (Giammatteo, John)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 668 ORDER ON PRE-JUDGMENT INTEREST: The Court awards Plaintiff $15,645.27 in pre-judgment interest. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 12/18/2017.(Giammatteo, J.)
August 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 593 Motion for Remittitur; setting forth findings of fact and conclusions of law regarding economic damages. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 8/30/2017. (Williams, C)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 579 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 573 Motion to Quash. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 5/26/2017. (Williams, C)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 450 ORDER denying 437 Motion to Preclude. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/17/2017. (Williams, C)
February 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 402 ORDER denying 400 Motion in Limine; finding as moot 398 Motion in Limine. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/27/2017. (Williams, C)
February 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 386 ORDER granting 378 Motion to Quash/Preclude; granting 383 Motion to Preclude. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/22/2017. (Williams, C)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting 327 Motion to Quash/Preclude; granting in part and denying in part 306 and 307 Motions in Limine; denying 308 and 309 Motions in Limine. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 2/21/2017. (Williams, C)
January 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 362 ORDER granting 318 Motion to Separate Trials. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 1/6/2017. (Williams, C)
June 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER granting in part and denying in part 271 Wal-Mart's Motion for Reconsideration; denying 273 Plaintiffs' Motion for Reconsideration; denying as untimely 274 Plaintiffs' Amended Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 06/02/2016. (LaPre, E.)
February 11, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER denying 180 Motion to Sever and granting in part and denying in part 205 Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 02/11/2016. (LaPre, E.)
September 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 169 RULING granting in part and denying in part 163 Third MOTION to Compel and for Sanctions; and granting in part plaintiffs' requests for additional document production. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 9/4/2014. (Katz, Samantha)
July 28, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 160 RULING granting in part and denying in part 152 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel, as set forth in the attached ruling. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 7/28/2014. (Katz, Samantha)
June 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 154 RULING granting in part and denying in part 130 Motion to Compel; denying without prejudice to refiling 130 Motion for Sanctions. See attached ruling for details. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 6/3/2014. (Katz, Samantha)
January 29, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 127 RULING granting 120 Motion for Reconsideration re: 118 Order on Motion to Compel, and adhering to the Court's prior ruling; granting 119 Motion for Modification of Scheduling Order Deadlines; and denying as moot 124 Wal-Mart's Mo tion for Modification of Scheduling Order Deadlines. Fact discovery and depositions due by May 30, 2014. Expert discovery due by July 24, 2014. Dispositive Motions due by August 21, 2014. The Clerk of the Court will update these deadlines. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 01/29/2014. (Katz, Samantha)
January 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 118 RULING granting in part and denying in part 84 Motion to Compel Discovery Responses and Motion for Protective Order re Number of Depositions, Location and Production of Electronically Stored Information. See attached ruling. Signed by Judge Holly B. Fitzsimmons on 01/10/2014. (Katz, Samantha)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Connecticut District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hannah v. Walmart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kim Hannah
Represented By: Kristan Peters-Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Irving
Represented By: Kristan Peters-Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Barham
Represented By: Kristan Peters-Hamlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?